Wade v. Churyk
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00609

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 12:16 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Daniel Wade, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Sally Wade, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Boris Churyk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard, Kohn, Sprague & Fitzgerald

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack G. Steigelfest +1 860 525 3101 jgs@hksflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by STYLIADES, MEZZANOTTE & HASSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/28/2018 Thomas P. Mullaney, III +1 860 721 6966 +1 860 645 6108 Thomas.Mullaney@LibertyMutual.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (137) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Conference
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Objection
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Response
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Continue
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER Regarding September 5, 2018 Conference. Please note the deadlines set forth in the Order. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 9/7/2018.(Esposito, A.)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Order on Motion to PrecludeCourt Filing
                  OMNIBUS RULING on Defendant's Motions in Limine. Taking under advisement 78 Motion to Preclude; granting 79 Motion to Preclude; denying 80 Motion to Preclude; granting 81 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part 82 ; granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to Preclude; denying 85 Motion to Preclude. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 8/13/18. (Esposito, A.)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER RE: Case Management Conference held July 31, 2018. See Attached Order. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 8/2/18.(Esposito, A.)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/5/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. The parties will call the conference line at the appointed time at (877) 336-1828; Access Code 33-444-88.(Esposito, A.) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Case Management/Pretrial Conference held on 7/31/2018. 25 minutes. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Trial Memo
                          TRIAL MEMO Supplement to Joint Trial Memorandum by Boris Churyk. (Steigelfest, Jack)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 7/19/18 Case Management/Pretrial Conference RESCHEDULED to 7/31/2018 at 03:00 PM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. In advance of the conference, counsel will confer with their clients and witnesses regarding their availability over the next sixty days. A date will be set for oral argument on the Motions In Limine, jury selection and trial during the case management conference. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/15/2018, Entered: 7/15/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                              Memorandum in Opposition re 85 MOTION to Preclude claims that do not arise to level of extreme and outrageous filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/15/2018, Entered: 7/15/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                Memorandum in Opposition re 84 MOTION to Preclude claims of bodily injury and specific psychological injury filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/15/2018, Entered: 7/15/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 83 MOTION to Preclude Erased criminal charges filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/15/2018, Entered: 7/15/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 82 MOTION to Preclude Late disclosed evidence filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/15/2018, Entered: 7/15/2018 response
                                      RESPONSE re 81 MOTION to Preclude Evidence of chemical contamination filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/15/2018, Entered: 7/15/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 80 MOTION to Preclude Claims barred by SOL filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/15/2018, Entered: 7/15/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 79 MOTION to Preclude Experts and Expert reports filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/15/2018, Entered: 7/15/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 78 MOTION to Preclude Claims as barred by absent damages analysis filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Order of TransferCourt Filing
                                              ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 7/13/18.(Johnson, D.)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER Re: Pretrial Conference on July 19, 2018. Any motion not responded to by the time of the conference will be granted as unopposed. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 7/13/18.(Esposito, A.) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 11:30 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Any motions not responded to by the time of the conference will be granted as unopposed. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: A Telephonic Status Conference was held on 7/6/2018. 10 minutes. (Greenspoon, L.) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Electronic Filing OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 7/2/18.(Wood, R.)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER: A telephonic status conference is scheduled for 7/6/2018 at 11:00 AM with Judge Martinez. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the conference call and shall have opposing counsel on the line when calling chambers at 860-240-3605. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 6/29/2018.(Greenspoon, L.) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                            CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Boris Churyk, Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials (DFM). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/25/2018.