Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare, Pension and Annuity Funds v. Boston Equipment & Supply Company, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11423-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:03 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds and of the Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Boston Equipment & Supply Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Southern New Hampshire Bank And Trust Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Southern New Hampshire Bank & Trust Co."
Office Boston
Filed 7/6/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Suffolk
Terminated 8/8/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Lovett, Zita)
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Status Report
    STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds and of the Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Sills, Anne)
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. By August 6, 2007, Parties are ordered to file status reports on the posture of the case, the status of the related bankruptcy proceedings, and the party's positions on whether this case should remain active on the court's docket.(Abaid, Kimberly)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
        Copy of a Letter from Jason M. Craven to Attorney Sills. (Abaid, Kim)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Summons Returned Executed
          SUMMONS Returned Executed Boston Equipment & Supply Company, Inc. served on 11/16/2005, answer due 12/6/2005. (Sills, Anne)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Summons to Trustee Returned Executed
            SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed (Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Summons to Trustee Returned Executed
              SUMMONS to Trustee Returned with Letter Southern New Hampshire Bank & Trust Co. served on 9/6/2005.(Abaid, Kim)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Affidavit
                AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Abaid, Kim)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Order on Sealed Motion +
                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [2] Sealed Motion (Abaid, Kim)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Sealed Document +
                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in secure file room.. (Abaid, Kim)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Sealed Document +
                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in secure file room.. (Abaid, Kim)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Sealed Document +
                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in secure file room.. (Abaid, Kim)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Sealed Document +
                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in secure file room.. (Abaid, Kim)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] SEALED MOTION filed by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds and of the Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Abaid, Kim)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Sealed Motion +
                              SEALED MOTION by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds and of the Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4.(Abaid, Kim)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT For Delinquent Fringe Benefit Contributions against all defendants Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 65433, filed by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare, Pension, and Annuity Funds and of the Hoisting and Portable Engineers Local 4 Apprentice and Training Funds, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Abaid, Kim)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Summons Issued
                                  Summons Issued as to Boston Equipment & Supply Company, Inc., Southern New Hampshire Bank & Trust Co.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                    If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (Abaid, Kim)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?