E.F. v. America West Airlines, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11391-GAO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EF, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Stopa +1 508 543 0600 +1 508 543 0615 mtstopa@verizon.net
v.
No Logo America West Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carey L. Bertrand +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 carey.bertrand@wilsonelser.com
Space Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
Office Boston
Filed 7/1/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Barnstable
Terminated 1/24/2007
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV2005-00665[Plymouth County Superior Court]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by America West Airlines, Inc.. (Bertrand, Carey)
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 OrderCourt Filing
    Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Endorsement on Order ORDER entered. re [15] Settlement Agreement filed by E.F., (Lyness, Paul)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Lyness, Paul)
        LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Settlement Agreement
        SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Petition pursuant to M.G.L. c. 152, s. 15 and c. 231 s. 140c1/2 by E.F.. (Stopa, Mark)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Notice of Hearing.
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : Status Conference set for 1/24/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly. (Lyness, Paul)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Order on Motion for Discovery
            Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion for Discovery (Lyness, Paul)
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006, Terminated: 9/15/2006 Motion for Discovery
              Assented to MOTION for Discovery , Leave to Conduct Discovery by America West Airlines, Inc..(Bertrand, Carey)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Li
                Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Electronic ORDER entered denying [11] Motion to Appoint ad Litem. (Lyness, Paul)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  First MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [11] MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by E.F.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of Gina Figaratto)(Stopa, Mark)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Status Conference
                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Status Conference held on 7/12/2006. Court GRANTS Motion [12] for extension of time. Plaintiff's opposition due 7/13/06. Court informs parties that it will hold off on its decision on Motion [11] for appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for three (3) weeks pending settlement discussion. Motions terminated: [12] First MOTION for Extension of Time to July 13, 2006 to File Opposition to Motion for Appointment of Guardian filed by E.F. (Court Reporter Shelly Killian.) (Edge, Eugenia)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006, Terminated: 7/12/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to July 13, 2006 to File Opposition to Motion for Appointment of Guardian by E.F..(Stopa, Mark)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem
                        MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by America West Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Carey Bertrand)(Bertrand, Carey)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Mark T. Stopa for Attorney Matthew Donnelly (Stopa, Mark)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Remark
                            Remark- Pursuant to the scheduling conference held on 1/24/06, a status conference is scheduled for Wednesday, July 12, 2006 at 2:00pm. (Lyness, Paul)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Stopa on behalf of E.F. (Stopa, Mark)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Scheduling Conference
                                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 1/24/2006. Joint Statement adopted by Court. Fact Discovery due by 6/30/06. Status Conference set for 7/12/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.. (Court Reporter Shelly Killian.) (Edge, Eugenia)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Joint submission
                                  JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by E.F., America West Airlines, Inc..(Bertrand, Carey)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Certificate of Consultation
                                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Carey Louise Bertrand on behalf of America West Airlines, Inc.. (Bertrand, Carey)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly. (Lyness, Paul)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 E-mail Notice Returned
                                        E-Mail Notice returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Matthew James Donnelly. Attorney Donnelly contacted, ECF system updated with proper email address, and notice resent this date. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by America West Airlines, Inc.. (Bertrand, Carey)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 state court record
                                            **SEALED** STATE COURT Record. (Edge, Eugenia)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by America West Airlines, Inc. c/s. (Edge, Eugenia)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Answer
                                                ANSWER to Complaint by America West Airlines, Inc..c/s(Edge, Eugenia) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2005 (Edge, Eugenia).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Notice of Removal
                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by America West Airlines, Inc. from Plymouth Superior Court, case number CV2005-0665. $ 250, receipt number 65333, filed by America West Airlines, Inc..(Edge, Eugenia) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2005 (Edge, Eugenia). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2005 (Edge, Eugenia). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2005 (Edge, Eugenia).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                    If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Edge, Eugenia)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?