United States v. James Elmer Mitchell
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-09771

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 10:14 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stephen Yagman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity B

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200 1@yagmanlaw.net
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Joseph McAuliffe +1 202 514 6832 +1 202 616 3085 robert.mcauliffe@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo David Spears Addington, Defendant
No Logo George John Tenet, Defendant
No Logo Irving Lewis Libby, Jr., Defendant
No Logo James Elmer Mitchell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ariel S. Glasner +1 202 772 5963 +1 202 572 8428 aglasner@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ariel S. Glasner +1 202 772 5963 +1 202 572 8428 aglasner@blankrome.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawnda M Grady +1 424 239 3400 +1 424 239 3434 Sgrady@BlankRome.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawnda M Grady +1 424 239 3400 +1 424 239 3434 Sgrady@BlankRome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry F Schuelke, III +1 202 772 5815 +1 202 572 1434 hschuelke@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry F Schuelke, III +1 202 772 5815 +1 202 572 1434 hschuelke@blankrome.com
No Logo John A. Rizzo, Defendant
No Logo John Bruce Jessen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ariel S. Glasner +1 202 772 5963 +1 202 572 8428 aglasner@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ariel S. Glasner +1 202 772 5963 +1 202 572 8428 aglasner@blankrome.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawnda M Grady +1 424 239 3400 +1 424 239 3434 Sgrady@BlankRome.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawnda M Grady +1 424 239 3400 +1 424 239 3434 Sgrady@BlankRome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry F Schuelke, III +1 202 772 5815 +1 202 572 1434 hschuelke@blankrome.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry F Schuelke, III +1 202 772 5815 +1 202 572 1434 hschuelke@blankrome.com
No Logo John Choon Yoo, Defendant
No Logo Jose A. Rodriguez, Jr., Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Vincent Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities, Defendant
No Logo Porter Johnston Goss, Defendant
No Logo Scott Muller, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States of America Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo Unknown Named Defendants, Defendant
No Logo William James Haynes, II, Defendant
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 375 - Other Statutes: False Claims Act
  Entries (131) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 118 filed by Stephen Yagman. CCA # 16-55346. Appellant's emergency motion for injunctive relief (Docket Entry No. 70) is denied. To the extent appellant seeks the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus, appellant has not demonstrated that this case warrants such relief. See Bauman v. U.S. Dist. Court, 557 F.2d 650 (9th Cir. 1977). Accordingly, to the extent the motion for injunctive relief also constitutes a mandamus petition, that petition is denied. (car) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-55346, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 118 as to Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (mat) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff-Relator Stephen Yagman. Appeal of Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,, Order on Motion to Set Aside Default,, 117 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17409087.) (Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS BY MITCHELL AND JESSEN AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; MOTIONS TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND TO DISMISS BY MITCHELL, JESSEN AND ASSOCIATES; PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 54 77 78 105 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of the foregoing, MJAs motion to set aside the entry of default is GRANTED; the motions to dismiss filed by Mitchell and Jessen, the United States, and MJA are GRANTED with prejudice; and Yagmans motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See order for details.) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (kti)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Unknown Document Type
          LOCAL RULE 83-9 REQUEST FOR RULING WITHOUT FURTHER DELAY ON MOTIONS, DOCS. 77 AND 78, TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON AUGUST 27, 2015, DOC. 88, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 77, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 78, filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
            PLAINTIFF'S RULE 28(J) ANALOG (3D) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form 95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 105, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 77, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 78 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
              RULE 28(J) ANALOG RE: WATERBOARDING AS TORTURE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form 95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 105, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 77, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 78, filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and to Dismiss Plaintiff/Relators First Amended Complaint 105 presently scheduled for hearing on January 29, 2016, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/16/2016, Entered: 1/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                  PLAINTIFF RELATOR'S RULE 28(j) ANALOG IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITIONS TO ALL PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form 95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 105, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 77, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 78, filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities, re Reply (Motion related), 110 served on 1/15/16. (Grady, Shawnda) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form 95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 105 filed by Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities. (Grady, Shawnda)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/9/2016, Entered: 1/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form 95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 105 ERRATA TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF MJA DEFAULT AND TO DISMISS, filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss part of defendant Mitchello, Jessen's Motion to Set Aside its