United States of America, et al v. North American Health Care, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-02401

Tags
Last Updated January 26, 2018 at 5:26 PM ST (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Orten, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Ryan Laird +1 916 441 1636 seanlairdlaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by #

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Paul Renneisen +1 916 448 6400 +1 925 955 1601 jay@NoElderAbuse.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Parker, Jr. +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 jparker@kcrlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward P. Dudensing +1 916 448 6400 +1 916 448 6401 ed@dudensinglaw.com
No Logo State of Arizona, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Parker, Jr. +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 jparker@kcrlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward P. Dudensing +1 916 448 6400 +1 916 448 6401 ed@dudensinglaw.com
No Logo State of Utah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Parker, Jr. +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 jparker@kcrlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward P. Dudensing +1 916 448 6400 +1 916 448 6401 ed@dudensinglaw.com
No Logo State of Washington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Parker, Jr. +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 jparker@kcrlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward P. Dudensing +1 916 448 6400 +1 916 448 6401 ed@dudensinglaw.com
No Logo The State of California, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Parker, Jr. +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 jparker@kcrlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Suzanne Gregory +1 916 263 2516 +1 916 274 2929 jennifer.gregory@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward P. Dudensing +1 916 448 6400 +1 916 448 6401 ed@dudensinglaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Parker, Jr. +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 jparker@kcrlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gioconda R. Molinari +1 415 436 7220 +1 415 436 6748 Gioconda.Molinari@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward P. Dudensing +1 916 448 6400 +1 916 448 6401 ed@dudensinglaw.com
v.
No Logo John Sorenson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Winston Y Chan +1 415 393 8362 +1 415 374 8460 wchan@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2017 Amy Elizabeth Chmielewski +1 949 451 4035 +1 949 475 4755 AChmielewski@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2017 Sarah Melissa Cunningham +1 415 393 8247 +1 415 374 8492 scunningham@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Doren +1 213 229 7000 +2297 229 229 7520 rdoren@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Steinfeld +1 415 393 8231 +1 415 374 8450 ESteinfeld@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason De Bretteville +1 949 725 4094 jdebretteville@sycr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Nathanael Owens +1 949 725 4076 +1 949 823 5076 jowens@sycr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/13/2015 Bradley E. Marrett +1 949 725 4097 +1 949 725 4100 bmarrett@sycr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Richard Rose +1 415 393 8277 +1 415 393 8306 jrose@gibsondunn.com
No Logo North American Health Care, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Winston Y Chan +1 415 393 8362 +1 415 374 8460 wchan@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2017 Amy Elizabeth Chmielewski +1 949 451 4035 +1 949 475 4755 AChmielewski@gibsondunn.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2017 Sarah Melissa Cunningham +1 415 393 8247 +1 415 374 8492 scunningham@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Doren +1 213 229 7000 +2297 229 229 7520 rdoren@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Steinfeld +1 415 393 8231 +1 415 374 8450 ESteinfeld@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Krikor John Meshefejian +1 310 229 1234 +1 310 229 1244 kjm@lnbyb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Lawrence Neale +1 310 229 1234 +1 310 229 1244 dln@lnbyb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/13/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason De Bretteville +1 949 725 4094 jdebretteville@sycr.com
TERMINATED: 11/13/2015 Justin Nathanael Owens +1 949 725 4076 +1 949 823 5076 jowens@sycr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/13/2015 Bradley E. Marrett +1 949 725 4097 +1 949 725 4100 bmarrett@sycr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Richard Rose +1 415 393 8277 +1 415 393 8306 jrose@gibsondunn.com
No Logo State of California, Intervenor Pla
No Logo State of Washington, Intervenor Pla
United States of America United States of America, Intervenor Pla

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gioconda R. Molinari +1 415 436 7220 +1 415 436 6748 Gioconda.Molinari@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine J. Swann +1 916 554 2762 +1 916 554 2900 catherine.swann@usdoj.gov
  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 126 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 1/9/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2018. FTR Time 2:05-2:08. Plaintiff Attorney C. Brooks Cutter. Defendant Attorney Winston Chan and Joseph Rose. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2017) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Second Joint Case Management Statement filed by North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 8/22/2017) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/14/17 before Hon. William H. Orrick by North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 115 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to August 29, 2017 granting 114 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/02/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to August 29, 2017 filed by North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 111 Case Management Conference - Further,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, ), by John Orten. Court will send to Yvonne Duong at yvonne@dudensinglaw.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 31, receipt number 0971-11198608). (Dudensing, Edward) (Filed on 3/2/2017) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            Stipulated Protective Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 110 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2017). Fact discovery cutoff: 3/1/2018. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 1/10/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2018 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 5/14/2018 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. FTR Time 2:30-2:53. Plaintiff Attorneys John Parker and Jay P. Renneisen. Defendant Attorneys Winston Chan and Elizabeth Steinfeld. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2017) Modified on 6/2/2017: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: 2/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joseph Richard Rose (Rose, Joseph) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Rose (Rose, Joseph) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        Statement Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute by North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                          CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference reset for 2/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 1/27/2017. Counsel are ordered to meet and confer personally within the next week. If any discovery disputes remain after counsels' best effort to reach resolution, counsel are directed to file a joint discovery letter brief no later than February 10, 2017, advising the Court of those unresolved issues. Within the next week, counsel should also file a case management statement presenting an agreed upon case management schedule (or competing schedules) through trial. The statement should also indicate whether counsel have agreed to personally attend a further Case Management Conference on February 21, 2017 or February 28, 2017. Total Time in Court 12 minutes. Court Reporter Name n/a. Plaintiff Attorney Sean Laird. Defendant Attorney Elizabeth Steinfield. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2017) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Ryan Laird (Laird, Sean) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE setting Further Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                      CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 100 ANSWER to Amended Complaint DEFENDANT NORTH AMERICAN HEALTH CARE, INC.'S ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT byNorth American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                        SEE DOCKET NUMBER 101 FOR THE CORRECT E-FILING DEFENDANT NORTH AMERICAN HEALTH CARE, INC.'S ANSWER to 77 Third Amended Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM byNorth American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/19/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/20/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Tamara Lange on 6/30/2016. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Melissa Cunningham (Cunningham, Sarah) (Filed on 5/20/2016) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on May 31, 2016 at 3:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 5/17/2016. Counsel should discuss an appropriate ADR procedure and complete a phone conference with the ADR Unit within the next two weeks, in hopes of agreeing upon a process. The Court directs that ADR be completed within six months. Setting of a trial schedule is delayed to see if North American Health Care will become an active defendant. Once that is known, Mr. Parker is directed to request a further Case Management Conference for the purpose of setting the trial schedule. FTR Time 2:02-2:11. Plaintiff Attorney Jay Paul Renneisen and John R. Parker, Jr. Defendant Attorney Winston Y. Chan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2016) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Paul Renneisen On Behalf Of John Orten (Renneisen, Jay) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ANSWER TO 92 COUNTERCLAIM byJohn Orten. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 5/10/2016) Modified on 5/11/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by John Orten. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 5/10/2016) Modified on 5/11/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DEFENDANT SORENSEN'S ANSWER TO 77 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM byJohn Sorenson. (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 4/11/2016) Modified on 4/12/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 90 United States Motion for Administrative Relief. Orten's FCA claim related to Star Ratings (and the Nursing Home Compare website) is DISMISSED without prejudice as to the United States. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER; re 88 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by United States of America. Responses due by 4/5/2016. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 4/1/2016) Modified on 4/4/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference continued to 5/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER ON 84 MOTION TO DISMISS - Orten's FCA claims based on allegations regarding Star Ratings and upcoding are DISMISSED with prejudice. Orten's claim under Washington State law is DISMISSED with prejudice. The motion to dismiss is otherwise DENIED. Sorensen shall file his answer within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/28/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Second Statement of Interest re 84 DEFENDANT JOHN SORENSENS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Jonathan Madore, #(2) Exhibit 1, #(3) Exhibit 2)(Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    REPLY (re 84 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT JOHN SORENSENS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ) DEFENDANT JOHN SORENSENS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO SORENSENS MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byJohn Sorenson. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF WINSTON Y. CHAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOHN SORENSEN'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS, # 2 EXHIBIT 1 TO DECLARATION OF WINSTON Y. CHAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOHN SORENSEN'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS)(Chan, Winston) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 84 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT JOHN SORENSENS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JOHN SORENSENS MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byJohn Orten. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT JOHN SORENSENS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by John Sorenson. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 2/16/2016. Replies due by 3/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JOHN SORENSENS MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Chan, Winston) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Chmielewski (Chmielewski, Amy) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Steinfeld (Steinfeld, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 80 Stipulation to extend deadlines pertaining to motion to dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extension of Deadlines Pertaining to Def.'s Motion to Dismiss Relator's 3rd Amended Complaint filed by North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chan, Winston) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/13/2015, Entered: 12/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 3:38-4:00 held on 11/03/2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Polvi, telephone number 503.779.7406; kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR 3:38-4:00. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 78 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2016. (Related documents(s) 78 ) (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 12/13/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES UNDER THE FEDERAL FALSE CLAIMS ACT, VARIOUS STATE FALSE CLAIMS ACTS, VARIOUS STATE EMPLOYMENT CLAIMS AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against North American Health Care, Inc.. Filed byJohn Orten. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 to 12 to Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibits 13 to 21 to Third Amended Complaint)(Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 12/9/2015) Modified on 12/10/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 76 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER re 75 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by North American Health Care, Inc. Attorney Richard Joseph Doren added for North American Health Care, Inc. Attorneys Jason de Bretteville, Bradley Edward Marrett and Justin Nathanael Owens terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/13/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Winston Y Chan Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel; Proposed Order (Chan, Winston) (Filed on 11/11/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 74 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss. Orten's Third, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth causes of action for violation of the Stark Law and retaliation and wrongful discharge are DISMISSED with prejudice as to Sorensen. Orten's First, Second, Fourth, and Fifth causes of action are DISMISSED with leave to amend within thirty days of the date below. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2015 re 55 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion taken under submission; written order to follow. FTR Time 3:38-4:00. Plaintiff Attorney John R. Parker. Defendant Attorneys Jason de Bretteville and Justin N. Owens. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2015) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Joinder In United States' Statement of Interest re: Public Disclosure Bar by John Sorenson. (Owens, Justin) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re 70 Statement Relator's Response to United States' Statement of Interest by John Orten. (Parker, John) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Statement re 55 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint ; Statement of Interest by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Madore)(Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE - Resetting hearing as to 55 MOTION to Dismiss and Case Management Conference - Both proceedings are reset for 11/3/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2015) (Entered: 10/04/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PORPOSED] ORDER filed by John Sorenson. (Owens, Justin) (Filed on 9/30/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 66 Stipulation to Partially Unseal Documents. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation To Partially Unseal Documents; [Proposed] Order filed by United States of America. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 55 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint ) filed byJohn Sorenson. (Owens, Justin) (Filed on 9/16/2015) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING 51 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/04/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 55 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint ) filed byJohn Orten. (Parker, John) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Statement of Interest by The United States re 51 MOTION to Change Venue filed by United States of America. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 51 MOTION to Change Venue ) filed byJohn Sorenson. (Owens, Justin) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 51 MOTION to Change Venue ) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue filed byJohn Orten. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 59 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 58 STIPULATION for Modification of Briefing Schedule re 55 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 8/26/2015. Replies due by 9/16/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/27/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 55 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint for Modification of Briefing Schedule filed by John Orten. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, John) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson (Owens, Justin) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE - Motion Hearing as to 51 MOTION to Change Venue continued to 9/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint filed by John Sorenson. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/31/2015. Replies due by 8/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Owens, Justin) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER revising briefing deadlines re: 51 MOTION to Change Venue. Response due by 7/29/2015. Reply due by 8/12/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/02/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 MOTION to Change Venue , 52 Notice (Other) JOINT STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION OF OPPOSITION AND REPLY DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANT JOHN SORENSENS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by John Orten, State of California, State of Utah, State of Washington, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, John) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by John Sorenson of Continuance of Hearing on 51 Motion to Transfer Venue (Dkt No. 51) (Owens, Justin) (Filed on 6/30/2015) Modified on 7/1/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: 6/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Change Venue filed by John Sorenson. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/8/2015. Replies due by 7/15/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Wylie Strout, # 2 Proposed Order)(Owens, Justin) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jason de Bretteville (de Bretteville, Jason) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION To Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading filed by North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. (Owens, Justin) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION FOR RELIEF UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY CODE, 11 U.S.C. 101, ET SEQ., AND IMPOSITION OF AUTOMATIC STAY; by North American Health Care, Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Summons. (Parker, John) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: ATTACHMENT IS INCOMPLETE FOR ISSUANCE. COUNSEL TO E-FILE A NEW PROPOSED SUMMONS COMPLETTING ALL SERVICE INFORMATION Proposed Summons. (Parker, John) (Filed on 5/12/2015) Modified on 5/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ON STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION re 43 Notice filed by State of California. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/20/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION by State of California. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against North American Health Care, Inc., John Sorenson. Filed byJohn Orten. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 to 12 to SAC, # 2 Exhibits 13 to 21 to SAC)(Parker, John) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  UNITED STATES' AND STATES OF ARIZONA AND WASHINGTON'S JOINT NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION; ORDER. All current contents of the court's file shall remain under seal except for the Complaint, and First and Second Amended Complaints, this Order, and the accompanying Joint Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, which are hereby unsealed. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/17/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against North American Health Care, Inc. and John Sorenson by John Orten.(Donati, J) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2014: # 1 Complaint Part 2) (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against all defendants by all plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-5136335) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cutter, C.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2014: # 2 Complaint Part 1, # 3 Complaint Part 2) (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 481 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?