Tam Travel, Inc. v. Delta Airlines, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-30001
District Judge Peter C. Economus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 6:46 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo A Team Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo A&W Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Adventure Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Allways Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Bill Rubinsohn, Plaintiff
No Logo Bonanza World Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Brenda K. Davis and Associates, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Breton Village Travel Services, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Camelot Tours, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Carolyn Fjord, Plaintiff
No Logo Cbd Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Christine Whalen, Plaintiff
No Logo Compass Ltd, Plaintiff
No Logo Deluxe Travel LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Destinations Resort Reservations, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Destinations, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Etc (holdings) Ltd., Plaintiff
No Logo Excel Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Five Starr Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Garavanian Travel,Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Gateway Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Gidden, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Go Everywhere, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Imperial Travel by Dana LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo J. Michael Walker, Plaintiff
No Logo Jocelyn Gardner, Plaintiff
No Logo John R. Denny, Plaintiff
No Logo June Stansbury, Plaintiff
No Logo Katherine Arcell, Plaintiff
No Logo Lago Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Lee Gentry, Plaintiff
No Logo Linda Steelman, Plaintiff
No Logo LWK Corporation, Plaintiff
No Logo Mad Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Mizzo, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Nancy Riesch, Plaintiff
No Logo Nancy Walker, Plaintiff
No Logo Professional World Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Red Bird Travel Service, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Rosemary D'Augusta, Plaintiff
No Logo Rozann Kunstle, Plaintiff
No Logo Sandy Russell, Plaintiff
No Logo Satellite Travel Systems, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Silhouette Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Stansbury Travel LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Stansbury Travel Ltd., Plaintiff
No Logo Steven P. Kunstle, Plaintiff
No Logo Talgood Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Talson, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Tam Travel, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alioto Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr. +1 415 434 8900 +1 415 434 9200 jaliotojr@aliotolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas J. Lawrence +1 415 434 8900 +1 415 434 9200

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John H Boone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H Boone +1 415 434 1133 +1 415 434 9200
No Logo TJ Kap, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Tour West Travel of American Fork, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Travel by Dana, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Travel Center, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Travel Goddess, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Travel King, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Travel Plus, Nar Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Travel Professionals, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Travel Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Uat, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Vidal Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Village Travel Services, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo WNMP Travel, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo World Traveler, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo AeroMexico, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica V. Ramallo-Young +1 213 620 7752 +1 213 687 0758
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Michael Rusche +1 213 620 7757 +1 213 687 0758 trusche@whitecase.com
No Logo Air Canada, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenney & Markowitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald S. Honigman +1 415 397 3100 +1 415 397 3170
No Logo Air France, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Reimann +1 215 751 2295 +1 215 751 2205 nreimann@schnader.com
Alaska Air Group, Inc. Alaska Air Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alaska Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo America West Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter K Huston +1 415 436 6660 +1 415 436 6687 peter.huston@usdoj.gov
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Officer/Director, AMR Corporation
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel S. Brass +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 986 5309 rbrass@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Arnold Nicoud, III +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 373 8306 tnicoud@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E. Weber +1 213 229 7597 +1 213 229 6597

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hugh E McKay +1 216 443 9000 hmckay@porterwright.com
No Logo Ata Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ata Airlines, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C. Buehler +1 317 240 7116

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David Wikstrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Hunt +1 216 696 9555 +1 216 241 6961 tbubbahunt@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Livingston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kymberly E. Speer +1 925 952 9880 +1 925 952 9881
No Logo British Airways Plc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/10/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Allen Fowkes +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 fowkes.joshua@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN J. HAGGERTY +1 216 345 7500 +1 216 345 7507 jhaggerty@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Eric Johnson +1 310 712 6600 +1 310 712 8800 johnsonee@sullcrom.com
No Logo Cathay Pacific Airlines, LTD., Defendant
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael C. Holmes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. Holmes +1 713 758 2222 +1 713 758 2346

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Arthur Reeder, Jr. +1 713 758 2202 +1 713 615 5947 jreeder@velaw.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
Officer/Director, Clear Secure, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com
No Logo Deutsche Lufthansa Ag, Defendant
No Logo Frontier Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Carson Perkins +1 303 607 3500 +1 303 607 3600 hperkins@faegre.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Shively +1 303 607 3500 +1 303 607 3600 jshively@faegre.com
No Logo Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Ivie +1 310 728 3326

