USA v. Tunnell
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cr-10168-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam J. Bookbinder +1 617 748 3112 +1 617 748 3960 adam.bookbinder@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Boston
Filed 7/6/2005
County Middlesex
Terminated 7/20/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) FRAUD AND FALSE STATEMENTS
Def Custody Status
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Mail Returned
Return receipt received for mail sent to USDC of Birmingham, Alabama Delivered on 9/8/06 as to Daniel Tunnell (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Transfer Out/Probationer
    Probation Jurisdiction Transferred to Northern District of Alabama as to Daniel Tunnell Transmitted Transfer of Jurisdiction form, with certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet. (Nici, Richard)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Satisfaction of Judgment
      SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to Daniel Tunnell (Donato, Christopher)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Memorandum (not related to a motion)
        Memorandum regarding Tranfer of Jurisdiction as to Daniel Tunnell (Nici, Richard). Mail signed tranfers.
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Daniel Tunnell (1), Count(s) 1, Defendant sentenced to 24 months Probation with standard and special conditions. Special Assessment of $100. Fine of $10,000. Restitution to IRS of $27,189.00. (Nici, Richard)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Sentencing
            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock :Sentencing held on 7/20/2006 for Daniel Tunnell (1), Count(s) 1, Defendant sentenced to 24 months Probation with standard and special conditions. Special Assessment of $100. Fine of $10,000. Restitution to IRS of $27,189.00. (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
              LREF
              Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Sentencing Memorandum
              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Daniel Tunnell (Bookbinder, Adam)
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Sentencing Memorandum
                SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Daniel Tunnell (Pearlstein, Mark)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [10] Motion to Continue as to Daniel Tunnell (1). Sentencing reset for 7/20/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Motion to Continue
                    MOTION to Continue sentencing to July 14, 2006 as to Daniel Tunnell. (Nici, Richard)FILED UNDER SEAL
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [9] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Daniel Tunnell (1) to allow defendant to travel. (Rynne, Michelle)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006, Terminated: 1/18/2006 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                        Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Daniel Tunnell. (Pearlstein, Mark)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005, Terminated: 11/28/2005 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                          Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Emergency) as to Daniel Tunnell. (Pearlstein, Mark)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [8] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Daniel Tunnell (1). (Rynne, Michelle)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                              Set/Reset Hearings as to Daniel Tunnell: Sentencing reset for 5/23/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ElectronicORDER entered granting [7] Motion to Continue as to Daniel Tunnell (1). Sentencing reset to 5/23/06 at 2:30 p.m. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Motion to Continue
                                  Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing to May 22, 2006 as to Daniel Tunnell. (Nici, Richard)FILE UNDER SEAL Modified on 10/18/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Order on Motion to Seal
                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Motion to Seal as to Daniel Tunnell (1). (Rynne, Michelle)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Waiver of Indictment
                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Daniel Tunnell (Nici, Richard)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Plea Agreement
                                        PLEA AGREEMENT as to Daniel Tunnell. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Motion to Seal
                                          MOTION to Seal as to Daniel Tunnell. (Nici, Richard)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Procedural Order re sentencing hearingCourt Filing
                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Daniel Tunnell: Sentencing set for 11/15/2005 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Change of Plea Hearing
                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock :Change of Plea Hearing as to Daniel Tunnell held on 8/24/2005, Defendant sworn; court conducts colloquy, Plea entered by Daniel Tunnell (1) Guilty Count 1. Sentencing Set for 11/15/05 at 3:30 pm. Defendant released on Personal Recognizance with condition he turn over passport to PTS by 8/26/05. (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Daniel Tunnell: Change of Plea Hearing reset for 8/24/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                  NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Daniel Tunnell Change of Plea Hearing reset for 8/4/2005 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Daniel Tunnell: Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/29/2005 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Information - Felony
                                                      INFORMATION (Felony) as to Daniel Tunnell (1) count(s) 1. (Gawlik, Cathy)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 1,303 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?