Default, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF STEPHEN YAGMAN)(Reichmann, Joseph)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                            OPPOSITION TO re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form 95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 105 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen Yagman)(Reichmann, Joseph)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form 95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 105 served on December 18, 2015. (Grady, Shawnda) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form 95 . AND TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order) (Grady, Shawnda)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen, James Elmer Mitchell. (Grady, Shawnda)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE AND REQUEST filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman, NOTICE OF NON-FILING IN DELAWARE CHANCERY COURT; REQUEST FOR DECISION ON OUTSTANDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS, re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 77, Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 88, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 78, Status Report 102 (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                      STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen, James Elmer Mitchell. (Grady, Shawnda)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as CV14-09771 DMG (PJWx). (mg)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee:ORDER RE OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT 96 . The Court may set aside an entry of default for good cause. Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c).Such a motion must comply with the Local Rules for the filing of motions.Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates may file a properly noticed motion to set aside entry of default pursuant to Rule55. (lc) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman re: Errata 98 , Miscellaneous Document, 97 , Response in Opposition to Motion,, 96 (Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: 9/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion,, 96 (Grady, Shawnda)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: 9/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                    OBJECTION TO RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form 95, Response in Opposition to Motion,, 96, APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities 94 (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: 9/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                      OPPOSITION to APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities 94 filed by Defendants James Elmer Mitchell, James Elmer Mitchell, Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Shawnda M Grady added to party Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities(pty:dft))(Grady, Shawnda)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                        DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities (lc)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                          APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities filed by PLAINTIFF Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman, upon Defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities served on 5/2/2015, answer due 5/26/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Elmer Mitchell, partner in or principal of business named in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court, having reviewed Plaintiff/Relator' response 91 to the Court's Order to Show Cause ("OSC") 90 , hereby DISCHARGES the OSC. Plaintiff/Relator shall file proof of service within 7 days of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagmanto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, 90 (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION.Plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before October 5, 2015 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities.No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a written response on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed as to defendant Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities if a written response demonstrating good cause is not filed by the date indicated above. (lc)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RULE 28(J) ANALOG IN OPPOSITION TO ALL MOTIONS TO DISMISS, UNDER SUBMISSION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 77, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 78 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants James Elmer Mitchells and John Bruce Jessens Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint 77 and United States of America's Motion to Dismiss 78 presently scheduled for hearing on August 28, 2015, are appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: 8/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RULE 28(J) ANALOG ON ISSUE OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 77, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 78 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 78, and Reply on Relator's Motion to Strike Government's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 77 filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen, John Bruce Jessen, James Elmer Mitchell, James Elmer Mitchell. (Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 83 served on 8/12/2015. (McAuliffe, Robert) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Dkt. 80, Request to Strike filed by Plaintiff United States. (McAuliffe, Robert)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed BY PLAINTIFF-RELATOR, STEPHEN YAGMAN, re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A),, 81 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 78 , Miscellaneous Document 80 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 80 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Request:strike. Missing Proposed order was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        REQUEST TO STRIKE GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 78 (Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 77 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff United States. Motion set for hearing on 8/28/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service) (McAuliffe, Robert)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen(in present official capacity), John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in present individual capacity). Motion set for hearing on 8/28/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) (Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MITCHELLS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND