eDekka LLC v. 3balls.com, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00541

Tags
Last Updated July 1, 2017 at 1:12 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edekka LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Austin Hansley Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Hansley +1 469 587 9776 +1 855 347 6329 Austin@TheTexasLawOffice.com
v.
No Logo 3balls.com, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Action Envelop & Printing Co., Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Andrew Bittner +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mrb@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricardo Joel Bonilla +1 214 747 5071 +1 214 747 2091 rbonilla@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theresa M. Dawson tdawson@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
Adidas America, Inc. Adidas America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/09/2015 Matias Ferrario , +1 336 607 7475 +1 336 734 2651 mferrario@kilpatrickstockton.com
No Logo ALDO U.S., Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Andrew Bittner +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mrb@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricardo Joel Bonilla +1 214 747 5071 +1 214 747 2091 rbonilla@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theresa M. Dawson tdawson@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
No Logo AM Retail Group, Inc. d/b/a Wilsons Leather, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Andrew Bittner +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mrb@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricardo Joel Bonilla +1 214 747 5071 +1 214 747 2091 rbonilla@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theresa M. Dawson tdawson@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas F. Fitzpatrick +1 650 802 3600 +1 650 802 3650 fitzpatt@pepperlaw.com
No Logo Arlington Contact Lens Service, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Asics America Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Andrew Bittner +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mrb@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricardo Joel Bonilla +1 214 747 5071 +1 214 747 2091 rbonilla@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theresa M. Dawson tdawson@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
No Logo Babyage.com, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Balsam Hill LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brann & Isaacson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter J. Brann +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 pbrann@brannlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacy O Stitham +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 sstitham@brannlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Swetnam-Burland +1 207 786 3566 +1 207 783 9325 dsb@brannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew T Milam +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5094 mmilam@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Bebe Studio, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/28/2015 Michael Andrew Bittner +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mrb@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/28/2015 Ricardo Joel Bonilla +1 214 747 5071 +1 214 747 2091 rbonilla@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/28/2015 David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/28/2015 Theresa M. Dawson tdawson@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/28/2015 Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
No Logo Boot Barn, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2015 Jason Woodard Cook +1 214 932 6418 +1 214 273 7483 jcook@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Claire's Stores, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Cole Haan LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoffman and Osorio Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Kurt Truelove +1 903 938 8321 +1 903 215 8510 kurt@truelovelawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony F. Blum +1 314 552 6030 +1 314 552 7000 ablum@thompsoncoburn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Arthur Braunel +1 314 552 6106 +1 314 552 7106 mbraunel@thompsoncoburn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan H Norman +1 314 552 6284 +1 314 552 7284 anorman@thompsoncoburn.com
No Logo Columbia Sportswear Company, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E. Schonberg +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 mike.schonberg@tklaw.com
No Logo Cymax Stores USA, LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Andrew Bittner +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mrb@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricardo Joel Bonilla +1 214 747 5071 +1 214 747 2091 rbonilla@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theresa M. Dawson tdawson@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
No Logo DA Wuster Inc. d/b/a Airsplat.com, Consol Defendant
No Logo Destination Maternity Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/18/2015 John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
No Logo David Folsom, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Folsom +1 903 255 3251 +1 903 255 3266 dfolsom@jw.com
  Entries (142) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE by ALDO U.S., Inc., Action Envelop & Printing Co., Inc., Asics America Corporation, Cymax Stores USA, LLC [Fish & Richardson Defendants' Notice Regarding Fee Award] (Bittner, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/10/2016, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Discovery
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Withdraw
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/24/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 105 SEALED MOTION (DEFENDANTS' CONSOLIDATED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT-FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by eDekka LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of LaPray, # 2 Declaration of Patterson, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 101 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2015 re 14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Columbia Sportswear Company, 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediator
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Request for Entry of Default by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Request for Entry of Default by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder (Dkt. Nos. 11 & 14) by Cole Haan LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blum, Anthony) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to 3balls.com, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 562 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?