Addo v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11420-GAO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ali Addo, Petitioner
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Office Boston
Filed 7/5/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 510 - Taking - Personalty
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 3/14/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Mail Returned
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ali Addo at York PA remailed to Tufts Street in Cambridge MA (Edge, Eugenia)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Order on Motion to Reopen Case
    Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Electronic ORDER entered denying [6] Motion to Reopen Case ( Copy of order mailed out to plaintiff) (Lyness, Paul)
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Motion to Reopen Case
      MOTION to Reopen Case by Ali Addo. c/s(Edge, Eugenia)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Mail Returned
        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of Order (entry #5) mailed to Ali Addo at: York County Prison, York PA returned as unable to forward. (Edge, Eugenia)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct SentenCourt Filing
          Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: ORDER entered. ORDER on Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). "..Because the present motion is barred in both its aspects by the passing of the statutory limitations period, the motion is DENIED with prejudice." It is SO ORDERED. Copy of order mailed to petitioner.(Edge, Eugenia)
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Response to 2255 Motion
            RESPONSE to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate. Set Aside. or Correct Sentence (Amended) by United States of America. (Feeley, Timothy)
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/18/2006, Entered: 2/18/2006 Response to 2255 Motion
              ***Unsigned*** AUSA Feeley refiled on 2/21/06 See entry #4*** RESPONSE to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence Under Section 2255 by United States of America. (Feeley, Timothy) Modified on 2/21/2006 (Edge, Eugenia).
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Service Order - 2255 MotionCourt Filing
                Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2255 Motion. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2255 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 60 days of rcpt of this order. ( Copy of this order mailed to both petitioner and respondent)(Lyness, Paul)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255
                  MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) , filed by Ali Addo. Criminal # 1:99-cr-10064(Edge, Eugenia) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2005 (Edge, Eugenia).
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 40 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?