(Pipech, L.) Document #89 corrected on 6/29/2018 (Pipech, L.). (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR: NOTICE re: Consent to Magistrate Judge by Boris Churyk, Daniel Wade and Sally Wade. (Hernandez, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2018: # 1 Replacement PDF, Main Document) (Hernandez, T.). Modified event on 6/29/2018 (Pipech, L.). (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR: Notice re: Consent to Magistrate Judge by Boris Churyk, Daniel Wade and Sally Wade. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(Hernandez, T.) Modified on 6/18/2018 to enter in error (Hernandez, T.). (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Docket Entry Correction re 86 Notice, Entered in Error. (Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR: NOTICE by Boris Churyk consent,and reference of a civil action to a Magistrate Judge (Steigelfest, Jack) Modified on 5/30/2018 (Hernandez, T.).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION to Preclude claims that do not arise to level of extreme and outrageous by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 5/21/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Steigelfest, Jack)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION to Preclude claims of bodily injury and specific psychological injury by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 5/21/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Steigelfest, Jack)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION to Preclude Erased criminal charges by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 5/21/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Steigelfest, Jack)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION to Preclude Late disclosed evidence by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 5/21/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Steigelfest, Jack) Modified on 8/13/2018 to terminate motion (Gould, K.).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION to Preclude Evidence of chemical contamination by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 5/21/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Steigelfest, Jack)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION to Preclude Claims barred by SOL by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 5/21/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Steigelfest, Jack)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION to Preclude Experts and Expert reports by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 5/21/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Steigelfest, Jack)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION to Preclude Claims as barred by absent damages analysis by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 5/21/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Unpublished cases)(Steigelfest, Jack)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          TRIAL MEMO by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade Estimated trial time 3 - 4 Days. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Plaintiff's Proposed Voir Dire Questions, # 2 Supplement Plaintiffs' Witness List, # 3 Supplement Plaintiffs' Requests to Charge, # 4 Supplement Plaintiffs' Proposed Verdict Form, # 5 Supplement Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, # 6 Supplement Defendant's Witness List, # 7 Supplement Defendant's Proposed Voir Dire Questions, # 8 Supplement Defendant's Requests to Charge, # 9 Supplement Defendant's Proposed Verdict Form, # 10 Supplement Defendant's Exhibit List, # 11 Supplement Defendant's Statement of Evidentiary Issues)(Williams, John)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER: Defendant's 75 Motion by Consent to Extend Deadlines is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall appear for their continued depositions by no later than 3/30/2018. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due on 4/30/2018. Future requests for extension of these deadlines will be viewed with disfavor. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/23/2018. (Greenspoon, L.) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/30/18 to complete the depositions and 4/30/18 to file joint trial memorandum 74 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by Boris Churyk. (Steigelfest, Jack)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER: On 2/13/2018, the court granted 69 defendant's motion 52 to compel in part, requiring plaintiffs to appear for their continued depositions by no later than 3/13/2018, and denied 69 defendant's motion 52 to compel in part, insofar as defendant sought written discovery, without prejudice to renewal by no later than 2/23/2018. A new motion to compel was not filed. Therefore, the parties' joint trial memorandum shall be due on 3/27/2018. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/2/2018. (Greenspoon, L.) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 72 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas P. Mullaney, III terminated. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/28/2018. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION for Thomas Mullaney to Withdraw as Attorney by Boris Churyk. (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jack G. Steigelfest on behalf of Boris Churyk (Steigelfest, Jack)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion 59 for Sanctions is DENIED. On Monday, 1/29/2018, the court 60 sealed all of the documents defendant filed on Friday afternoon, 1/26/2018. Defendant's counsel 61 has apologized to the court, counsel and parties, and he indicated that the filing of the documents unsealed was inadvertent. He is reminded of the requirements of D.Conn.L.Civ.R. 5 when seeking to file documents under seal. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 2/13/2018. (Greenspoon, L.) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: Defendant's 52 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 2/13/2018. (Greenspoon, L.)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by Boris Churyk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit letter to Atty Williams)(Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 65 Motion to Seal. The documents referenced in the motion that were incorrectly and inadvertently docketed have been sealed, see order dated 1/29/2018, ECF No.60. Once a docket entry is made in cm/ecf, there is no mechanism to remove it. It can only be sealed. