Alvarenga et al v. Riordan et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11390-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gladys Fuentes, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Masferrer & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eduardo A. Masferrer +1 617 531 0135 +1 617 531 0136 masferrer@madefenders.com
No Logo Mauricio Antonio Alvarenga, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Masferrer & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eduardo A. Masferrer +1 617 531 0135 +1 617 531 0136 masferrer@madefenders.com
v.
No Logo Denis Riordan, Respondent
No Logo Eduardo Aguirre, Jr., Respondent
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Boston
Filed 6/30/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 540 - Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Suffolk
Terminated 7/22/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Order on Motion to Vacate
Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered denying [5] Motion to Vacate the Dismissal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Abaid, Kim) Modified on 11/4/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
    MEMORANDUM in Support re [5] MOTION to Vacate the Dismissal of This Action for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Michael Chertoff. (Grady, Mark)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005, Terminated: 11/2/2005 Motion to Vacate
      MOTION to Vacate the Dismissal of This Action for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Michael Chertoff.(Grady, Mark)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Order Dismissing Case
        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Lovett, Zita)
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Opposition to Motion
          Opposition re [2] MOTION to Stay filed by Michael Chertoff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Appeal Docket# (2) Exhibit 2 - Conviction and Police Report# (3) Exhibit 3 - IJ Decision# (4) Exhibit 4 - BIA Decision)(Grady, Mark)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Order on Motion to Stay
            Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered the Court having no jurisdiction, the Courtdenyies [2] Motion to Stay. (Lovett, Zita)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
              Filing fee: $ 250.00, receipt number 65329 regarding Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Patch, Christine)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION to Stay Removal Pending Adjudicaiton of I-130 Petition filed by Mauricio Antonio Alvarenga, Gladys Fuentes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Abaid, Kim)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Motion to Stay
                  MOTION to Stay of Removal Pending Adjudication of I-130 Petition by Mauricio Antonio Alvarenga, Gladys Fuentes.(Abaid, Kim)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Complaint
                    Petition for Writ of Mandamus against Denis Riordan, Eduardo Aguirre, Jr, Michael Chertoff Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 65329, filed by Mauricio Antonio Alvarenga, Gladys Fuentes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Abaid, Kim)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Summons Issued as to USA
                      Summons Issued as to Denis Riordan, Eduardo Aguirre, Jr, Michael Chertoff, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Abaid, Kim)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Abaid, Kim)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 30 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?