USA v. Kelley
Criminal Case Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:15-cr-05198
District Judge Ronald B. Leighton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2017 at 12:56 AM EDT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Troy X. Kelley, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com
Space Patricia A Eakes +1 206 294 7450 +1 206 623 8717 pattye@calfoeakes.com
Space Emily Dodds Powell +1 206 294 7376 +1 206 623 8717 emilyp@calfoeakes.com
Space Andrew R. W. Hughes +1 206 294 7380 +1 206 623 8717 andrewh@calfoeakes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Mark N. Bartlett +1 206 622 3150 +1 206 757 7298 MarkBartlett@dwt.com
Space Jeffrey B Coopersmith +1 206 757 8020 +1 206 757 7020 jeffcoopersmith@dwt.com
Space James Harlan Corning +1 206 757 8253 jamescorning@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LESOURD & PATTEN, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Morris McCallum +1 206 624 1040 +1223109 +12 223 1099 rmccallum@lesourd.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (405) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 421 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 390 MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 and 6-10 for Outrageous Government Conduct. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 387 MOTION Sever Counts 2-5, 11, 14-17 or in the Alternative, 1-10. (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 392 MOTION for Bill of Particulars . (Attachments: # 1 Attachments A - F)(Storm, Arlen) Modified on 9/15/2017 to correct document title (DK). (Entered: 09/15/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, TO 394 MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 and 6-10 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Storm, Arlen) Modified on 9/15/2017 (DK). (Entered: 09/15/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/29/2017, (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 385 MOTION to Exclude Legal Opinion Testimony of James Savitt filed by USA (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 385 MOTION to Exclude Legal Opinion Testimony of James Savitt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 396 MOTION to Exclude "Civil Tax Audit" Evidence filed by USA (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 396 MOTION to Exclude "Civil Tax Audit" Evidence. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 386 MOTION to Pre-Admit Business Records filed by USA (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 386 MOTION to Pre-Admit Business Records. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 410 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits A, F, N, O, and P to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Grand Jury Abuse by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, re 408 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits A, F, N, O, P to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit N, # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit P)(Wilkinson, C) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 388 MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 and 6-10 for Grand Jury Abuse. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Wilkinson, C) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits A, F, N, O, P to Response to Motion by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/14/2017, (Wilkinson, C) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Response by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/14/2017, (Wilkinson, C) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO) OMNIBUS HEARING is RESET for 10/19/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Granting 391 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to File Overlength Brief, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Granting 397 Motion to Seal Document, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO) Omnibus Hearing set for 10/13/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND FOR CASE SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Jury Trial is RESET for 11/13/2017 at 09:00 AM, Omnibus Hearing set for 10/13/17 at 9:00 AM, Pretrial Conference, if necessary, set for 10/26/2017 at 09:30 AM. (cc: PTS/USPO, USMO) (DK) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Date and for Case Scheduling Order by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/16/2017, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 398 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                SEALED DOCUMENT Filing in Support of Motion to Exclude "Civil Tax Audit" Testimony by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, re 397 MOTION to Seal Document . (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Seal Document by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2017, (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION to Exclude "Civil Tax Audit" Evidence by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of Trial, # 2 Exhibit Transcript of Trial, # 3 Exhibit Transcript of Trial, # 4 Exhibit Trancript of Trial, # 5 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2017, (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 394 MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 and 6-10 filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 and 6-10 by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2017, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 392 MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2017, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Unopposed MOTION File Overlength Brief re 388 MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 and 6-10 for Grand Jury Abuse by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/14/2017, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 and 6-10 for Outrageous Government Conduct by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2017, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 388 MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 and 6-10 for Grand Jury Abuse filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 1 and 6-10 for Grand Jury Abuse by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2017, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION Sever Counts 2-5, 11, 14-17 or in the Alternative, 1-10 by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2017, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION to Pre-Admit Business Records by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2017, (Wilkinson, C) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION to Exclude Legal Opinion Testimony of James Savitt by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2017, (Wilkinson, C) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Katheryn Kim Frierson for Plaintiff USA. (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE C Seth Wilkinson appearing for USA. (Wilkinson, C) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Exceptions, instructions & closings held on 4/20/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2017, (BF) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Testimony & exceptions held on 4/19/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2017, (BF) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Voir dire & Openings held on 3/15/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2017, (BF) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Voir dire held on 3/14/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2017, (BF) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 4/6/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 4/4/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Closing Arguments held on 4/20/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 4/19/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 4/18/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 4/14/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 4/13/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 4/12/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 4/11/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 4/7/2015 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 3/31/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 3/30/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 3/29/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 3/28/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 3/17/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Example- Motion Hearing held on 3/16/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 3/15/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (BF) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 14 held on 4/5/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Teri Hendrix, teri_hendrix@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3831. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (Hendrix, Teri) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 8 held on 3/24/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Teri Hendrix, teri_hendrix@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3831. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (Hendrix, Teri) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 7 held on 3/23/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Teri Hendrix, teri_hendrix@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3831. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (Hendrix, Teri) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 6 held on 3/22/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Teri Hendrix, teri_hendrix@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3831. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (Hendrix, Teri) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 5 held on 3/21/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Teri Hendrix, teri_hendrix@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3831. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017, (Hendrix, Teri) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MANDATE of USCA (16-30219) as to Troy X. Kelley re 333 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this Court, entered December 13, 2016, takes effect this date. DISMISSED.This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (CMG) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA (16-30219) as to Troy X. Kelley re 333 Notice of Appeal. Appellant's motion for reconsideration (Docket Entry No. 7) is denied. See 9th Cir. R. 27-10. No further filings will be entertained in this closed case. (CMG) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE as to Troy X. Kelley by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Pretrial Motions due by 8/14/2017, Jury Trial is set for 10/23/2017 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Andrew Friedman, Arlen Storm, Kathryn Frierson, Richard Cohen; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: None; Telephone Conference as to Troy X. Kelley held on 1/26/2017: The March 13, 2017 trial date is STRICKEN. The Court will consider parties' alternative proposed trial dates and set a new date for an estimated six week period. The Court will use jury questionnaires. Call concluded. (JAB) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 350 Defendant's Motion to Permit Travel for National Guard Duty, as to Troy X. Kelley (1); signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) to Permit Kelley to Travel for National Guard Duty (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Permit Kelley to Travel for National Guard Duty by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) Noting Date 1/24/2017, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Angelo J Calfo (Calfo, Angelo) Modified on 1/25/2017: attorney address updated. (CMG). Modified phone numbers on 1/25/2017 (DS). (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 348 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER: Stipulation and Order to Release Funds Pursuant to Agreement signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 347 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT Stipulation To Release Funds and Agreement by Troy X. Kelley, re 337 Minute Order,, Set Deadlines,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE To Court Re Parties Agreement in Principle to Funds in Blocked Account by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 344 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (1) The Government's request that the Court provide it access to Kelley's sealed motion, filed ex parte, is DENIED. (2) By Friday, January 13, the parties shall inform the Court whether they agreed to a release of some or all of the blocked funds or to another interest-exchange. If not, the Court will make a probable cause determination, affecting the blocked funds' restraint. (3) The Court APPOINTS Angelo Calfo and Patty Eakes as co-CJA counsel. They shall submit ex parte a proposed litigation budget to the Court by Friday, January 13. Kelley must contribute each month to the cost of his representation. (JAB) cc: Financial (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA (16-30219) as to Troy X. Kelley re 333 Notice of Appeal. We have received appellant's response to the court's 341 order dated September 27, 2016, directing appellant to show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. We lack jurisdiction over this appeal because only colorable claims of double jeopardy will confer jurisdiction. Richardson v. United States, 468 U.S. 317 322 (1984). DISMISSED. (GMR) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA (16-30219) as to Troy X. Kelley re 333 Notice of Appeal. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. See 9th Cir. R. 27-9.1 (motion for voluntary dismissal must be accompanied by appellant's written consent or counsel's explanation of why appellant's consent was not obtained). If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of the appeal for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. (GMR) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 339 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT GOVERNMENT'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION REQUESTING THE RELEASE OF FUNDS by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, re 337 Minute Order,, Set Deadlines,. (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Amended Notice of Firm Name Change and Notice of Change in Firms by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER as to Troy X. Kelley: The Court received Defendant Kelley's Ex Parte-Sealed Motion 335 requesting the release of $524,206.80 to pay his attorneys' fees. Kelley also asks the Court to appoint Calfo and Eakes as CJA counsel. The Government's response or objections are due by Monday, November 7, 2016. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO), ( Responses due by 11/7/2016, ) (JAB) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (16-30219) as to 333 Notice of Appeal filed by Troy X. Kelley. (RE) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL (16-30219) by Troy X. Kelley re 331 Order,. Filing Fee: $505, receipt number 0981-4610448. (Calfo, Angelo) Modified on 9/22/2016 to add CCA#. (RE) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE and EXCLUDING TIME by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Jury Trial is set for 3/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton., Motions due by 1/20/2017, Pretrial Conference and Motion(s) Hearing, if needed, is set for 3/3/2017 at 09:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: PTS/USPO, USMO) (JAB) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ACQUITTAL as to Troy X. Kelley re 308 MOTION for Acquittal on Counts 11-15 and Count 17 Under Rule 29(C) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12 filed by Troy X. Kelley by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman, Arlen Storm; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; MOTION HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley held on 9/9/2016: Argument conducted re 308 MOTION for Acquittal on Counts 11-15 and Count 17 Under Rule 29(C) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12 filed by Troy X. Kelley. For the reasons stated the Motion for Aquittal is DENIED, The Court will sign the Order Setting Trial Date and Excluding time but will strike the reference to continuity of counsel. Trial remains set for March 13, 2017. Hearing concluded. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) Modified on 9/12/2016 to add counsel. (JAB). (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Unopposed 327 Motion to Move Funds Held in Blocked Trust Account as to Troy X. Kelley (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 324 MOTION to Enter Order Setting Trial Date and Excluding Time . (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Move Funds Held in Blocked Trust Account re 99 Evidentiary Hearing (non Probation/SR),, by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/6/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 5/31/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2016, (BF) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Enter Order Setting Trial Date and Excluding Time by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Enter Order Setting Trial Date and Excluding Time, # 2 Attachment A to Memorandum, # 3 Proposed Order Setting Trial Date and Excluding Time) Noting Date 9/9/2016, (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Troy X. Kelley re 308 MOTION for Acquittal on Counts 11-15 and Count 17 Under Rule 29(C) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12 : Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2016 at 01:30 PM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. s/Jean Boring as authorized. (JAB) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 316 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Troy X. Kelley (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 306 MOTION for Acquittal Following Discharge of Jury filed by Troy X. Kelley. The Court will schedule oral argument on whether the jurys acquittal on count 16 necessarily involved a decision on the veracity of Kelleys statement to Nordyke. Kelleys Motion for Acquittal or Dismissal on counts 11 through 15 and 17, dkt 308 , is DEFERRED by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 308 MOTION for Acquittal on Counts 11-15 and Count 17 Under Rule 29(C) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12 filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY, by Troy X. Kelley, TO RESPONSE to 308 MOTION for Acquittal on Counts 11-15 and Count 17 Under Rule 29(C) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12 (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 306 MOTION for Acquittal Following Discharge of Jury filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY, by Troy X. Kelley, TO RESPONSE to 306 MOTION for Acquittal Following Discharge of Jury (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/20/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 314 Government's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Government's Response to Defendant's Rule 29 Motion by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/7/2016, (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 308 MOTION for Acquittal on Counts 11-15 and Count 17 Under Rule 29(C) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 308 MOTION for Acquittal on Counts 11-15 and Count 17 Under Rule 29(C) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12, 306 MOTION for Acquittal Following Discharge of Jury. