AGA Fishing Group Limited v. Brown & Brown, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11396-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AGA Fishing Group Limited, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joseph G. Abromovitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph G. Abromovitz +1 781 329 1080 +3262 326 326 2157 jga@jga-pc.com
v.
No Logo Brown and Brown, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peabody & Arnold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terri L. Pastori +1 617 951 2041 +1 617 951 2125 tpastori@peabodyarnold.com
Space Michael J. Stone +1 617 951 2100 mstone@peabodyarnold.com
No Logo Flagship Group Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peabody & Arnold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terri L. Pastori +1 617 951 2041 +1 617 951 2125 tpastori@peabodyarnold.com
Space Michael J. Stone +1 617 951 2100 mstone@peabodyarnold.com
Office Boston
Filed 7/1/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 120 - Contract: Marine
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Suffolk
Terminated 8/8/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-2408'['First Circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 65 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [60] Notice of Appeal, filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. Mandate issued in the USCA 8/19/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette)
    LREF
    Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 USCA Opinion
    OPINION of USCA. Opinion issued in the USCA 7/10/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette)
      LREF
      Legal Document 63 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 USCA Judgment
      USCA Judgment as to[60] Notice of Appeal, filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. This cause came on to be heard on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The district court's grant of summary judgment in favor of Defendants is affirmed. Judgment issued in the USCA 7/10/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette)
        LREF
        Legal Document 62 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 USCA Case Number
        USCA Case Number 07-2408 for [60] Notice of Appeal, filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Ramos, Jeanette)
          LREF
          Legal Document 61 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
          Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [60] Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # (1))(Ramos, Jeanette)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Filing Fee/Payment Received
            Filing fee: $ 455.00, receipt number 82063 for [60] Notice of Appeal, (Abaid, Kimberly)
              LREF
              Legal Document 60 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007, Terminated: 7/11/2008 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order on Motion for Reconsideration, [55] Judgment by AGA Fishing Group Limited NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals.Appeal Record due by 9/17/2007. (Abromovitz, Joseph)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered denying [56] Motion for Reconsideration (Lovett, Zita)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Opposition to Motion
                  Opposition re [56] MOTION for Reconsideration re [53] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, [54] Memorandum & ORDER, [55] Judgment and Request for Oral Argument filed by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited. (Pastori, Terri)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [56] MOTION for Reconsideration re [53] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, [54] Memorandum & ORDER, [55] Judgment and Request for Oral Argument filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Abromovitz, Joseph)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007, Terminated: 8/24/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                      MOTION for Reconsideration re [53] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, [54] Memorandum & ORDER, [55] Judgment and Request for Oral Argument by AGA Fishing Group Limited.(Abromovitz, Joseph)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of the Defendants (Abaid, Kimberly)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM.(Abaid, Kimberly)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered - [41] Motion for Summary Judgment is ALLOWED. [51] Motion to Strike Affidavit of Ronald Walsh is DENIED AS MOOT. Trial scheduled for August 6, 2007 is CANCELLED. A Memorandum will issue. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Motion Hearing
                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2007 re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Flagship Group Limited, Brown & Brown, Inc. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Carol Scott.) (Lovett, Zita)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing :Summary Judgment Motion set for 7/26/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                  Opposition re [51] MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Ronald Walsh filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007, Terminated: 7/30/2007 Motion to Strike
                                    MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Ronald Walsh by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Stone, Michael)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Affidavit in Support
                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [49] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, [48] Opposition to Motion. (Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit 18)(Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                          Statement of Undisputed Facts and Response to [41] Statement of Undisputed Material Facts filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Abromovitz, Joseph) Modified on 6/20/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re Trial. Jury Trial set for 8/6/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro.(Abaid, Kimberly)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [46] Motion for Extension of Time to June 19, 2007. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007, Terminated: 6/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to June 19, 2007 to file opposition to defendants' summary judgment motion by AGA Fishing Group Limited.(Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Exhibit
                                                  EXHIBIT re [42] Memorandum in Support of Motion by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Pastori, Terri)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Terri L. Pastori filed by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H)(Pastori, Terri)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                      Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Undisputed) filed by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited. (Pastori, Terri)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [41] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited. (Pastori, Terri)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007, Terminated: 7/30/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited.(Pastori, Terri)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Amended Document
                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT by AGA Fishing Group Limited. Correction to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Claim That Consequential Damages, Including Lost Profits, Is the Appropriate Measure of Damages. (Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Affidavit in Support
                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re [38] Response by Defendant to Plaintiff's Damage Memorandum. (Pastori, Terri)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Response
                                                                Response by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited to [36] Memorandum of Law For Damages and Hearing Requested. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Pastori, Terri)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [37] Motion to Continue Jury Trial set for 8/6/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007, Terminated: 4/4/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Continue Trial to August 6, 2007 Due to Scheduling Conflicts of Witnesses by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited.(Pastori, Terri)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Memorandum of Law
