Andrade v. Brashmode, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11507-WGY

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Derek A. Andrade, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Landry, III +1 781 356 1399 +1 781 356 3393 johnlandry.glr@verizon.net
v.
No Logo Brashmode, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Christopher Martins, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 7/15/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 9/15/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Smith, Bonnie)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Notice of Reassignment
    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. Judge Robert E. Keeton no longer assigned to case. From this date forward the case number on all pleadings should be followed by the initials WGY. (Folan, Karen)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Notice of potential dismissal of action pursuant t
      Notice of potential dismissal of action pursuant to FCRP 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1(b): This action will be dismisssed in twenty days unless proof of service is filed.. (Folan, Karen)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against Brashmode, Inc., Christopher Martins Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 65621, filed by Derek A. Andrade. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Folan, Karen)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Folan, Karen)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Summons Issued
            Summons Issued as to Brashmode, Inc., Christopher Martins. (Folan, Karen)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 25 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?