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Storm, Arlen) Modified on 6/7/2016 (JAB). (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Andrew Friedman, Arlen Storm; Def Cnsl: Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; STATUS HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley held on 5/31/2016. Speedy trial deadline discussed. Govt suggests Oct timeframe. Defense advises that Mr. Kelley will agree to waive speedy trial and requests the Court defer setting a new trial date until pending motions are decided to save resources and that a direct appeal is likely to be taken which will cause a further delay. Court declines to defer setting the trial date but will remain flexible pending unknown outcomes. Mr. Kelley acknowledges on the record that a delay is needed to allow his counsel the time necessary to prepare for trial. Jury Trial is set for 3/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Govt will submit a proposed order outlining speedy trial findings for entry. Hearing concluded. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 308 MOTION for Acquittal on Counts 11-15 and Count 17 Under Rule 29(C) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12 filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Acquittal on Counts 11-15 and Count 17 Under Rule 29(C) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12 by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/20/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 307 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 306 MOTION for Acquittal Following Discharge of Jury filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 306 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Acquittal Following Discharge of Jury by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/20/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley: In-court Hearing set for 5/31/2016 at 09:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO)(JAB) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley: In-court Hearing set for 5/16/2016 at 09:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO)(JAB) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 303 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending time to File Motion for Acquittal Under Rule 29(c) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) Modified on 5/12/2016 (JAB). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Motion for Acquittal Under Rule 29(c) by parties (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to pay for juror meals during deliberations. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO) (JAB) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 299 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Signature Page to 298 Jury Verdict as to Troy X. Kelley. (JAB) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JURY VERDICT as to Troy X. Kelley Not Guilty on count 16. (cc: USPO, PTS) (JAB) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 27 - Jury in Deliberations 9:00a on 4/26/2016. Jury note addressed on the record. Jury panel present in court. Inquiry whether further deliberations would be helpful. (Yes- 4 jurors, No - 8 jurors); Jury returns to jury room; Argument on the record; Court inquired of jury again - same response; As jury is leaving the courtroom, Juror #7 asks if he can say something - Clerk hands blank question form to juror to fill out - no note returned as to juror #7; Court responds to the jury, in writing, to fill out verdict form to the extent of a unanimous verdict or notify the bailiff; Defense moves for mistrial, Govt opposes - denied; Def renews motion for mistrial - denied; New note received from jury regarding Radio News: Jury note addressed on the record; Court inquires of Presiding Juror if what was heard was shared with the entire jury. Answer - No; Court conducts on-the-record sidebar inquiry with Attorneys A. Friedman, A. Calfo and Juror #5; Juror 5 returns to jury room. Court resends previous response to jury and adds new time to note directing jury to fill out verdict form to the extent of a unanimous verdict or notify the Bailiff. 2:15 Jury Returns: Defendant found NOT GUILTY on Count 16. No verdict on Counts 1s, 2s, 5s, 6s-10s, 11s, 12s-15s and 17s. Jury excused. Trial concluded. (JAB) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 26- Jury in Deliberation on 4/25/2016 @ 9:00 am. Jury Note addressed on the record. Jury excused for the day at 4:00pm. (JAB) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- JURY TRIAL Day 25 - Jury in Deliberation on 4/22/2016. 9:00a - 4:00p. Jury excused to return on Monday (JAB) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 24 - Jury in Deliberation on 4/21/2016. Jury preset 9:00 to continue deliberations; Juror note(s) addressed on the record; Jury excused for the day at 4:40 pm. (JAB) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Court's Jury Instructions (JAB) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL WITNESS LIST (JAB) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (JAB) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 23 as to Troy X. Kelley held on 4/20/2016. Additional objections to instructions taken by Def. Def Motion to Dismiss Ct 16 is DENIED on the record; 9:50 Court instructs the jury; Closing Arguments conducted; 4:10 Jurors #8, #9 are identified as alternates and excused. 4:15 Jury retires to begin deliberations. Jury excused 4:40 to return tomorrow at 9:00. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; JURY TRIAL Day 22 held on 4/19/2016. 9:30 Richard Conte resumes stand; Defense rests 10:40. Court inquires of jurors, individually, whether they have had any exposure to news accounts during the pendency of the trial. All respond in the negative; Jury excused for the day. Noon recess; 1:30 Jury Instructions: Court advises that as to Cts. 2,3 and 5 - Charts are in; Cts. 6-10, 12-15 and 17 - Charts are out; For the reasons stated - Ct 4 is DISMISSED; Objections, exceptions and failure to give instructions taken. Verdict form reviewed; Rule 29 Motion argued and Def renews Motion to Dismiss Ct 16. Rule 29 motion is DENIED for all the reasons stated on the record. Recess; Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 287 MOTION for Acquittal on Count 16. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Acquittal on Count 16 by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/19/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Emily Powell, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 21 held on 4/18/2016. 9:30 Motion on Ct. 4 and Mtn to Seal briefly discussed - Court will inquire of jurors individually tomorrow; *Court advises Mr. Kelley regarding his right to testify. 9:40 jury present; Def calls James Savitt, Richard Conte; Admissibility of Tolls declaration argued- Denied for the reason orally stated on the record; Recess 4:30; Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) *Modified on 4/20/2016 (JAB). (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Troy X. Kelley Supplemental Jury Instructions Re Counts 2-5, 16 (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED JURY VERDICT FORM by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 20 held on 4/14/2016. 9:30 Argument re: testimony of Joe Dawson on the record; Jury present. Def calls Kimberly McDermind, Michael Brown, Joseph Dawson, Donald Bennett; Recess 3:00. Defendant remains on bond. Jury Trial is set to reconvene 4/18/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 282 Filed: 4/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley, re 281 SEALED MOTION to Motion for Inquiry;, filed under seal in accordance with LCrR 55. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 04/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 281 Filed: 4/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION to Motion for Inquiry; by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/18/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 04/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/18/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 04/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Acquittal on Count 4 by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/18/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 04/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 18 held on 4/13/2016 4/12/2016. 9:30 Argument re: testimony of Jared Young presented on the record; Jury present; Paul Shipley resumes the stand, Govt calls Jared Young; Recess 4:30 Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) Modified on 4/14/2016 (JAB). (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 19 held on 4/13/2016. Jared Young resumes stand; Govt rests 10:10 am; Jury excused; Defense moves to dismiss counts - Argument presented - For the reasons stated on the record the motion to dismiss is denied; Jury present; Def calls Mark Schedler, Mary Sullivan, Matthew Cooper. Recess 3:50 Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 17 held on 4/11/2016. 9:30 Aaron Hopper resumes stand; Govt calls Thomas Peterson, Argument on the record re: Perkins testimony; Govt calls Monica Townsend; Tony Perkins, Paul Shipley. Recess 4:30; Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Defendant's 271 Motion to Exclude Tony Perkins and Evidence of Public Disclosure Commission Complaint (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 16 held on 4/7/2016. Schedule discussed; Govt calls Aaron Hopper; Recess 4;30; Defendant remains on bond. Jury Trial to reconvene 4/11/2016 at 09:30 AM (JAB) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 15 held on April 6, 2016. Defense renews motion to sever count and objects to any further exhibits not already listed on the Govt's exhibit list - overruled; Govt calls Jaimi Patel, Heather Patrick, Cameron McKnight, Denise Moreth, Julie Langenheim, Dennis Fitzpatrick, Gary Kittleson, Michael Aguilar, Megan Rudholm, Colette Keeton, Ian Morrison, Robert Gesterling, Matthew Miller, Michel Rocchi, Calvin Pearson, Jr., Defense objects to testimony of Calvin Pearson re uncharged conduct and to limit it. (referenced exh 108, pg 10), - Overruled; Govt calls Josefa Lago-Grana, Loren Seager. Recess 4:30; Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 271 MOTION to Exclude Tony Perkins and Evidence of Public Disclosure Commission Complaint filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Exclude Tony Perkins and Evidence of Public Disclosure Commission Complaint by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/7/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Teri Hendrix; JURY TRIAL Day 15 14 as to Troy X. Kelley held on 4/5/2016. Carrie Nordyke resumes stand; Govt calls Matthew Stewart, Jeffrey Kirkwood, John Medunic, Jr., JuJet Larson, Kathy Collard, Melissa Tennille, Theresa Rodello, Otis Buster Edwards, Thomas Morris, Cynthia Marker, Katrina Balderas. Recess 4:30. