Donley et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Southern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00655
District Judge J Phil Gilbert, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 3:19 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo James E. Donley, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ezra & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/04/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B. Ramsey +1 618 346 1000 +1 618 346 0650 bob@ezralaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by James E. Donley, Sr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Donley, Sr.
No Logo Tanna R. Donley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ezra & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/04/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B. Ramsey +1 618 346 1000 +1 618 346 0650 bob@ezralaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tanna R. Donley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanna R. Donley
v.
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of America"
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Lathrop & Gage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Clithero +1 314 613 2800 +1 314 613 2801 mclithero@lathropgage.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew A. Jacober +1 314 613 2502 +1 314 613 2250 mjacober@lathropgage.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alicia Michelle Kerr +1 314 613 2821 akerr@lathropgage.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Noonan & Lieberman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/10/2014 Robert E Haney +1 312 431 1455 +1 312 431 1456 RHaney@noonanandlieberman.com
TERMINATED: 07/10/2014 James V. Noonan +1 312 431 1455 jnoonan@noonanandlieberman.com
No Logo Bank of New York Mellon, The, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noonan & Lieberman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E Haney +1 312 431 1455 +1 312 431 1456 RHaney@noonanandlieberman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James V. Noonan +1 312 431 1455 jnoonan@noonanandlieberman.com
No Logo Bayview Loan Servicing, Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noonan & Lieberman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E Haney +1 312 431 1455 +1 312 431 1456 RHaney@noonanandlieberman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James V. Noonan +1 312 431 1455 jnoonan@noonanandlieberman.com
No Logo Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pilgrim Christakis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anna-Katrina S Christakis +1 312 939 6580 kchristakis@pilgrimchristakis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sulejman F. Dizdarevic +1 312 361 3457 +1 312 939 0983 sdizdarevic@pilgrimchristakis.com
No Logo Golden Oak Lending, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore R. Bynum, III +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 t.r.bynum@huschblackwell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Heuer +1 314 345 6437 +1 314 480 1505 jeff.heuer@huschblackwell.com
No Logo HSBC, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lathrop & Gage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Clithero +1 314 613 2800 +1 314 613 2801 mclithero@lathropgage.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew A. Jacober +1 314 613 2502 +1 314 613 2250 mjacober@lathropgage.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alicia Michelle Kerr +1 314 613 2821 akerr@lathropgage.com
No Logo Richard Rodawald, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Clerks JudgmentCourt Filing
CLERK'S JUDGMENT closing case and dismissing without prejudice approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/29/15. (rah) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court GRANTS Defendants Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee, and Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC's Motion (Doc. 72 ) to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(b) and DISMISSES this matter. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/29/2015. (jdh) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Status Conference held on 1/6/2015. Plaintiffs fail to appear. Robert Haney for Bank of NY Mellon and Bayview. Michael Clithero for Bank of America and MERS. T.R. Bynum for Golden Oak. Sulejman Dizdarevic for Decision One. Defendants have had no contact with Plaintiffs nor any counsel purporting to act on Plaintiffs behalf. Status Conference set for 5/8/2015 at 2:30 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams should any matters remain pending at that time. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted enter Security Code 9467. (Court Reporter n/a.) (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/08/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Clithero on behalf of Bank of America, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Clithero, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(b) by Bank of New York Mellon, The. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Haney, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
            ORDER granting 62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert B. Ramsey terminated. Ramsey shall send a copy of this Order to Plaintiffs within 7 days. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to James and Tanna Donley, P.O. Box 270, Waterloo, IL 62298. Plaintiff shall retain new counsel or indicate that they will proceed pro-se within 21 days or on or before November 25, 2014. Plaintiff's response to the pending Motion to Dismiss now due December 29, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 11/04/2014. (jcp) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2014 re 62 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs filed by Tanna R. Donley, James E. Donley, Sr. Robert Ramsey and D. Jeffrey Ezra appear in support of Ramsey's Motion to Withdraw. Theodore Bynum appears for Defendant Golden Oak Lending. Plaintiffs fail to appear. The Motion will be GRANTED. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents
                NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 61 Initial Disclosures filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, as discovery is not filed with the court. (myz)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 67 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Golden Oak Lending, Inc.. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                    MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Golden Oak Lending, Inc.. Responses due by 11/24/2014 (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Order on Motion to SupplementCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 65 Motion to Supplement. JLB shall be deemed to have timely filed a responsive pleading pursuant to FRCP 81. However, as the state court pleadings are not in the record, JLB shall file them in this case instanter and certainly no later than October 28, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/21/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 Motion to Supplement