DENYING ORDER SHORTENING TIME AS MOOT 70 72 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Mitchells motion for a stay of discoveryis GRANTED; discovery is hereby stayed until this case is at issue and due dates for responses to any discovery requests already served is extended until 30 days after this case is at issue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Mitchells ex parte application for order shortening time [Doc. # 72] is DENIED as moot. (shb)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    PLAINTIFF RELATOR'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME WITHIN WHICH THEIR MOTION MAY BE HEARD re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re MOTION for Discovery regarding Stay or, alternatively, lengthen 70 to July 10, 2015 72 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen(in present official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re MOTION for Discovery regarding Stay or, alternatively, lengthen 70 to July 10, 2015 72 served on July 2, 2015. (Grady, Shawnda) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 66 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected and No link to filer (only shows attorney). The correct event is: Response. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re MOTION for Discovery regarding Stay or, alternatively, lengthen 70 to July 10, 2015 filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: plaintiffs Miscellaneous Document 67 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of Withdrawal of (Document or Motion). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding Stay or, alternatively, lengthen filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). Motion set for hearing on 7/31/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER VACATING JUNE 29, 2015 MINUTE ORDER 64 AND DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AS MOOT 37, 41, 51 . Nevertheless, in the interests of justice and to avoid further unnecessary motion practice, IT IS ORDERED that this Courts minute order of June 29, 2015 striking the filing of the First Amended Complaint [Doc. # 64] is hereby VACATED. Counsel is advised, however, that hereafter listing an email address in the Identifying Information Section of a Notice of Appearance Form G-123 is consent to electronic service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motions to dismiss filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell [Doc. # 37], Plaintiff United States [Doc. # 41], and Defendant John Bruce Jessen [Doc. # 51] are DENIED without prejudice as moot. Defendants shall file their responses to the FirstAmended Complaint within 21 days after the date of this Order. (lc)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff Relator's Opposition to Motions to Dismiss OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Order for Defendant John Bruce Jessen's Notice of Motion and Motion in Opposition to Request for Entry of Default and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 51 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 37 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 41 , First MOTION to Dismiss Case 39 , filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exjibit 1 to Plaintiff Relator's Opposition to Motions to Dismiss)(Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        WITHDRAWAL OF DOCS. 65 & 66 (IN PART) filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman , re: Miscellaneous Document 66 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related), 65 (Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO JUNE 29 MINUTE ORD. re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 64, Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 61, Response 62 (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Order for Defendant John Bruce Jessen's Notice of Motion and Motion in Opposition to Request for Entry of Default and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 51, MOTION to Dismiss Case 37, MOTION to Dismiss Case 41, First MOTION to Dismiss Case 39 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER STRIKING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 60 .The First Amended Complaint filed June 24, 2015 is hereby stricken from the record, without prejudice to the filing of a FAC by stipulation or properly noticed motion. (lc) Modified on 7/1/2015 (lc). (VACATED PER 7/1/15 MINUTES).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RELATOR STEPHEN YAGMAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MITCHELL'S AND JESSEN'S EXPARTE APPLICATION 56 FOR ORDER TAKING OFF CALENDAR OR CONTINUING RELATOR'S SUMMARY ADJUDICATION MOTION (DOC. 54) filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4, # 4 part 5, # 5 part 6)(lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015: # 6 part 7, # 7 part 8, # 8 part 9, # 9 part 10, # 10 part 11, # 11 part 12) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015: # 12 part 13, # 13 part 14, # 14 part 15, # 15 part 16, # 16 part 17, # 17 part 18) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015: # 18 part 19, # 19 part 20, # 20 part 21, # 21 part 22, # 22 part 23, # 23 part 24) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015: # 24 part 25, # 25 part 26, # 26 part 27, # 27 part 28, # 28 part 29) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2015: # 29 part 30, # 30 part 31, # 31 part 32, # 32 part 33, # 33 part 34) (lc). (DOCKETED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER CV 14-9771 DMG (MANx)- per MINUTES, DOCKET NO. 59 re wrong case number on the opposition). Modified on 6/29/2015 (lc). Modified on 6/29/2015 (lc). (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagmanto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 61 (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Relator shall show cause in writing no later than July 3, 2015, why the FAC should not be stricken for failure to comply with Rule 15(a). Response(s), if any, by defendants may be filed by July 9, 2015. Failure to timely respond to this Order shall be deemed consent to the striking of the FAC. (See order for details.) (kti)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS MITCHELL AND JESSEN All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),,, 1 , filed by PLAINTIFF-RELATOR Stephen Yagman (Reichmann, Joseph) Modified on 6/29/2015 (lc). (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER RE DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION 56 . IT IS ORDERED that the hearing on the motion for summary adjudication is vacated 54, to be reset upon the Courts ruling on the currently pending motions to dismiss. If necessary, after the ruling on the pending motions to dismiss, the Court shall also reset a briefing schedule for the motion for summary adjudication. (lc) Modified on 6/23/2015 (lc).