Ali v. Boyd et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11543-WGY

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Yusuf M. Ali, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Fred Galimi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'REILLY, GROSSO & GROSS, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl J. Gross +1 506 620 0055 +1 508 620 7655 kgross@ogglaw.com
No Logo Leo V. Marshal, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'REILLY, GROSSO & GROSS, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl J. Gross +1 506 620 0055 +1 508 620 7655 kgross@ogglaw.com
No Logo Steve Boyd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'REILLY, GROSSO & GROSS, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karl J. Gross +1 506 620 0055 +1 508 620 7655 kgross@ogglaw.com
Office Boston
Filed 7/21/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Suffolk
Terminated 9/6/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Bell, Marie)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw
    Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Motion to Withdraw [1] Complaint. cc/cl. (Bell, Marie)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005, Terminated: 9/6/2005 Motion to Withdraw
      MOTION to Withdraw [1] Complaint by Yusuf M. Ali. c/s.(Bell, Marie)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
        MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument filed by Steve Boyd, Fred Galimi, Leo V. Marshal. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3)(Bell, Marie)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005, Terminated: 9/6/2005 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument by Steve Boyd, Fred Galimi, Leo V. Marshal. c/s. (Bell, Marie)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against Steve Boyd, Fred Galimi, Leo V. Marshal Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 65789, filed by Yusuf M. Ali. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Marie)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Bell, Marie)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Summons Issued
                Summons Issued as to Steve Boyd, Fred Galimi, Leo V. Marshal. (Bell, Marie)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 57 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?