                        MOTION to Supplement the Removal Record by Golden Oak Lending, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - part 2)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 62 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs : Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 at 3:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Counsel for Defendant may appear in person or via conference call. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted enter Security Code 9467. (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE by James E. Donley, Sr, Tanna R. Donley re 62 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs (Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs by James E. Donley, Sr, Tanna R. Donley. (Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Designations and Objections
                                ENTRY STRICKEN - RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byBank of America, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Kerr, Alicia) Modified on 10/23/2014 (myz). (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/31/2014 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/11/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/18/2015. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 9/29/14. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Report of the Parties)(amv) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Status Conference held on 9/26/2014. Robert Ramsey for Plaintiff. Robert Haney, Slejman Dizdarevic, Alicia Kerr and TR Bynum for various defendants. Parties jointly request a January 2016 trial month. The Court will address that issue with the district judge. If the trial date is moved the court will enter a modified scheduling order as agreed to by the parties at the scheduling conference. Status Conference set for 1/6/2015 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted enter Security Code 9467. (Court Reporter n/a.) (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Discovery Hearing held on 9/18/2014. Scheduling/Discovery Conference reset for 9/26/2014 at 3:00 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams in order to give the parties additional time to prepare proposed scheduling order. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 888-684-8852; when prompted enter Access Code 6049846; and when prompted enter Security Code 9467. (Court Reporter n/a.) (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Sulejman Dizdarevic on behalf of Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC (Dizdarevic, Sulejman) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Notice of Scheduling and Discovery ConferenceCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 9/17/2014 at 4:00 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/4/2014 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC filed by James E. Donley, Sr, Tanna R. Donley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 43 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Bank of New York Mellon and Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC filed by James E. Donley, Sr, Tanna R. Donley. (Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Kerr, Alicia) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Response to Motion
                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 41 MOTION to Remand Renewed filed by Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC. (Dizdarevic, Sulejman) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/18/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Bank of America and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. filed by James E. Donley, Sr, Tanna R. Donley. (Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 CJRA TrackCourt Filing
                                                        CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2015 at 09:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2015 at 09:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/13/2014. (kjr, ) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Having denied Defendants' requests to stay their time to respond to the Complaint, the Court also declines to stay Plaintiff's time to respond to the pending Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall respond to the pending Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 08/07/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: 8/6/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss and 43 Motion to Dismiss and 45 Motion to Dismiss Pending Ruling on Motion to Remand by James E. Donley, Sr, Tanna R. Donley. (Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC. Responses due by 9/5/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Adjustable Rate Note, # 2 Exhibit Mortgage, # 3 Exhibit Complaint for Foreclosure of Mortgage)(Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Exhibit
                                                                  EXHIBIT by Bank of New York Mellon, The, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. Exhibit to 43 Motion to Dismiss . (Haney, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of New York Mellon, The, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. Responses due by 9/2/2014 (Haney, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 MOTION to Remand Renewed Renewed filed by James E. Donley, Sr, Tanna R. Donley. (Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Motion to Remand
                                                                        MOTION to Remand Renewed by James E. Donley, Sr, Tanna R. Donley. Responses due by 8/25/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanna R. Donley, James E. Donley, Sr. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. served on 6/25/2014, answer due 7/16/2014. (Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of America, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Kerr, Alicia) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of America, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2014 (Kerr, Alicia) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Kerr, Alicia) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court declines to extend the time to file a responsive pleading until after the motion to remand has been ruled on. However, the Court grants Defendant Decision One an extension of time of twenty-one (21) days or on or before August 1, 2014 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 07/11/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                    Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) by Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court declines to extend the time to file a responsive pleading until after the motion to remand has been ruled on. However, the Court grants Defendants Bank of New York Mellon and Bayview Loan Servicing LLC an extension of time of twenty-one (21) days or on or before July 31, 2014 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 07/10/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert E Haney and James V. Noonan terminated for Defendant Bank of America; granting 30 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 07/10/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia M Kerr on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Kerr, Alicia) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Jacober on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Jacober, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw Appearance for Bank of America by Bank of America. (Noonan, James) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Bank of America by Bank of America. (Haney, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 25 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bank of New York Mellon, The, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Haney, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC AMENDED from Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, Illinois, case number 2014 L 575. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Adjustable Rate, # 3 Exhibit Mortgage, # 4 Exhibit Complaint for Foreclosure, # 5 Exhibit Officer's Affidavit of Service, # 6 Exhibit Consent to Removal - Bynum, # 7 Exhibit Consent to Removal - Haney)(Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 25 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by James E. Donley, Sr, Tanna R. Donley. (Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Motion to Remand to State Court
                                                                                                        MOTION to Remand to State Court by James E. Donley, Sr, Tanna R. Donley. Responses due by 8/4/2014 (Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia M Kerr on behalf of Bank of America (Kerr, Alicia) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Jacober on behalf of Bank of America (Jacober, Matthew) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: 6/24/2014 Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents
                                                                                                              NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 20 Summons Returned Executed filed by Tanna R. Donley, James E. Donley, Sr. Incorrect document attached to entry. Filer attached an Affidavit of Service from State Court; however, the filer should have attached the proof of service from the Summons issued in Federal Court. Upon reviewing the case, no summons has been issued for HSBC, Inc., in our Federal Court. Docket entry is STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. No further action required by the filer as to this document. (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: 6/24/2014 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, re: jurisidctional defect. (Amended pleading due by 7/8/2014.) Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/24/2014. (jdh) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                  ENTRY STRICKEN - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tanna R. Donley, James E. Donley, Sr. HSBC, Inc. served on 6/11/2014, answer due 7/2/2014. (Ramsey, Robert) Modified on 6/24/2014 (tkm ). (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: 6/19/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of New York Mellon, The identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon, The. (Haney, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: 6/19/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation for Bank of America. (Haney, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: 6/19/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bayview Financial, L.P. for Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Haney, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: 6/18/2014 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          Alias Summons Issued as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (jaj) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 return of service unexecuted
                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED by Tanna R. Donley, James E. Donley, Sr, Summons Returned Unexecuted by Tanna R. Donley, James E. Donley, Sr as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Ramsey, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown and by agreement of the parties, Defendants Bank of New York Melllon, Bank of America and Bayview Loan Servicing LLC, and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. are granted an extension of time, up to and including July 16, 2014, in which to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 06/17/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed) by Bank of America, Bank of New York Mellon, The, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Haney, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E Haney on behalf of Bank of America, Bank of New York Mellon, The, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (Haney, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James V. Noonan on behalf of Bank of America, Bank of New York Mellon, The, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (Noonan, James) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: 6/12/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown and by agreement of the parties, Defendant Decision One Mortgage Company's time to file a responsive pleading is extended until July 11, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 06/12/2014. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (UNOPPOSED) by Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Heuer on behalf of Golden Oak Lending, Inc. (Heuer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT by Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC. Exhibit to 2 Notice of Removal,, (Civil Cover Sheet). (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Oak Lending, Inc.. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore R. Bynum on behalf of Golden Oak Lending, Inc. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Notice of Deficiencies
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re 2 Notice of Removal, filed by Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC. A Civil Cover Sheet was not attached to the Notice of Removal. Filer should complete the Civil Cover Sheet and file same as soon as possible using the event "Exhibit," and link said Document back to the Complaint. (kek) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2310914) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Adjustable Rate Note, # 3 Exhibit Mortgage, # 4 Exhibit Complaint for Foreclosure of Mortgage, # 5 Exhibit Officer's Affidavit of Service, # 6 Exhibit Consent to Removal as to Defendant JLB Corporation, # 7 Exhibit Consent to Removal as to Defendants The Bank of New York Mellon and Bayview Loan Servicing)(Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 Case OpenedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 14-655-JPG-SCW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(tkm ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?