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6))(Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered re: DISCOVERY. Defendants shall designate their experts by May 21, 2007. Defendants may serve the requested subpoenas. No further discovery, including expert depositions, shall be conducted without leave of the court. Parties may move for Summary Judgment at any time. Plaintiff shall promptly file a motion for a ruling on the question of the applicable measure of damages. Trial will commence on June 25, 2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                          ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/20/2007. Trial set for June 25, 2007. (Court Reporter Marcia Patrisso.) (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE: CHANGE IN TIME: the conference set for tomorrow 3/20 is now set for 10:15 A.M. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Notice Resetting/Cancelling Deadline
                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting or Cancelling Hearing. Hearing rescheduled or cancelled: 3/13/2007 to: 3/20/2007 at 10:30 a.m. (the conference set for 3/13/2007 is cancelled). (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2007 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (THE CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/8/2007 AT 2:15 IS CANCELLED)(Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                  JOINT PROPOSED AGENDA FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by AGA Fishing Group Limited, Brown & Brown, Inc., and Flagship Group Limited. (Abromovitz, Joseph) Modified on 3/5/2007 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Notice Resetting/Cancelling Deadline
                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting or Cancelling Hearing. Hearing rescheduled or cancelled: 3/6/2007 to: 3/8/2007 at 2:15 p.m. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited.(Pastori, Terri)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Terri L. Pastori of Patrick J. Dolan (Pastori, Terri)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Terri L. Pastori on behalf of Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited (Pastori, Terri)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                                                                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [30] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to 1/31/07;the conference scheduled for 11/27/2006 is cancelled; a pre-trial conference will be held on March 6, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES WILL BE GRANTED. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to January 31, 2007 to Complete Discovery and reschedule status conference from November 27, 2006 to February or March, 2007 by Brown & Brown, Inc..(Stone, Michael)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered denying [27] Motion for Protective Order (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Opposition re [27] MOTION for Protective Order filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [27] MOTION for Protective Order by Brown & Brown, Inc. by Brown & Brown, Inc.. Related document: [27] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Brown & Brown, Inc.,.(Dolan, Patrick)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006, Terminated: 8/30/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Brown & Brown, Inc..(Dolan, Patrick)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Order on Motion to Amend
                                                                                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [20] Motion to Amend Complaint. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                            Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re [20] MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [25] Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006, Terminated: 7/26/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint by AGA Fishing Group Limited.(Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                  Opposition re [20] MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by all defendants. (Dolan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [21] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [20] MOTION to Amend Complaint, [22] Amended Complaint by Joseph G. Abromovitz on behalf of AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited.(Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [20] MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006, Terminated: 8/7/2006 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend Complaint by AGA Fishing Group Limited.(Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Order on Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered [17] Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to re-filing with Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(2). (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT against AGA Fishing Group Limited, filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited.(Abromovitz, Joseph) Modified on 6/20/2006 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [17] MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006, Terminated: 6/20/2006 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend Complaint by AGA Fishing Group Limited.(Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered re: DISCOVERY. The Parties must complete the listed depositions by October 31, 2006. Plaintiff has until October 31, 2006 to designate expert witnesses. A Pretrial Conference will be held on November 27, 2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                                                                                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/6/2006. Additional discovery Allowed (seeorder for details); a further conference is scheduled for November 27, 2006at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Carol Scott.) (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered re: DISCOVERY. All listed depositions must be completed by May 31, 2006. A Further Conference will be held on June 6, 2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by AGA Fishing Group Limited.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Document disclosure
                                                                                                                                            Document disclosure by AGA Fishing Group Limited.(Abromovitz, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited.(Dolan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Document disclosure
                                                                                                                                                Document disclosure by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited.(Dolan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATEMENT of counsel. (Dolan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : RULE 26 DISCOVERY ORDER entered. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2005 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brown & Brown, Inc.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flagship Group Limited. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                              ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. Flagship Group Limited served on 7/18/2005, answer due 8/8/2005. Acknowledgement filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. Brown & Brown, Inc. served on 7/18/2005, answer due 8/8/2005. Acknowledgement filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Dolan, Michael J. Stone on behalf of Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Flagship Group Limited, Brown & Brown, Inc. Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 65343, filed by AGA Fishing Group Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Brown & Brown, Inc., Flagship Group Limited. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?