Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Johnson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00099

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 17, 2018 at 11:56 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/14/2015. (jak)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER noting the parties' stipulation of dismissal. The complaint will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/14/2015. (jak)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Initial Scheduling Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?