Alexander v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11506-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Steven Alexander, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Girards Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel J. DeMaio +1 214 346 9529
Space James Edward Girards +1 214 346 9529 +1 214 346 9532 jim@girardslaw.com
Space Mike Ramey +1 214 346 9529 +1 214 346 9532
v.
No Logo PARKE-DAVIS, Defendant

Represented by Clark, Thomas & Winters, PC

Pfizer, Inc. Pfizer, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Arqule, Inc.
Unknown Role, Icagen, Inc.
Unknown Role, Zoetis Inc.
Unknown Role, Celladon Corp
Unknown Role, Pfizer Production LLC
Unknown Role, Icu Medical Inc/de
Unknown Role, Upjohn Inc
Unknown Role, Insite Vision, Inc.
Unknown Role, pSivida LTD
Unknown Role, Cortexyme, Inc.
Unknown Role, Imara Inc.
Unknown Role, Bioatla, Inc.

Represented by Clark, Thomas & Winters, PC

No Logo Warner Lambert Company, Defendant

Represented by Clark, Thomas & Winters, PC

Office Boston
Filed 7/12/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Statistical Closing
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/20/2005
Origin 6
Reopened
Lead Case
104-cv-10981-PBS None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MDL
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 MDL Record received
MDL Record received from Northern District of Texas. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Removal U.S. District Court Northern District of Texas)(Paine, Matthew)
    LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
    Defendants request to the court to recognize previously entered order granting dismissal without prejudice of above captioned complaint. (Simeone, Maria)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Order
      Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered. re [15] Letter requesting the court to recognize previously entered order granting dismissal without prejudice re: Steven Alexander v. Pfizer Inc. 05-11506. Plaintiff filed a stipulation of dismissal without prejudice in the Northern District of Texas after this case was transferred. Accordingly, this Court dismisses this case pending in this Court without prejudice.(Simeone, Maria)
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
        Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER consolidating cases; In order to facilitate the orderly management of the Neurontin related litigation the Court enters the following Order consolidating all cases presently pending in this Court that were transferred by the MDL to this Court under MDL Docket Number 1629. In Re Neurontin, C.A. No. 04-10981-PBS will be the lead case.(Paine, Matthew)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Terminated Case
          Civil Case Administratively Closed. (Paine, Matthew)
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 MDL Case Transferred In - District Transfer
            MDL Case transferred in from the Northern District of Texas; Case Number 3:05-cv-01013., filed by Steven Alexander. (Attachments: # (1) Original Docket)(Abaid, Kim)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 94 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?