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) Modified on 4/11/2016 to correct day of trial(JAB). (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 13 held on 4/5/2016 4/4/2016. Govt calls De Lamb, Amber Murray; Martin Leffler, Carrie Nordyke. Recess 4:30 Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) Modified on 4/5/2016 (JAB). (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 258 Defendants Motion to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Monica Townsend and for Reconsideration of Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude 404(b) Evidence Regarding State Taxes by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Emily Powell, Andrew Hughes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 12 held on 3/31/2016. Jason Jerue resumes stand. Recess 4:30; Defendant remains on bond. Jury Trial to reconvene 4/4/2016 (JAB) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 11 held on 3/30/2016. 9:30: Scott Smith resumes stand; Carleton Lago resumes stand; Argument re: Exh 436 - Court finds exh 436 is admissible for the reasons stated on the record. Govt calls Jason Jerue. Recess 4:30 Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 10 held on 3/29/2016. 9:30 Scott Smith resumes stand; 4:30 Recess. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION United States' Filing Concerning Admission of Exhibit 436 by USA as to Troy X. Kelley Noting Date 4/8/2016, (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 9 held on 3/28/2016. 9:30: Govt calls Adam Abrams, Teri Christian, David Michael Barnes, Jodi Veitenhans, Lori Ann Wergins, Scott Smith. Recess 4:30 Defendant remains on bond. Court to reconvene 3/29/16 @ 9:30 (JAB) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 258 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Testimony of Monica Townsend and for Reconsideration of Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude 404(B) Evidence Re State Taxes. (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning Teri Hendrix; JURY TRIAL Day 8 held on 3/24/2016. 9:30; Email/memo submitted by Erica Calderas shared with Counsel; Court determines these are not admissible; 9:55 Jury present; Erica Calderas resumes stand; Argument re: Exh A-709 (privilege waiver) - admitted; Tom Larkin - atty for Fidelity addresses Court re: Exh A-709; Govt calls Chester Hodgson, Frank Cornelius, Geoffrey Jackson. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) Modified on 4/5/2016 (JAB). (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 258 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Testimony of Monica Townsend and for Reconsideration of Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude 404(B) Evidence Re State Taxes filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Exclude Proposed Testimony of Monica Townsend and for Reconsideration of Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude 404(B) Evidence Re State Taxes by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/28/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Teri Hendrix; JURY TRIAL Day 7 held on 3/23/2016. 9:30 Patricia LeVeck resumes stand; Govt calls Robert Olsen; Exh #533 rejected; Govt calls Erica Calderas; 4:30 jury excused; Def moves to strike testimony of Erica Calderas-denied; Court directs Ms. Calderas to produce note/email. Recess. Court to reconvene 3/24/16 at 9:30. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Teri Hendrix; JURY TRIAL Day 6 held on 3/22/2016. 9:30 Michele Millsap resumes stand; Govt calls Kandra Robinson; Deft MOTION to Delay Introduction of Old Republic Title Witnesses is granted in part and denied in part. Patricia LeVec will testify as scheduled all other witnesses shall be delayed until next week. Redacted documents due by Wed; Jury present; Govt calls Lisa Mahoney, Russell Wright, James Eckrich, Patricia LeVeck; Exh #436 is rejected w/o prej; Recess 4:30. Court to reconvene 3/23/16 @ 9:30l; Defendant remains on bond.(JAB) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 252 Motion To Delay Introduction of Old Republic Title Witnesses. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) Modified on 3/24/2016 to reflect this document is a minute order. (JAB). (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Andrew Friedman, Katheryn Frierson; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Easkes; Court Reporter: Teri Hendrix; JURY TRIAL Day 5 held on 3/21/2016. Govt calls Scott Whitmarsh, Charisse Collins, Tami Henderson, Michele Millsap; Recess 4:30 to reconvene 3/22/3016; Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 252 MOTION to Delay Introduction of Old Republic Title Witnesses filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Delay Introduction of Old Republic Title Witnesses by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/22/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Following In Camera Review of ORTL's Documents re 227 Unopposed MOTION for In Camera Review of Claimed Privileged Material filed by Troy X. Kelley by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Teri Hendrix; JURY TRIAL Day 4 held on 3/17/2016. Julie Yates resumes stand; Govt calls Carleton Lago. Jury released 4:30 Witness Lago states he is unable to come back Monday (next week) due to family obligations; Def obj. For the reasons stated Mr. Logo is release from subpoena temporarily but is directed to remain in close contact with Mr. Storm and return to complete his testimony at the earliest possible moment. 4:40 Recess. Court to reconvene 3/20/2016. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 249 Filed: 3/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT: Notice entered by Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. cc: Counsel(JAB) (Entered: 03/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER on Rule 404(b) State Tax Evidence re 231 MOTION in Limine by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 3 held on 3/16/2016. Govt calls Witnesses: Krista Thoreson, Marieclaire Sousby, Todd Surles, Nicole Johnson, Nancy Moore, Julie Yates. Recess 4:30. Court to reconvene 3/17/16 (JAB) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER on Objections to Kelley Depositions Designations by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. 215 233 (JAB) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Denying 192 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Rick Dosa filed by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 229 Motion to Exclude Jerue Rule 404(b) Evidence by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL Day 2 held on 3/16/2016 3/15/2016. Jury Selection/Voir Dire resumed. Final challenges for cause taken; 11:40a Jury selected/sworn; Court preliminarily instruct the jury; Recess; Opening statements conducted; Defense moves for mistrial following Govt opening - denied; Recess 4:40; Court to reconvene 3/16/16 @ 9:30am (JAB) Modified on 3/16/2016 to correct date of trial(JAB). Modified on 3/30/2016 (JAB). (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; JURY TRIAL-Jury Selection/Voir Dire Dues Day 1 held on 3/14/2016. 9:30 (off the record) Courtroom Deputy swears entire jury panel. Voir Dire conducted; Jury excused from courtroom at 4:45p. Challenges taken. Jury Clerk advised. Jurors excused for the day to return at 9:30 3/15/16 to continue voir dire. Def argues re: Motions in Limine; Recess 5:20pm; Court to reconvene 3/15 @ 9:30a. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) Modified on 3/17/2016 (JAB). (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 231 MOTION in Limine to Exclude 404(B) Evidence Regarding State Taxes. (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 03/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 229 MOTION in Limine to Exclude 404(B) Evidence Regarding Jason Jerue. (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 03/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDMENT to 209 Exhibit List by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 03/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WITNESS LIST by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 03/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY, by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. as to Troy X. Kelley, TO RESPONSE to 192 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Rick Dosa (Skok, Gavin) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to United States Filing Concerning Deposition Designations by Troy X. Kelley re 215 Memorandum filed by USA (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 231 MOTION in Limine to Exclude 404(B) Evidence Regarding State Taxes filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude 404(B) Evidence Regarding State Taxes by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/18/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 229 MOTION in Limine to Exclude 404(B) Evidence Regarding Jason Jerue filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude 404(B) Evidence Regarding Jason Jerue by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/18/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 228 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 227 Unopposed MOTION for In Camera Review of Claimed Privileged Material filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for In Camera Review of Claimed Privileged Material by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/10/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. as to Troy X. Kelley re 225 Memorandum filed by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. (of Gavin W. Skok) in Support of Non-Party Old Republic Title, Ltd.'s Brief Regarding Privileged Documents Submitted for In Camera Review (Skok, Gavin) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 225 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM / Brief regarding Privileged Documents Submitted for In Camera Review by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. as to Troy X. Kelley (Skok, Gavin) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 192 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Rick Dosa filed by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 223 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 192 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Rick Dosa. