Andrade v. Perroncello et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11492-GAO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Roberto Andrade, Petitioner

Represented by DiLibero & Associates

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Syrie D. Fried +1 617 223 8061 +1 617 223 8080 syrie_fried@fd.org
v.
No Logo Alberto R. Gonzales, Respondent
No Logo Bruce E. Chadbourne, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Crowley +1 617 565 2415 Frank.Crowley@dhs.gov
No Logo Peter Perroncello, Respondent
No Logo Steve Farquharson, Respondent
Office Boston
Filed 7/14/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 540 - Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 2/27/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, HABEAS
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Lyness, Paul)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Status Report
    STATUS REPORT TO COURT AND SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS by Bruce E. Chadbourne. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment A)(Crowley, Frank)
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006, Terminated: 2/27/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
      MOTION for Extension of Time to March 31, 2006 to File Response/Reply by Roberto Andrade.(Fried, Syrie)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Status Conference
        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Status Conference held on 1/5/2006. Petitioner's response to the motion to dismiss is to be filed by 2/9/06. Respondent is to file his reply a week thereafter. (Court Reporter Shelly Killian.) (Lyness, Paul)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Notice of Hearing.
          NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/5/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.. Please mark your calenders accordingly.(Lyness, Paul)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Motion Hearing
            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2005 re [3] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bruce E. Chadbourne,. The hearing is continued to 12/16/2005 04:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.. (Court Reporter Shelly Killian.) (Lyness, Paul)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Motion to Continue
              MOTION to Continue hearing to no date specific by Roberto Andrade. c/s(Edge, Eugenia)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Electronic ORDER entered denying [8] Motion to Continue. cc/cl (Edge, Eugenia)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                  NOTICE of Hearing:Hearing on pending matters set for 12/14/2005 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly.(Lyness, Paul)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE by Bruce E. Chadbourne of Intent to Execute Removal Order on December 18, 2005 (Crowley, Frank)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Response to Motion
                      RESPONSE to Motion re [3] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Roberto Andrade.c/s (Edge, Eugenia)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                        Letter (non-motion) from Steve D. DiLibero, Esq. re: Order of Expungment. (Edge, Eugenia)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [3] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bruce E. Chadbourne. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment A)(Crowley, Frank)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005, Terminated: 2/27/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                            MOTION to Dismiss by Bruce E. Chadbourne.(Crowley, Frank)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                              Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: ORDER entered. re [1] Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Roberto Andrade. "The respondent shall provide the Court with at least 48 hours (two business days) advance notice of any scheduled deportation or removal of petitioner." Mailed, via certified mail, to all parties. (Edge, Eugenia) Modified on 8/18/2005 to correct text (Edge, Eugenia).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241
                                PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) $ 250.00 receipt number 65606, filed by Roberto Andrade. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order)(York, Steve)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (Edge, Eugenia)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?