Limoges v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:15-cv-00616

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 6:32 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Case Management Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Interested persons order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER adopting 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by US Department of Homeland Security, Social Security Administration. The Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file an Amended Complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/21/2015. (MMW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by US Department of Homeland Security, Social Security Administration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/2/2015. (Smith, Thomas)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Interested persons order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Interested persons order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?