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 165 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Inappropriate Testimony of Defense Tax Expert filed by USA (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 165 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Inappropriate Testimony of Defense Tax Expert. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 161 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit Expert Witness Testimony filed by USA (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 161 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit Expert Witness Testimony. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER On Motions In Limine by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 199 MOTION to Sever Counts 1-10 filed by Troy X. Kelley by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 200 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by USA by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM re Deposition Designations by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRIAL BRIEF by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT LIST by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WITNESS LIST by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WITNESS LIST by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT FORM by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Troy X. Kelley Proposed Forfeiture Jury Instructions (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED JURY VERDICT FORM by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Patricia Eakes, Emily Powell, Andrew Hughes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE as to Troy X. Kelley held on 3/4/2016. Cause challenges finalized; Jury Selection will be conducted in Courtroom E with all spectator viewing of jury selection in Courtroom B. Proposed voir dire, trial briefs, exhibit and witness lists and deposition designations are due by 3/7/2016; MIL discussed on the record; Court will issue final order. Witness will be excluded from the courtroom, Voir dire further discussed; Hearing concluded. (JAB) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER as to Troy X. Kelley by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. The Court accepts the for-cause challenges for the following participants:100996567; 100997526; 101004229; 101009108; 101012431; 101022563; 101106190; 101110858; 101116161; 101123302; 101177340; 101178682; 100998467; 101001804; 101187218; 101004384; 101109499; 101017039; 101173510; 101109228; 101102518; 101018785; 101147114; 101123733; 101183888; 101020844; 100996991; 100996228; 101123787; 101100892.They are excused from further service in this case. (cc: USPO) (DN) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 199 MOTION to Sever Counts 1-10 . (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Sever Counts 1-10 by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Defendant's 186 Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Sever Counts 1-10 as to Troy X. Kelley (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 197 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (Attachments: # 1 List) (JAB)cc: Counsel (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Government's 131 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Class Action Lawsuits by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Defendant's 140 Motion to Seal Certain Motions in Limine and Corresponding Declarations as to Troy X. Kelley (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Gavin W. Skok in Support of Motion to Quash by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. as to Troy X. Kelley re 192 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Rick Dosa filed by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. (Skok, Gavin) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Rick Dosa by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. as to Troy X. Kelley re 192 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Rick Dosa filed by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. (Skok, Gavin) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena to Rick Dosa by Old Republic Title Holding Company, Inc. as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Skok, Gavin) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 181 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Troy X. Kelley (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 171 Deft's Motion to Seal Certain Oppositions to Motions In Limine and Corresponding Declarations (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew R. W. Hughes appearing for Troy X. Kelley (Hughes, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Emily Dodds Powell appearing for Troy X. Kelley (Powell, Emily) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Patricia A Eakes appearing for Troy X. Kelley (Eakes, Patricia) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Sever Counts 1-10 by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 185 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Angelo Calfo by Troy X. Kelley, re 184 Sealed Document,, filed under seal in accordance with LCrR 55. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9, # 2 Exhibit 10-15)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 184 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition by Troy X. Kelley, re 159 MOTION in Limine , 171 MOTION to Seal Document Certain Oppositions to Motions in Limine and Corresponding Declarations, 158 MOTION in Limine , filed under seal in accordance with LCrR 55. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Redacted DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 159 MOTION in Limine filed by USA, 158 MOTION in Limine filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9, # 2 Exhibit 10-15)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 159 MOTION in Limine , 158 MOTION in Limine . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 180 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Angelo Calfo by Troy X. Kelley, re 171 MOTION to Seal Document Certain Oppositions to Motions in Limine and Corresponding Declarations, 179 Sealed Document,, filed under seal in accordance with LCrR 55. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 179 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition by Troy X. Kelley, re 129 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Re Settlement Agreement, 171 MOTION to Seal Document Certain Oppositions to Motions in Limine and Corresponding Declarations, filed under seal in accordance with LCrR 55. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Redacted DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 129 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Re Settlement Agreement filed by USA (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 129 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Re Settlement Agreement. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 157 MOTION in Limine filed by USA (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 157 MOTION in Limine . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 130 MOTION in Limine Re Gary Beisheim filed by USA (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 149 SEALED MOTION to Motion In Limine to Exclude References to Belize and Wellington Trust;, 147 Redacted MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Belieze and Wellington Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 130 MOTION in Limine Re Gary Beisheim. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document Certain Oppositions to Motions in Limine and Corresponding Declarations by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 145 SEALED MOTION to Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Witnesses' Interpretation of Agreements;, 143 MOTION in Limine (REDACTED) to Exclude Testimony Regarding Witnesses' Interpretation of Agreements. (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 155 SEALED MOTION to Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Representations Made to Borrowers and Title Companies;, 153 Redacted MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Representations Made to Borrowers and Title Companies. (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 132 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Defendant's Attempts to Seal Pleadings in Old Republic v. Kelley. (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 136 MOTION in Limine to Limit References to Money Laundering. (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 134 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Unsigned Draft as "Contract". (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine To Exclude Inappropriate Testimony of Defense Tax Expert by USA as to Troy X. Kelley Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 151 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Document Production in Civil Cases. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 141 MOTION in Limine Strike Business Expense Allegations from Counts 11, 14, and 15 and in Limine to Exclude Business Expense Evidence Under Evidence Rules 401, 402, and 403 and Renewed Motion for Severence. (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 138 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding 2005-2007 Taxes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Limit Expert Witness Testimony by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING THE TIME OF HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley: The Pretrial Conference is now set for 3/4/2016 at 01:30 PM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO)(JAB) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 156 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Angelo Calfo by Troy X. Kelley, re 140 MOTION to Seal Document (Certain Motions In Limine and Corresponding Declarations), filed under seal in accordance with LCrR 55. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 155 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION to Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Representations Made to Borrowers and Title Companies; by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 153 Redacted MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Representations Made to Borrowers and Title Companies filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Redacted MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Representations Made to Borrowers and Title Companies by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 151 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Document Production in Civil Cases filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Document Production in Civil Cases by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 150 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Angelo Calfo by Troy X. Kelley, re 149 SEALED MOTION to Motion In Limine to Exclude References to Belize and Wellington Trust;, filed under seal in accordance with LCrR 55. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 149 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION to Motion In Limine to Exclude References to Belize and Wellington Trust; by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Redacted DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 147 Redacted MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Belieze and Wellington Trust filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Redacted MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Belieze and Wellington Trust by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Angelo Calfo by Troy X. Kelley, re 145 SEALED MOTION to Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Witnesses' Interpretation of Agreements;, filed under seal in accordance with LCrR 55. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 145 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION to Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Witnesses' Interpretation of Agreements; by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redacted DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 143 MOTION in Limine (REDACTED) to Exclude Testimony Regarding Witnesses' Interpretation of Agreements filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine (REDACTED) to Exclude Testimony Regarding Witnesses' Interpretation of Agreements by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 141 MOTION in Limine Strike Business Expense Allegations from Counts 11, 14, and 15 and in Limine to Exclude Business Expense Evidence Under Evidence Rules 401, 402, and 403 and Renewed Motion for Severence filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine Strike Business Expense Allegations from Counts 11, 14, and 15 and in Limine to Exclude Business Expense Evidence Under Evidence Rules 401, 402, and 403 and Renewed Motion for Severence by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document (Certain Motions In Limine and Corresponding Declarations) by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/22/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 138 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding 2005-2007 Taxes filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding 2005-2007 Taxes by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 136 MOTION in Limine to Limit References to Money Laundering filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Limit References to Money Laundering by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 134 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Unsigned Draft as "Contract" filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Unsigned Draft as "Contract" by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 132 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Defendant's Attempts to Seal Pleadings in Old Republic v. Kelley filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Defendant's Attempts to Seal Pleadings in Old Republic v. Kelley by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Re Gary Beisheim by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) Noting Date 2/26/2016, (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Re Settlement Agreement by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) Noting Date 2/26/2016, (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 128 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER Releasing Funds and Creating a Security Interest 120 signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 125 Motion to Seal Document to Release Funds as to Troy X. Kelley (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT by Troy X. Kelley, re 125 MOTION to Seal Document Pleadings Regarding Release of Funds, filed under seal in accordance with LCrR 55. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Document Pleadings Regarding Release of Funds by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/22/2016, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Angelo J. Calfo regarding Proposed Juror Questionnaire as to defendant Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Andrew Friedman, Katheryn Frierson; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; STATUS/MOTION HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley held on 1/6/2016. Topics discussed: Jury Questionnaire/Screening, Expert Disclosure, Trial length, Designation of Kelley Deposition Testimony, Motion for Release of Funds: Counsel will submit individual proposed jury questionnaires to the court by 1/14/2016; Case specific questionnaires returned by potential jurors will be provided to counsel on or about 3/4/2016; Summary of Expert Testimony deadline is extended to 1/29/2016 (both); Trial length estimated at 16 days (4 weeks), Trial schedule will be M-Th - 4 day weeks; Exhibit and Witness Lists, Exhibits, including bench copy of exhibits provided by 3/4/2016; Identification/Designation of deposition testimony due by 1/22/2016. Counter designations due by 2/22/2016; *Govt advises the Court that they intend to consolidate Cts 2 & 3 of Indictment; Argument presented on Defendant's 111 MOTION for Release of Funds. For all the reasons stated, the motion is DENIED without prejudice. Hearing concluded. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) *Modified on 1/7/2016 (JAB). (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 116 Government's Motion to Seal Document by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of FBI Forensic Accountant Gary Beisheim by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, re 116 MOTION to Seal Document - Declaration of FBI Forensic Account Gary Beisheim. (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 117 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE - Government's Opposition to Ex Parte Motion for Release of Funds by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document - Declaration of FBI Forensic Account Gary Beisheim by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/15/2016, (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITNESS LIST by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to Troy X. Kelley by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.( Response or Objections are due by 1/5/2016, ) (cc: USPO), (JAB) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2015 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016, (BF) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2015 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016, (BF) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 12/1/2015 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016, (BF) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE CONCERNING CIVIL FORFEITURE by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service by US Marshal's Office re Transfer Custody of Funds on 12/8/2015. (CMG) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER on Motions by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. The government shall consolidate counts 2 and 3 or elect between them. 69 Motion to Dismiss Count 3; A Decision on whether count 12 is time-barred is DEFFERED until after presentation of the evidence at trial. 70 Motion to Dismiss Count 12; The Motion to Sever is DENIED. 68 Motion to Sever Counts 2-5, 11, 14-17]. (JAB) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED EXHIBIT LIST (Evidentiary Hrg on Seizure)(JAB) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT LIST (Evidentiary Hrg on Seizure)(JAB) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WITNESS LIST (Evidentiary Hrg on Seizure) (JAB) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Emily Powell, Andrew Hughes; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; MOTION HEARING held on 12/3/2015 : Court announces it's preliminary ruling re 70 MOTION to Dismiss Count 12 filed by Troy X. Kelley = Defer until the end of the evidence; 68 MOTION to Sever Counts 2-5, 11, 14-17 (Superseding Indictment) filed by Troy X. Kelley = Denied and 69 MOTION to Dismiss Count 3 filed by Troy X. Kelley = Counts 2 & 3 are multiplicitous: Argument presented. Court will issue it's written decision. Hearing concluded. (JAB) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER directing the transfer of seized funds to a blocked account pending absent further order of this Court. