Anderson v. Wyeth et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11405-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dorothy Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheff Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald R. Grady +1 617 227 7000 +1 617 227 8833 dgrady@shefflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SimmonsCooper, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephanie Lyons +1 618 259 2222 +1 618 259 2251 slyons@simmonscooper.com
Space Timothy F. Thompson, Jr. +1 618 259 2222 +1 618 259 2251 tthompson@simmonscooper.com
v.
No Logo Greetnstone LTD, Defendant
Pfizer, Inc. Pfizer, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Arqule, Inc.
Unknown Role, Icagen, Inc.
Unknown Role, Zoetis Inc.
Unknown Role, Celladon Corp
Unknown Role, Pfizer Production LLC
Unknown Role, Icu Medical Inc/de
Unknown Role, Upjohn Inc
Unknown Role, Insite Vision, Inc.
Unknown Role, pSivida LTD
Unknown Role, Cortexyme, Inc.
Unknown Role, Imara Inc.
Unknown Role, Bioatla, Inc.
No Logo Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Defendant
No Logo Wyeth, Defendant
No Logo Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 7/5/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $75000
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Barnstable
Terminated 10/20/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, STAYED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Mail Returned
Return receipt received for mail sent to USDC, District of Arkansas Delivered on 10/24/05. Case assigned 4:05cv01607. (Patch, Christine)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of Transfer. Case is transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas. (Patch, Christine)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Patch, Christine)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
        Letter to Sarah Thornton from James W. McCormack advising us that this case has been transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas. (Patch, Christine)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
          Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [11] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Timothy F. Thompson, Jr for Dorothy Anderson, Stephanie Lyons for Dorothy Anderson (Patch, Christine)
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy F. Thomspon, Jr. and Stephanie Lyons Filing fee $ 100.00, receipt number 66072. by Dorothy Anderson. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Timothy F. Thompson# (2) Affidavit Stephanie Lyons)(Patch, Christine)
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Summons Returned Executed
              SUMMONS Returned Executed Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC served on 7/14/2005, answer due 8/3/2005. (Patch, Christine) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                SUMMONS Returned Executed Pfizer Inc. served on 7/14/2005, answer due 8/3/2005. (Patch, Christine) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Greetnstone LTD served on 7/14/2005, answer due 8/3/2005. (Patch, Christine) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 7/13/2005, answer due 8/2/2005. (Patch, Christine) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Wyeth served on 7/14/2005, answer due 8/3/2005. (Patch, Christine) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greetnstone LTD, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pfizer Inc.. (Allen, John)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Stipulation
                          STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Greetnstone LTD, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pfizer Inc.. (Allen, John)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Stipulation
                            STIPULATION re [2] Amended Complaint Extension of Time to Respond by Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Butts, John)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Amended Complaint
                              First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greenstone LTD, Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pfizer Inc., filed by Dorothy Anderson.(Patch, Christine) Modified on 7/20/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against Greenstone LTS, Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pfizer Inc. Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 65354, filed by Dorothy Anderson.(Patch, Christine) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Summons Issued
                                  Summons Issued as to Greenstone LTS, Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pfizer Inc.. (Patch, Christine)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                    If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Patch, Christine)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?