White v. US Bankruptcy Court et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:05-cv-40104-FDS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 30, 2017 at 9:57 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert White, Petitioner
No Logo Henry J. Boroff, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Damian W. Wilmot +1 617 570 1368 +1 617 523 1231 dwilmot@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Local or Federal Jail or Prison where petitioner is held, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Damian W. Wilmot +1 617 570 1368 +1 617 523 1231 dwilmot@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo United States Courts, Respondent
Officially listed as "US Bankruptcy Court"

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Damian W. Wilmot +1 617 570 1368 +1 617 523 1231 dwilmot@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo US Federal Marshal for the District of Massachusetts, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Damian W. Wilmot +1 617 570 1368 +1 617 523 1231 dwilmot@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Joseph B. Collins, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher M. Candon +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 candon@cwg11.com
Space Michael J. Goldberg +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 goldberg@cwg11.com
Office Worcester
Filed 6/28/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County Worcester
Terminated 12/29/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-1188'['First Circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006, Terminated: 12/14/2006 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [18] Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert White, (Ramos, Jeanette)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Appeal Record Returned
    Appeal Record Returned: [18] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
      LREF
      Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006, Terminated: 12/14/2006 USCA Judgment
      USCA Judgment as to[18] Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert White. Essentially for the reasons given by the district court in its memorandum and order, dated August 10, 2006, petitioner's request for a certificate of appealability is DENIED and this appeal is TERMINATED. Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED AS MOOT. (Ramos, Jeanette)
        LREF
        Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Order on Motion for Certificate of AppealabilityCourt Filing
        Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: MEMORANDUM ORDER entered denying [17] Motion for Certificate of Appealability, denying [20] Motion for Certificate of Appealability, denying [23] Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, dismissing [25] Motion for Writ of Mandamus. (Castles, Martin)
          LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 10/30/2006 USCA Order
          ORDER of USCA as to [18] Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert White...Accordingly, we direct petitioner-appellant to file a status report in this court by June 22, 2006, and every thirty days thereafter, advising us of the status of the motion for a certificate of appealability. (Ramos, Jeanette)
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Goldberg on behalf of Joseph B. Collins (Goldberg, Michael)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: document #28 corrected because: wrong document attached (Hassett, Kathy)
                LREF
                Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Candon on behalf of Joseph B. Collins (Candon, Christopher) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2006 (Hassett, Kathy).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [25] MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Robert White, c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Opposition to Motion
                    Opposition re [25] MOTION for Writ of Mandamus w/Certificate of Service filed by Joseph B. Collins. (Candon, Christopher)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion for Writ of Mandamus
                      MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Robert White, c/s.(Jones, Sherry)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Financial Affidavit
                        FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Robert White. (Jones, Sherry)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
                          MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Robert White, c/s.(Jones, Sherry)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006, Terminated: 10/30/2006 USCA Case Number
                            USCA Case Number 06-1188 for [18] Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert White,. (Ramos, Jeanette)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006, Terminated: 10/30/2006 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                              Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [18] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion for Certificate of Appealability
                                AMENDED MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Robert White, c/s.(Jones, Sherry)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert White re [17] MOTION for Certificate of Appealability, [18] Notice of Appeal. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006, Terminated: 10/30/2006 Notice of Appeal
                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [15] Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Robert White. No fee enclosed. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 2/1/2006. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion for Certificate of Appealability
                                      MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Robert White.(Hassett, Kathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2006 (Hassett, Kathy).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                        Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. re: [14] MOTION for Reconsideration re [13] Order Dismissing Case filed by Robert White. (Castles, Martin)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                          Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying [14] Motion for Reconsideration. (Castles, Martin)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006, Terminated: 1/5/2006 Motion for Reconsideration
                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re [13] Order Dismissing Case by Robert White, c/s.(Jones, Sherry)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                              Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE.(Castles, Martin)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Response to Motion
                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [7] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert White, c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                  Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: document #9 corrected because: Attorney filed document as a Notice, should be filed as a Motion; Court correctly filed as document #11 (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                    Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: document #8 corrected because: Attorney filed document as a response, should be filed as a memorandum; court refiled correctly as document #10 (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                      NOTICE of Release AND MOTION to Dismiss by US Bankruptcy Court, Henry J. Boroff, US Federal Marshal for the District of Massachusetts, Local or Federal Jail or Prison where petitioner is held, c/s. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A # (2) Exhibit B)(Hassett, Kathy)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE by US Bankruptcy Court, Henry J. Boroff, US Federal Marshal for the District of Massachusetts, Local or Federal Jail or Prison where petitioner is held OF RELEASE AND MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Wilmot, Damian)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [7] MOTION to Dismiss filed by US Bankruptcy Court, Henry J. Boroff, US Federal Marshal for the District of Massachusetts, Local or Federal Jail or Prison where petitioner is held. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A # (2) Exhibit B)(Hassett, Kathy)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005, Terminated: 12/29/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by US Bankruptcy Court, Henry J. Boroff, US Federal Marshal for the District of Massachusetts, Local or Federal Jail or Prison where petitioner is held.(Wilmot, Damian)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005, Terminated: 12/29/2005 Motion to Amend
                                                              MOTION to file third Amendment [1] Petition for writ of habeas corpus (28:2254) by Robert White.(Jones, Sherry)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [7] MOTION to Dismiss filed by US Bankruptcy Court, Henry J. Boroff, US Federal Marshal for the District of Massachusetts, Local or Federal Jail or Prison where petitioner is held. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Wilmot, Damian)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005, Terminated: 12/29/2005 Motion to Amend
                                                                  MOTION to Amend [1] Petition for writ of habeas corpus (28:2254) by Robert White.(Jones, Sherry)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005, Terminated: 12/29/2005 Motion to Amend
                                                                    MOTION to Amend [1] Petition for writ of habeas corpus (28:2254) by Robert White.(Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Service Order - 2254 PetitionCourt Filing
                                                                      Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 20 days of rcpt of this order.(Castles, Martin)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert White re [1] Petition for writ of habeas corpus (28:2254). (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Petition for writ of habeas corpus (28:2254)
                                                                          PETITION for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28:2254 $ 5, receipt number 404596, filed by Robert White.(Jones, Sherry)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?