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO) 58 (JAB) Modified on 12/4/2015 (JAB). (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Andrew Friedman, Richard Cohen; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Emily Powell; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; EVIDENTIARY HEARING on Seizure held on 12/3/2015. Gary Beisheim resumes stand; Court advised defendant regarding rights regarding testifying; Closing presented; For all the reasons stated, the Court directs the funds seized shall be transferred to Mr. Calfo's Firm, to be held in a blocked account, absent further order of this Court. Evidentiary Hrg concluded. (JAB) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Andrew Friedman, Richard Cohen; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Emily Powell; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; EVIDENTIARY HEARING on Seizure held on 12/2/2015. 9:30 Michael Brown resumes stand; Govt calls Gary Beisheim; Recess 4:30 (JAB) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Andrew Friedman, Richard Cohen; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo, Emily Powell; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; EVIDENTIARY HEARING on Seizure held on 12/1/2015. Opening Statements presented; Govt calls S.A. Michael Brown (FBI); Recess 4:30pm with hearing to resume 12/2/2015 @ 9:30 am. (JAB) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDMENT to 92 Exhibit List by Troy X. Kelley. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDMENT to 83 Exhibit List by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 89 Deft's Motion to Seal Document as to Troy X. Kelley (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT LIST by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 90 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley, re 88 Reply to Response to Motion, filed under seal in accordance with LCrR 55. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Document Calfo Declaration in Support of Reply Re Motion to Sever Countys 2-5, 11, 14-17 (Superseding Indictment) by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/4/2015, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY, by Troy X. Kelley, TO RESPONSE to 68 MOTION to Sever Counts 2-5, 11, 14-17 (Superseding Indictment) (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY, by Troy X. Kelley, TO RESPONSE to 70 MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 12 (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY, by Troy X. Kelley, TO RESPONSE to 69 MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 3 (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline by Judge Ronald B. Leighton., ( Reply Brief due by 11/24/2015, ) (JAB) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline by parties (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WITNESS LIST by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 6/12/2015 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have ten (10) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Julaine Ryen, jvryen@comcast.net, 253-208-4467. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2016, (Hendrix, Teri) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 5/11/2015 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have ten (10) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2016, (BF) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Govt's 74 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (22) as to Response 77 by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Electronically signed as authorized.(JAB) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Govt's 73 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (18) as to Response 75 by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Electronically signed as authorized.(JAB) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 68 MOTION to Sever Counts 2-5, 11, 14-17 (Superseding Indictment) . (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 70 MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 12, 69 MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 3. (Attachments: # 1 A, # 2 B, # 3 C, D, and E)(Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/27/2015, (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File an Overlength Brief) Noting Date 11/27/2015, (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATED MOTION For Entry of Protective Order by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/27/2015, (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 9/11/2015 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have ten (10) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Teri Hendrix, teri_hendrix@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3831. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2016, (Hendrix, Teri) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 12 by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/1/2015, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Count(s) 3 by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/1/2015, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Sever Counts 2-5, 11, 14-17 (Superseding Indictment) by Troy X. Kelley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/1/2015, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 58 Defendant's Motion for Consolidation and an Evidentiary Hearing by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. An Evidentiary Hearing to assess the validity of the governments September 8, 2015 seizure and any severance arguments is set for December 1 and December 2, 2015 at 09:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Criminal Rule 41(g) will govern the hearings evidentiary portion. (JAB) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY, by Troy X. Kelley, TO RESPONSE to 58 MOTION to Consolidate Proceedings and for Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Pretrial Seizure of Assets (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Government's 63 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 58 MOTION to Consolidate Proceedings and for Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Pretrial Seizure of Assets . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Application for Civil Seizure Warrant and Affidavit in Support, # 2 Exhibit B - Seziure Warrant Return)(Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File an Overlength Brief) Noting Date 10/23/2015, (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. See order for details. (JAB) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Troy X. Kelley, that the following is RE-NOTED: 58 MOTION to Consolidate Proceedings and for Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Pretrial Seizure of Assets ; Noting Date 10/16/2015, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 46 Government's Motion for Inquiry Concerning Potential Conflict of Interest by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 58 MOTION to Consolidate Proceedings and for Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Pretrial Seizure of Assets filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Proceedings and for Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Pretrial Seizure of Assets by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/9/2015 10/16/2015. (Calfo, Angelo) Modified on 10/8/2015 (JAB). (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY, by Troy X. Kelley, TO RESPONSE to 47 MOTION to Continue Trial and for Entry of Case Scheduling Order (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 46 MOTION FOR INQUIRY CONCERNING POTENTIAL CONFLICT OF INTEREST filed by USA (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 46 MOTION FOR INQUIRY CONCERNING POTENTIAL CONFLICT OF INTEREST. (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 47 MOTION to Continue Trial and for Entry of Case Scheduling Order. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David W. Christel- CRD: K Brye; AUSA: Arlen Storm; Def Cnsl: Angelo Calfo; Time of Hearing: 10:00AM; Courtroom: C; Session #: TAC150911; ARRAIGNMENT as to Troy X. Kelley (1) Counts 1s,2s-5s,6s-10s,11s,12s-15s,16s,17s held on 9/11/2015. Defendant advised of charges and penalties. Defendant pleads NOT GUILTY to all charges. All hearing dates and deadlines remain as set previously. Defendant remains on bond. (KEB) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Angelo Calfo; Def Cnsl: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson, Andrew Friedman; Court Reporter: Teri Hendrix; Scheduled Status Conference Hearing Held as to Troy X. Kelley. STATUS HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley held on 9/11/2015. Court advises counsel that the pending motions will be decided after the noting date of 9/18/2015. Govt' does not object to the 3/14/2016 trial date requested by the defense but does object and will respond to the proposed case schedule. Court GRANTS the Motion to Continue the trial to 3/14/2015 3/15/2016 @ 9:00 am. A new scheduling order will issue after 9/18/2015. Defense advises an evidentiary hearing regarding the asset seizure is requested. Defense advises it plans to file a motion to sever counts. Regarding the Govt's Motion Inquiry Concerning Potential Conflict of Interest, waivers will be submitted in camera. Hearing concluded. Jury Trial is now set for 3/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) Modified on 9/11/2015 (JAB). (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by