USA v. Joyner et al
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-mj-01703-CBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil J. Gallagher, Jr. +1 617 748 3397 neil.gallagher@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Levitt +1 617 748 3100 +1 617 748 3965 peter.s.levitt@usdoj.gov
Office Boston
Filed 7/22/2005
County Suffolk
Terminated 9/8/2005
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005 Terminate Criminal Case
Case Terminated as to Husie Joyner, Greg Bing, Donnelle Joyner, Anthony Smith, Ralph House, Gerard Kimble (Catino, Theresa)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005 Terminate Merged Defendant
    Terminated merged defendant case for Donnelle Joyner; Husie Joyner; Gerard Kimble; Anthony Smith; Greg Bing and Ralph House, pending deadlines, motions, and excludables. Criminal Case Number: 05cr10239-RCL. (Catino, Theresa)
      LREF
      Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
      Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Gerard Kimble. (Smith3, Dianne)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Detention Hearing
        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein :Detention Hearing as to Gerard Kimble held on 8/24/2005; AUSA Gallagher and Attorney Entine for dft.; Govt. reports it withdraws the appeal and stay of USMJ Swartwood order of release; USMJ Dein sets conditions of relese for dft. Kimble. (Court Reporter D.R..) (Quinn, Thomas)
          LREF
          Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Letter (non-motion)
          Letter (non-motion) regarding transcript as to Gerard Kimble (Hassett, Kathy)
            LREF
            Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Memorandum in Support
            MEMORANDUM in Support by USA as to Donnelle Joyner, Gerard Kimble re [24] MOTION to Revoke Without Attachments (Gallagher, Neil)
              LREF
              Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion to Revoke
              First MOTION to Revoke Order of Release as to Donnelle Joyner, Gerard Kimbleby USA. (Gallagher, Neil)
                LREF
                Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/22/05 as to Gerard Kimble. (Hassett, Kathy)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                  Judge Charles B. Swartwood : MEMORANDUM OF PROBABLE CAUSE as to Greg Bing, Donnelle Joyner, Anthony Smith & Gerard Kimble. ORDER OF DETENTION as to Greg Bing & Anthony Smith, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                    MOTION for Reconsideration for Pre-Trial Detention Under 18 U.S.C. s3142 (f)(1) and (f)(2)(A) as to Donnelle Joyner, Gerard Kimble by USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                      Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Electronic ORDER entered granting [21] Motion for Reconsideration Pre-Trial Detention as to Donnelle Joyner (3), Gerard Kimble (6). "ALLOWED." cc/cl (Roland, Lisa)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Bond Hearing
                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood :Bond Hearing as to Donnelle Joyner, Gerard Kimble held on 8/5/2005. Case called, Counsel (Gallagher, Salsberg, Entine), PTS Cuascut & Defedants appear, Counsel argue issue of release, Governement's motion to reconsider ALLOWED, Matter taken under advisement, Order to issue, Defendants remanded to the custody of the US Marshals. (11:06 A.) (Roland, Lisa)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Affidavit of TFA Ridlon by USA as to Greg Bing, Donnelle Joyner, Anthony Smith, Gerard Kimble (Gallagher, Neil) Modified on 8/1/2005 (Jones, Sherry). document should not have been put on the docket.
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Exhibit/Witness List
                            EXHIBIT/WITNESS LIST re: P/C & Detention Hearing as to Greg Bing, Donnelle Joyner, Anthony Smith, Gerard Kimble. (Roland, Lisa)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Detention Hearing
                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood :Detention Hearing as to Greg Bing, Donnelle Joyner, Anthony Smith, Gerard Kimble held on 7/28/2005, Preliminary Examination as to Greg Bing, Donnelle Joyner, Anthony Smith, Gerard Kimble held on 7/28/2005. Case called, Counsel (Gallagher, Iavino, Schneider, Butters, Entine), PTS & Defendants appear, Government calls Agent Ridlon, Cross, Re-Direct, Re-Cross, Defendant Bing assents to an order of detention but reserves his right to a hearing in the future, Closing Arguments, Matters taken under advisement, Order to issue. (3:32, 4:20 P.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                Judge Charles B. Swartwood : CJA 20 as to Gerard Kimble: Appointment of Attorney Benjamin D. Entine for Gerard Kimble. (Roland, Lisa)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                  Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Greg Bing, Gerard Kimble; Detention Hearing set for 7/28/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood. (Roland, Lisa)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Affidavit
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Joao J. Monteiro re: [1] Complaint. (Roland, Lisa)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT as to Husie Joyner (1), Greg Bing (2), Donnelle Joyner (3), Anthony Smith (4), Ralph House (5), Gerard Kimble (6). (Roland, Lisa)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Initial Appearance
                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood :Initial Appearance as to Greg Bing, Donnelle Joyner, Anthony Smith, Gerard Kimble held on 7/22/2005. Case called, Counsel (Levitt, Gallagher, Gormley, Schneider, Bonilla, Entine)PTS O'Brien, Affsa & Defendants appear, Financial Affidavits filed by all Defendants, Defendants notified of rights, charges & maximum penalties, Government moves for detention and continuance, Case continued to 7/28/2005 @ for P/C & Detention Hearings, All defendants remanded to the custody of the US Marshals. (2:27 P.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Arrest
                                          Arrest of Greg Bing, Donnelle Joyner, Anthony Smith, Gerard Kimble. (Roland, Lisa)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                            Attorney update in case as to Husie Joyner, Greg Bing, Donnelle Joyner, Anthony Smith, Ralph House, Gerard Kimble. Attorney Peter K. Levitt and Neil J. Gallagher, Jr for USA added. Attorney Theodore B. Heinrich terminated. (Roland, Lisa)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 542 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?