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to UNCONTROVERTED FACTS (1)-(30) 54 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4, # 4 part 5)(lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: # 5 part 6, # 6 part 7, # 7 part 8, # 8 part 9, # 9 part 10) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: # 10 part 11, # 11 part 12, # 12 part 13, # 13 part 14, # 14 part 15) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: # 15 part 16, # 16 part 17, # 17 part 18, # 18 part 19, # 19 part 20) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: # 20 part 21, # 21 part 22, # 22 part 23, # 23 part 24, # 24 part 25) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: # 25 part 26, # 26 part 27, # 27 part 28, # 28 part 29, # 29 part 30) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2015: # 30 part 31, # 31 part 32, # 32 part 33, # 33 part 34) (lc). (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman of Opposition to Ex Parte Application. (Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Motion for Summary Adjudication filed by Defendants John Bruce Jessen(in present official capacity), John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in present individual capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the Court's procedures and schedules on the Court's website, parties must clear a hearing date with the court clerk prior to filing a motion for summary judgement. The Court hereby continues the motions to dismiss 37 41 51 and motion for summary adjudication 54 to July 24, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/13/2015, Entered: None Summary Judgment (Partial)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to UNCONTROVERTED FACTS (1)-(30) filed by PLAINTIFF/RELATOR STEPHEN YAGMAN Stephen Yagman. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman of SENATE SELECT COMMITTEE ON INTELLIGENCE COMMITTEE STUDY OF THE CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY'S DETENTION AND INTERROGATION PROGRAM. (Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT JOHN BRUCE JESSEN 49 . Plaintiffs Amended Request to Enter Default of Defendant John Bruce Jessen is DENIED without prejudice to be refiled if supported with a signed return receipt or evidence of proper service. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Defendant John Bruce Jessen's Notice of Motion and Motion in Opposition to Request for Entry of Default and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in present individual capacity). Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shawnda M. Grady, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Declaration of John Bruce Jessen, # 4 Proposed Order)(Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Resubmitted REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT JOHN BRUCE JESSEN John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity) 49 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Filer cites no return receipt required. Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. (lc) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/6/2015, Entered: 6/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT JOHN BRUCE JESSEN John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity) filed by PLAINTIFF Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. No signed certified mail return receipt with signature of defendant or authorized agent. USPS Tracking sheet shows acceptance, but no name and no signature in the acceptance box (blank). (lc) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Shawnda M Grady on behalf of Defendant John Bruce Jessen (Attorney Shawnda M Grady added to party John Bruce Jessen(pty:dft))(Grady, Shawnda) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity) filed by PLAINTIFF Stephen Yagman. (Reichmann, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT JAMES ELMER MITCHELLS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON HIS MOTION TO ADJOURN SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 42 by Judge Dolly M. Gee (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TOCONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 38 . Notwithstanding that no defendant has yet filed an answer, a Scheduling Conference was erroneously set in this matter on July 10, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. The July 10, 2015 Scheduling Conference is hereby VACATED and will be reset when the case is at issue. Defendant JamesElmer Mitchell's Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference [Doc. # 38] is DENIED as moot. The July 10, 2015 hearing is VACATED. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Stephen Yagman, upon Defendant John Bruce Jessen(in present official capacity) served on 5/2/2015, answer due 5/23/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon as an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to June 18, 2015 filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff United States. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum and Declarations of Martha Glover and Robert McAuliffe in Support of United States' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Proposed Order)(McAuliffe, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States. correcting First MOTION to Dismiss Case 39 (McAuliffe, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff United States. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum and Declarations of Martha Glover and Robert McAuliffe in Support of United States' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Proposed Order)(McAuliffe, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conferernce from July 10, 2015 to September 1, 2015 filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Henry F. Schuelke, III on behalf of Defendant James Elmer Mitchell, designating Shawnda M. Grady as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 27 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ariel S Glasner on behalf of ames Elmer Mitchell, designating Shawnda M. Grady as local counsel. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert McAuliffe counsel for Plaintiff United States. Adding Robert McAuliffe as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Robert McAuliffe added to party United States(pty:pla))(McAuliffe, Robert) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/26/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2015 at 11:00 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: PILOT PROJECT RE SEALED DOCUMENTS by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (See order for details.) (kti)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (See order for details.) (kti)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 14-03 filed on May 22, 2015. Accordingly, the scheduling conference presently set June 29, 2015 before Judge Walter is hereby continued to July 10, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Gee. See a separate scheduling conference order for details. (See order for details.) (kti)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: 5/22/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 14-03 by Judge John F. Walter. Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV14-09771 DMG (MANx). (mg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), re APPLICATION for attorney Ariel S. Glasner to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15759988 paid.) 27 served on May 20, 2015. (Grady, Shawnda) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney Ariel S. Glasner to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15759988 paid.) filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Shawnda M Grady on behalf of Defendant James Elmer Mitchell (Attorney Shawnda M Grady added to party James Elmer Mitchell(pty:dft))(Grady, Shawnda) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), re APPLICATION for attorney Henry F. Schuelke, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15759940 paid.) 24 served on May 20, 2015. (Grady, Shawnda) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Henry F. Schuelke, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15759940 paid.) filed by Defendant James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Shawnda M Grady added to party James Elmer Mitchell(pty:dft))(Grady, Shawnda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Entry Order by Judge John F. Walter: Government's Lodged Under Seal Filing is denied without prejudice to filing a noticed Motion. [Case unsealed - under seal filings require an order of Court] The documents will not be filed and will be returned to Government counsel.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 4/27/2015 (sr). (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants. (jp) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/29/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 6/15/2015. (jp) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), 19 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Reichmann counsel for Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. Adding JOSEPH REICHMANN as attorney as counsel of record for STEPHEN YAGMAN for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff STEPHEN YAGMAN. (Attorney Joseph Reichmann added to party Stephen Yagman(pty:pla))(Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISMISSAL OF SOME DEFENDANTS filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman (Reichmann, Joseph) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO UNSEAL ACTION by Judge John F. Walter: Based on plaintiffs motion for an order that this action be unsealed 15 . IT IS ORDERED that this action be, and it hereby is, unsealed. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO UNSEAL ACTION by Judge John F. Walter: Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal Action 15 is GRANTED, and this action is UNSEALED. Court Reporter: None Present. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO UNSEAL ACTION. (jloz) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - JOINT STATEMENT Re: L.R. 7-3 Conference. UNDER SEAL. (jp) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of STEPHEN YAGMAN Re: Joint Statement Re: L.R. 7-3 Conference. UNDER SEAL. (jp) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - REPLY ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION to Unseal Case 9 filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (jloz) Modified on 4/24/2015 (gk). (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. All counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the Central District of California, etc. See document for details. (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION by Judge John F. Walter: After reviewing Pro se Plaintiff Stephen Yagman's Ex Parte Application to Unseal Action 9 , the Court finds that the requested relief is not sufficiently urgent to justify an ex parte application and it is denied without prejudice to filing a regularly noticed motion. Before filing such a motion, Plaintiff and counsel for the Defendant shall comply with Local Rule 7-3 and paragraph 5(b) of the Court's Amended Standing Order filed today. Court Reporter: None Present. (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Unseal Case filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman.(jloz) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - STATUS REPORT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA REGARDING CALCULATION OF THE INITIAL 60-DAY PERIOD DURING WHICH THE GOVERNMENT MAY ELECT TO INTERVENE. (jloz) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SELF REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: One or more of the parties to this action has elected to appear pro se. Persons appearing before this Court are not required to retain the services of a lawyer or obtain the advice of counsel. Individual litigants may represent themselves pro se, but corporations and associations must be represented by counsel. (See order for further details). (shb) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of CivilProcedure, the Local Rules of the Central District of California, the General Orders of the Central District and the Judges Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court for the Central Districtof California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov). (See order for further details). (shb) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (esa) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RELATED CASE STATEMENT filed by plaintiff Stephen Yagman. Related Case(s): NONE (esa) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF INTEREST PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (esa) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against defendants David Spears Addington, Porter Johnston Goss, Michael Vincent Hayden, William James Haynes, II, John Bruce Jessen(in present official capacity), John Bruce Jessen(in former official capacity), Irving Lewis Libby, Jr, James Elmer Mitchell(in former official capacity), James Elmer Mitchell(in present individual capacity), Mitchell Jessen and Associates and affiliates or corporate entities, Scott Muller, John A. Rizzo, Jose A. Rodriguez, Jr, George John Tenet, United States of America, United States of America Central Intelligence Agency, Unknown Named Defendants, John Choon Yoo.Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Stephen Yagman. (Attachments: # 1 CV 71) (esa) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?