USA as to Troy X. Kelley, to 47 MOTION to Continue Trial and for Entry of Case Scheduling Order. (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo by Troy X. Kelley re 47 MOTION to Continue Trial and for Entry of Case Scheduling Order filed by Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue Trial and for Entry of Case Scheduling Order by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/18/2015, (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION FOR INQUIRY CONCERNING POTENTIAL CONFLICT OF INTEREST by USA as to Troy X. Kelley Noting Date 9/18/2015, (Frierson, Katheryn) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO). Arraignment reset for 9/11/2015 at 10:00 AM in C Courtroom before Judge David W. Christel. (KEB) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley: Status Conference set for 9/11/2015 at 10:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO)(JAB) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Richard Edward Cohen appearing for USA. (Cohen, Richard) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mark N Bartlett, Jeffrey B Coopersmith and James Harlan Corning withdrawn from case as to Troy X. Kelley (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter scheduling arraignment for defendant Troy X. Kelley. Arraignment set for 9/14/2015 at 01:30 PM in C Courtroom before Judge David W. Christel (PT). (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER CONTINUING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Troy X. Kelley by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. cc: USMO; (JK) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Signature Page to 38 Indictment as to Troy X. Kelley. (JK) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Troy X. Kelley (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-5s, 6s-10s, 11s, 12s-15s, 16s. (Attachments: # 1 Status Sheet) (JK) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe with correct proposed order) re 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to LCrR 5(g)(B) by Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bartlett, Mark) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to LCrR 5(g)(B) by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/11/2015, (Bartlett, Mark) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Angelo J Calfo appearing for Troy X. Kelley (Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Stricken STATUS CONFERENCE on 9/9/2015 as to Troy X. Kelley. s/Jean Boring as authorized. (JAB) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Andrew Friedman, Kathreryn Frierson, Arlen Storm; Def Cnsl: Mark Bartlett, Jeffrey Coopersmith; Court Reporter: Julaine Ryen; STATUS HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley held on 6/12/2015. Court reads statement into the record. Government addresses the Court and agrees that based upon the response from defense counsel and the defendant, no conflict exists and no further inquiry is required. 21 Government's Motion for Inquiry Concering Potential Conflicts of Interest is stricken. Hearing is concluded. (JAB) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley: Status Hearing set for 6/12/2015 at 11:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO)(JAB) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Troy X. Kelley (1), signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(CMG) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Troy X. Kelley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/19/2015, (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of John A. Strait by Troy X. Kelley re 21 MOTION GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR INQUIRY CONCERNING POTENTIAL CONFLICTS OF INTEREST re 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 12 PAGES filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Mark N. Bartlett by Troy X. Kelley re 21 MOTION GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR INQUIRY CONCERNING POTENTIAL CONFLICTS OF INTEREST re 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 12 PAGES filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Floyd G. Short by Troy X. Kelley re 21 MOTION GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR INQUIRY CONCERNING POTENTIAL CONFLICTS OF INTEREST re 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 12 PAGES filed by USA (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Troy X. Kelley by Troy X. Kelley re 21 MOTION GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR INQUIRY CONCERNING POTENTIAL CONFLICTS OF INTEREST re 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 12 PAGES filed by USA (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Troy X. Kelley, to 21 MOTION GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR INQUIRY CONCERNING POTENTIAL CONFLICTS OF INTEREST re 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 12 PAGES . (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey B Coopersmith appearing for Troy X. Kelley (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Troy X. Kelley (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER as to Troy X. Kelley: Defendant Troy Kelley and his attorney should respond to the Government's Motion for Inquiry Regarding Potential Conflicts of Interest [Dkt. #21] by the end of business Friday June 5, 2015. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO), ( Responses due by 6/5/2015, ) (JAB) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR INQUIRY CONCERNING POTENTIAL CONFLICTS OF INTEREST re 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 12 PAGES by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 12 PAGES by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/5/2015, (Friedman, Andrew) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE as to Troy X. Kelley by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Jury Trial is set for 1/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Motions due by 10/2/2015. Responses are due by 11/2/2015. Status Conference is set for 9/9/2015 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: PTS/USPO, USMO) (JAB) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulated MOTION to Continue Trial by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Speedy Trial Rights, # 2 Stipulated Order to Continuing Trial Date, # 3 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 5/22/2015, (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley: Status Conference set for 9/9/2015 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO)(JAB) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- CRD: Jean Boring; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Mark Bartlett; Court Reporter: Barry Fanning; STATUS HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley held on 5/11/2015. After reviewing the suggested new trial dates from the Government and Defense, and for all the reasons stated, trial is reset for January 19, 2016. The Court sets a follow-up Status Conference for September 9, 2015 @ 9:00. (In Chambers Hrg on the record conducted re: possible sealed motion) In open-court the Court determines that the Government's motion for possible conflict will be filed as a public document but proceedings and pleadings subsequently filed and set may be sealed. Motions cutoff is established as October 2, 2015. Parties shall have 30 days to respond. Hearing concluded. Defendant remains on bond. (JAB) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER re 14 Stipulated Motion as to Troy X. Kelley (1) by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by USA as to Troy X. Kelley (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 5/15/2015, (Storm, Arlen) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley: Status Conference set for 5/11/2015 at 10:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO)(JAB) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Nonrepresentation by Troy X. Kelley (McCallum, Robert) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark N Bartlett appearing for Troy X. Kelley (Bartlett, Mark) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Receipt issued for the surrender of a US Passport issued to Troy X. Kelley. Passport placed in the Tacoma Vault. (KAM) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appearance Bond (PR) entered as to Troy X. Kelley (1). (cc: PTS/USPO/USMO) (KAM) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J Richard Creatura- CRD: K Miller; AUSA: Arlen Storm, Katheryn Frierson & Andrew Friedman; Def Cnsl: Robert McCallum & Mark Bartlett; PTS: John Moore; Time of Hearing: 2:30 PM; Courtroom: D; Court Reporter #: Juliane Ryen; ARRAIGNMENT AND DETENTION HEARING as to Troy X. Kelley (1) on Counts 1,2-5,6,7,8-9,10 held on 4/16/2015. Defendant advised of rights, charges and penalties. Defendant plead NOT GUILTY to all charges. Parties stipulate to release. Defendant placed on bond. Motions due by 5/7/2015. Jury Trial is set for 6/8/2015 at 09:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (KAM) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION/ORDER to Quash Arrest Warrant as to Troy X. Kelley re 3 Order for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by Judge Karen L Strombom. (cc: USMO) (KAM) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion & Order to Unseal Indictment as to Troy X. Kelley by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. cc: USMO; (JK) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ISSUING BENCH WARRANT as to Troy X. Kelley by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. cc: USMO (IO); (JK) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Signature Page to 1 Indictment as to Troy X. Kelley. (JK) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INDICTMENT as to Troy X. Kelley (1) count(s) 1, 2-5, 6, 7, 8-9, 10. (Attachments: # 1 Status Sheet) (JK) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 966 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?