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/30/2018. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez for a ruling on 59 MOTION for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/29/2018. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez.(Pipech, L.) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal documents filed on 1/25/18 entry #58 by Boris Churyk. (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Third EXHIBIT redacted by Boris Churyk. (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Third EXHIBIT redacted by Boris Churyk. (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Second EXHIBIT redacted by Boris Churyk. (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            First Memorandum in Opposition re 59 MOTION for Sanctions and to Seal File MOTION to Seal filed by Boris Churyk. (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 59 Motion to Seal. The motion for Sanctions will be referred to Magistrate Judge Martinez. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/29/2018. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Sanctions and to Seal File by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. Responses due by 2/16/2018 (Williams, John). Added MOTION to Seal event on 1/29/2018 (Pipech, L.).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  First RESPONSE filed by Boris Churyk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit d&p request, # 2 Exhibit daniel response, # 3 Exhibit sally response, # 4 Exhibit letter to PC, # 5 Exhibit letter to PC, # 6 Exhibit letter from PC, # 7 Exhibit supp compliance, # 8 Exhibit letter to PC, # 9 Exhibit supp compliance, # 10 Exhibit letter to PC, # 11 Exhibit supp compliance)(Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER: By no later than 1/26/2018, defendant must supplement his 52 Motion to Compel by submitting to the court, in compliance with D.Conn.L.Civ.R. 37(b)1, copies of the discovery requests in dispute. Defendant must include plaintiffs' responses and/or objections thereto. The parties shall confer in accordance with D.Conn.L.Civ.R. 37(a), and by no later than 1/31/2018, the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court advising as to which specific discovery requests still are in dispute and require a ruling. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 1/24/2018. (Greenspoon, L.) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by Boris Churyk. (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 52 MOTION to Compel filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez for a ruling including 52 MOTION to Compel . Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/12/17. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 8/1/2017 (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER: See attached memorandum of conference. If the parties are unable to resolve outstanding discovery issues, any motion to compel must be filed on or before 7/19/17. If no motion to compel is filed, the parties' joint trial memorandum shall be due on 8/2/2017. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 06/29/2017. (Greenspoon, L.)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Telephonic status Conference held on 6/29/2017. 20 minutes (Greenspoon, L.) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: A telephonic status conference is scheduled for 6/29/2017 at 2:00 PM with Judge Martinez. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the conference call and shall have opposing counsel on the line when calling chambers at 860-240-3605. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 06/23/2017. (Greenspoon, L.) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental STATUS REPORT for Plaintiff Daniel Wade by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' 5.26.17 filing filed by Boris Churyk. (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 44 Notice (Other) filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Boris Churyk (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: See attached memorandum of conference. Either party may file a motion to compel on or before 6/12/17; plaintiffs are ordered to make a meaningful settlement demand to defendant by 5/25/17; and the parties must submit a joint status report to Judge Martinez's chambers by 6/2/17. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 5/11/17. (Brierley, K.) (Wood, R.). (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Martinez: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/11/2017. Total time: 20 minutes. (Brierley, K.) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Longo-McLean on behalf of Daniel Wade, Sally Wade (Longo-McLean, Rose)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: A telephonic status conference is scheduled for 5/11/17 at 10:30 AM with Judge Martinez. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the conference call and shall have opposing counsel on the line when calling chambers at 860-240-3605. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 4/11/17. (Brierley, K.) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant moves to dismiss the action for lack of diversity jurisdiction arguing that the plaintiffs are citizens of Connecticut and the value of their claims does not exceed $75,000. The motion is denied for substantially the reasons stated by the plaintiffs in their opposition papers. Plaintiffs claim that they were citizens of Rhode Island at the time this suit was commenced and they submit a Rhode Island lease and motor vehicle registration that appear to provide adequate support for their position. On this record, the Court cannot conclude as a matter of law that at the time they filed this suit they were citizens of Connecticut. With regard to the amount in controversy, plaintiffs claim that they are entitled to recover substantial damages for emotional distress, as well as punitive damages. Accepting the allegations of the complaint as true, it cannot be said to a legal certainty that the plaintiffs cannot recover more than $75,000. Accordingly, the requirements of 28 U.S.C. s 1332 appear to be satisfied and the motion to dismiss must be denied. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/30/17. (Chatigny, Robert) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez to conduct a status/discovery conference. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/27/17.(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Boris Churyk. (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Counsel are reminded that joint status reports are due every 90 days after the filing of the initial status report. The last report was filed 11/14/2016. Counsel will file a joint status report no later than 3/29/2017. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/22/2017.(Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Fourth STATUS REPORT by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 11)(Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot 30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in light of ECF No. 31. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/4/2016. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 8/24/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Full Transcript, # 2 Exhibit errata sheet)(Mullaney, Thomas) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Boris Churyk.Responses due by 8/24/2016 (Mullaney, Thomas) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Third STATUS REPORT by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John) (Entered: 05/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 27 Letter. Treating this letter as a motion for extension of the deadlines in the scheduling order, ECF No. 12, the motion is denied without prejudice for failure to show good cause. Counsel are directed to review the tailored scheduling order and submit any appropriate motions regarding deadlines pursuant to the Local Rules. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/22/2016.(Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Thomas P. Mullaney, III Dated April 8, 2016 Re: Request a Pretrial/Status/Discovery Conference be scheduled at the earliest convenience. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Counsel are reminded that joint status reports are due every 90 days after the filing of the initial status report. The last report was filed 11/16/2015. Counsel will file a joint status report no later than 4/18/2016. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/4/2016.(Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/16/2016. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2016, Entered: 2/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR: Third STATUS REPORT by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John) Modified on 2/16/2016; docketed on wrong case (Sundie, T).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/18/2016, Entered: 1/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/13/2016 Interrogatories and production by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/5/2016. 4 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second STATUS REPORT by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Boris Churyk.(Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Due to a change in the Court's trial calendar, the Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/3/2015 at 11:30 AM has been rescheduled to 1/5/2016 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/22/2015, Entered: 8/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties Joint Status Report, ECF No. 14. Counsel are reminded of the Status Report Instructions on Page 6 of the Scheduling Order, ECF No. 12. The parties will amend their Joint Status Report in complainace with these instructions no later than 8/28/2015. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/21/2015.(Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/3/2015 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order. Discovery due by 6/1/2016; Initial Status Report due by 8/16/2015; Prefiling Conference Request Re: Dispositive Motions due 4/15/2016; Settlement Conference 7/2016; Trial Ready Date 10/1/2016; Trial Brief due by 9/1/2016. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/16/2015.(Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Boris Churyk.(Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Mullaney, III on behalf of Boris Churyk (Mullaney, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade. Boris Churyk served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Marshal's Return)(Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Boris Churyk* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 5 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 4/27/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/27/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/27/15. (Attachments: # 1 E-File Attachment) (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2015. Discovery due by 10/27/2015. Signed by Clerk on 4/27/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Daniel Wade, Sally Wade (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3583411.), filed by Daniel Wade, Sally Wade.(Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Entry Correction re 89 Notice; Replaced Main PDF. (Hernandez, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Entry Correction re 88 Notice (Other) filed in error. (Hernandez, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Trial Brief due by 4/30/2018 (Greenspoon, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/1/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/11/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Martinez. (Brierley, K.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/29/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/18/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Entry Correction re 24 Status Report; docketed in the wrong case. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Entry Correction re 19 First MOTION to Take Deposition from DANIEL WADE. Per the local rules, discovery is not to be filed. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Entry Correction re 20 First MOTION to Take Deposition from SALLY WADE. Per the local rules, discovery is not to be filed. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2016 (Johnson, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Boris Churyk. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?