Sheehan et al v. McDonald et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11495-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anthony J. Salamone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund. Local 103, I.E.B.W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers Educational and Cultural Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers' Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Local 103, I.E.B.W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.E.B.W, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Russell F. Sheehan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Sovereign Bancorp, Inc., Trustee
Officially listed as "Sovereign Bank"
Office Boston
Filed 7/14/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Suffolk
Terminated 9/30/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund. Local 103, I.E.B.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Local 103, I.E.B.W., Electrical Workers Educational and Cultural Fund, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, IBEW, Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.E.B.W (Geiman, Gregory)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Patch, Christine)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Patti B. Saris : PROCEDURAL ORDER ON DEFAULT entered. re [4] Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default. (Patch, Christine)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
        NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Robert L. McDonald d/b/a Design Wiring. (Patch, Christine)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
          Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered allowing [3] MOTION for Entry of Default. "Allowed. Notice of Default to Issue." (Alba, Robert)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
            MOTION for Entry of Default by Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund. Local 103, I.E.B.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Local 103, I.E.B.W., Electrical Workers Educational and Cultural Fund, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, IBEW, Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.E.B.W.(Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Summons Returned Executed
              SUMMONS Returned Executed Robert L McDonald served on 8/16/2005, answer due 9/6/2005. (Sills, Anne)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Complaint
                COMPLAINT against Robert L McDonald, Sovereign Bank Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 65611, filed by Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund. Local 103, I.E.B.W., Electrical Workers' Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Local 103, I.E.B.W., Electrical Workers Educational and Cultural Fund, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, IBEW, Electrical Workers' Supplementary Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103, I.E.B.W. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Civil Cover Sheet # (4) Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(York, Steve)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Summons Issued
                  Summons Issued as to Robert L McDonald, Sovereign Bank. (York, Steve)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                    If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (York, Steve)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 53 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?