Toggle Switch Represented by Hennigan Bennett & Dorman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Bennett +1 213 694 1200 +1 213 694 1234 bennettb@hbdlawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney P. Levinson +1 213 694 1200 +1 213 694 1234 levinsons@hbdlawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua David Morse +1 213 694 1200 +1 213 694 1234
No Logo Horizon Air Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Japan Airlines System Corporation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Klm Royal Dutch Airlines, Defendant
No Logo Mexicana Airlines, Defendant
No Logo Northwest Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Parker +1 216 621 0200 +1 216 696 0740 jparker@bakerlaw.com
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fidelis I. Agbapuruonwu +1 202 263 3868 +1 202 263 3300 fagbapuruonwu@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald M. Falk +1 650 331 2030 +1 650 331 2060 dfalk@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shirish Gupta +1 650 331 2000 +3312 331 331 2060 sgupta@mayerbrownrowe.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 15
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Order. For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion and Order the Court orders that the Defendants' Motions to dismiss be granted. Accordingly, the case is dismissed. (Related Doc. No. 60 ). Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 10/29/07.(S,R) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    Memorandum Opinion and Order granting Defendants' Motions to dismiss (Related Doc # 142,144,145,146,147,150,166 in case 1:03-30000). Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and the case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 10/29/07.(S,R) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
      Position Paper for September 5 2007 hearing filed by Tam Travel plaintiffs. (Alioto, Joseph) Modified on 9/5/2007 (S, R). (Entered: 09/04/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
        Motion for Motion of Non-Party Michael W. Gunn and Defendant American Airlines, Inc. to Modify the Tam Travel Plaintiffs' July 12, 2007 Subpoena filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support # 2 Exhibit A: Gunn Subpoena# 3 Exhibit B: Cover Page of Gunn Deposition Transcript in Hall)(McKay, Hugh) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
          Motion for extension of time to oppose defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings until August 6, 2007 filed by Tam Travel, Inc.. (Alioto, Joseph) Modified on 7/23/2007 (S, J). (Entered: 07/19/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
            Proposed Stipulation of Dimissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Air France only filed by Air France. (Reimann, Nicole) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
              Motion to continue April 23, 2007 CMC filed by Tam Travel, Inc.. (Alioto, Joseph) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                Position Statement re: Case Management Conference Agenda for April 23 CMC filed by Tam Travel, Inc.. (Alioto, Joseph) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None
                  Motion to attend Status Conference by telephone filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Perkins, Heather) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Stipulation and Order of dismissal with prejudice (Related Doc # 51 ). Defendant Cathay Pacific Airlines Ltd is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This dismissal with prejudice does not apply or have any effect as to any other defendant. Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 4/21/06. (S, R) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                      Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Cathay Pacific Airlines Ltd. filed by all plaintiffs. (Alioto, Jr., Joseph) Modified on 4/21/2006 (S, R). (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice as to defendant British Airways, PLC. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This dismissal with prejudice does not apply or have any effect whatsoever as to any other defendant (Related Doc. No. 49 ). Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 11/18/05. (S, R) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None
                          Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by British Airways, PLC. (Haggerty, John) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None
                            Request for Case Management Conference filed by all plaintiffs. (Alioto, Jr., Joseph) Modified on 8/19/2005 (S, R). (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                              Notice of discharge and entry of permanent injunction order with respect to plaintiffs' claims filed by Air Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2) (S, R) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
                                Submission of Unpublished Authority in Support of Motion for Protective Order filed by British Airways, PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Related Doc. No. 43 ) (Haggerty, John) Modified on 5/9/2005 (S, R). (Entered: 05/05/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
                                  Reply Memorandm of Law in Further Support of its Motion for a protective order filed by British Airways, PLC. Related document(s) 43 . (Haggerty, John) Modified on 5/9/2005 (S, R). (Entered: 05/05/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                    Memorandum in Opposition to defendant British Airways PLC's Motion for protective order Staying Discovery filed by Tam Travel, Inc. Related document(s) 43 . (Alioto, Jr., Joseph) Modified on 4/27/2005 (S, R). (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None
                                      Motion for protective order filed by British Airways, PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Haggerty, John) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Order of Dismissal. Case against defendants Aeromexico and Mexicana only, are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Related Doc. No. 41 ). Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 4/6/05. (S, R) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: None
                                          Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to defendants Aeromexico and Mexicana filed by Tam Travel, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Dismissing Mexicana and Aeromexico ONLY) (Alioto, Jr., Joseph) Modified on 3/21/2005 (S, R). (Entered: 03/18/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Petition filed by ATA Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Petition) (Hunt, Thomas) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Marginal Entry Order Granting Stipulation regarding confidentiality agreement and proposed order (Related Document No. 38 ). Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 11/16/04. (S, R) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                Stipulation Regarding Confidentiality Agreement; and Proposed Order Thereon filed by AeroMexico, Mexicana Airlines. (Rusche, Timothy) Modified on 11/10/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 11/09/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                  Notice of Appearance by Timothy M. Rusche filed on behalf of AeroMexico, Mexicana Airlines. (S, R) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                    Declaration of Timothy Rusche in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment filed by AeroMexico, Mexicana Airlines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Related Documents 31 , 32 ) (Ramallo-Young, Monica) Modified on 9/23/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 09/22/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                      Rule 7.1 Certification filed by AeroMexico, Mexicana Airlines. (Related Documents 31 , 32 ) (Ramallo-Young, Monica) Modified on 9/23/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 09/22/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                        Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AeroMexico, Mexicana Airlines. (Related Documents 31 , 32 ) (Ramallo-Young, Monica) Modified on 9/23/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 09/22/2004)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                          Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motions for Summary Judgment filed by AeroMexico, Mexicana Airlines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Ramallo-Young, Monica) (FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENTS NO. 34,36) Modified on 9/23/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 09/22/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                            Notice of Motion and Motion for summary judgment filed by Mexicana Airlines. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Antonio Martinez Salinas in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment# 2 Declaration of Hector Negrete in support of Motion for Summary Judgment# 3 Declaration of Carlos Gossio in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment# 4 Declaration of Timothy Rusche in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Ramallo-Young, Monica) Modified on 9/23/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 09/22/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                              Notice of Motion and Motion for summary judgment filed by AeroMexico. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Anthony H. Batista in support of motion for summary judgment# 2 Declaration of Francisco Contreras in Suport of Motion for Summary Judgment# 3 Declaration of Guillermo Briseno in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment# 4 Declaration of Timothy Rusche in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment)(Ramallo-Young, Monica) Modified on 9/23/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 09/22/2004)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                Reply memorandum of law in further support of its Motion to dismiss filed by British Airways, PLC. Related document(s) 16 . (Haggerty, John) Modified on 7/29/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 07/28/2004)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Shively, John) (Entered: 07/22/2004)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Northwest Airlines, Inc.. (Parker, John) (Entered: 07/20/2004)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. (Parker, John) (Entered: 07/20/2004)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by America West Airlines, Inc.. (S, R) (Entered: 07/16/2004)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          Opposition to defendant British Airways' Motion to dismiss filed by Tam Travel, Inc.. Related document(s) 16 . (Alioto, Jr., Joseph) Modified docket text on 7/15/2004, this document is not signed (R, N). (Entered: 07/14/2004)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            Answer to Complaint filed by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. (Parker, John) Modified on 7/12/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 07/09/2004)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash Service of Process and to Dismiss Complaint filed by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. Related document(s) 20 . (Parker, John) (Entered: 07/09/2004)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mexicana Airlines. (Ramallo-Young, Monica) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by AeroMexico. (Ramallo-Young, Monica) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                    Motion to quash Service of Process and to Dismiss Complaint filed by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of M.G. Schoonis)(Parker, John) (Motion terminated pursuant to notice 23 ) Modified on 7/12/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 06/18/2004)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by British Airways, PLC. (Haggerty, John) (Entered: 06/17/2004)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand 317267v1 (Related Doc # []) filed by Mexicana Airlines. (Ramallo-Young, Monica) Modified docket text on 6/17/2004 (R, N). (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand 317437v1 (Related Doc # 1 ) filed by AeroMexico. (Ramallo-Young, Monica) Modified docket text on 6/17/2004 (R, N). (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            Motion to dismiss filed by British Airways, PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support # 2 Declaration of Patricia Cyr in Support of Motion to Dismiss with accompanying Exhibits 1 through 7# 3 Proposed Order)(Haggerty, John) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc # 1 ) filed by American Airlines, Inc. (McKay, Hugh) Modified docket text on 6/3/2004 (R, N). (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                Answer to Complaint (Related Doc # 1 ) filed by America West Airlines, Inc. (R, N) Modified on 6/3/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Marginal Order granting Mexicana Airlines Stipulation for Extension of time until June 16, 2004 to answer complaint. Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 6/2/04. (S, R) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Marginal Order granting Motion for extension of time until June 16, 2004 to answer complaint (Related Doc # 9 ). Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 6/2/04.(S, R) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Answer to Complaint (Related Doc # 1 ) filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (R, N) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Answer to Complaint (Related Doc # 1 ) filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc. (Shively, John) Modified on 6/3/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Motion for extension of time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Complaint on or before 6/16/04 filed by British Airways, PLC. (Haggerty, John) Modified docket text on 6/2/2004 (R, N). (Entered: 06/01/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Proposed Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint until 6/16/04 filed by AeroMexico, Mexicana Airlines. (Ramallo-Young, Monica) Modified docket text on 6/1/2004 (R, N). (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Motion for leave to Substitute Counsel filed by British Airways, PLC. (Haggerty, John) (Entered: 05/27/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Errata to Complaint for Violations of Section 1 of the Sherman Antitrust Act filed by Tam Travel, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint with incorporated corrections)(Alioto, Jr., Joseph) Modified on 5/27/2004 (S, R). (Entered: 05/26/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Marginal Entry Order granting stipulated notice of dismissal of defendant Deutsche Lufthansa AG pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 3/9/04. (S, R) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Attorney Appearance of John J. Haggerty and Joshua A. Fowkes by Joshua A. Fowkes filed by on behalf of British Airways, PLC. (Fowkes, Joshua) Modified on 1/9/2004, adding Attorney Haggerty to the docket (R, N). (Entered: 01/08/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of defendant Deutsche Lufthansa AG filed by all plaintiffs. (S, R) (Entered: 01/07/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Order: Case has been settled and dismissed, with prejudice as to defendant Japan Airlines. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 12/17/03. (S, R) (Entered: 12/30/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Transfer Order by Wm. Terrell Hodges, Chairman of Panel transferring case, pursuant 28:1407 from the Northern District of California to the Northern District of Ohio. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint# 2 Docket Sheet)(S, R) (Entered: 12/30/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?