Barbara R. Bajovich- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 14-02167
District Judge Kent Lindquist, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 1:54 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbara R. Bajovich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kevin Schmidt(NW)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin Schmidt +1 219 756 0555 +1 219 756 9393
v.
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Bank of America, NA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bank of America, N.A.
No Logo Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Leighton O'Connell-Miller +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 leighton.oconnellmiller@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brooks J. Grainger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brooks J. Grainger +1 574 272 1000 +1 574 272 4303 bankruptcy@krisorlaw.com
No Logo Nancy J. Gargula, U.S. Trustee
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2015, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing.(related document(s)21 Docket Entry (Hrg)). Notice Date 04/25/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/26/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
    Docket Entry: Attorney(s) Schmidt And OConnell-Mullen for Plaintiff and Defendant report(s) to Court by phone on This Adversary proceeding that the parties are attempting to settle the same, and jointly request reset of telephonic Pre-trial Conference). The foregoing is hereby reset for the 16th day of June 20 15 at 1:30 o'clock P .M. SO ORDERED. (related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Barbara R. Bajovich). (tlw) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/7/2015, Entered: None
      BNC Certificate of Mailing.(related document(s)19 Docket Entry (Hrg)). Notice Date 03/07/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/08/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
        Docket Entry: Attorneys Schmidt and O'Conell-Miller for Plaintiff and Defendant reports to Court on this Adversary Procceding (related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Barbara R. Bajovich) that the parties are attempting to settle the same and jointly request reset telephonic pre-trial conference. The foregoing is hereby reset for the 21st day of April 2015 at 11:20 o'clock a.m. So ordered. (tlw) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/25/2015, Entered: None
          BNC Certificate of Mailing.(related document(s)17 Docket Entry (Hrg)). Notice Date 01/25/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
            Docket Entry: Attorney Schmidt and Oconell-Miller for Plaintiff and Defendants report to court on this 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Barbara R. Bajovich that the parties are attempting to settle the same, and jointly reqeust reset of telephonic pretrail conference. The foregoing is hereby reset for the 3rd day of March 2015 at 11:40 o'clock a.m. SO ORDERED. (tlw) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
              Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (O'Connell-Miller, James) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                Proposed Order filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (related document(s)13 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC). (O'Connell-Miller, James) Modified on 1/8/2015 (cag). (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                  Notice of Appearance by James Leighton O'Connell-Miller Filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (O'Connell-Miller, James) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                    Second Motion to Extend Time Unopposed Filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Barbara R. Bajovich) (Grainger, Brooks). Modified on 12/22/2014 (pjn). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                      BNC Certificate of Mailing.(related document(s)9 Order on Motion to Extend Time). Notice Date 12/10/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                        BNC Certificate of Mailing.(related document(s)10 Order Setting Conference). Notice Date 12/10/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                          Order for Initial Pretrial Conference (related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Barbara R. Bajovich). Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/20/2015 at 10:20 AM at Hammond - 3rd Floor, Courtroom 6. (cag) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                            Order (Related Doc # 7). (cag) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                              Proposed Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time Filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (related document(s)7 Motion to Extend Time filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC) (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Barbara R. Bajovich) Objections to Motion due by 12/3/2014. (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Appearance of Krisor & Associates by Brooks J. Grainger Filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of Service of Domestic Return Receipt #7013 2250 0000 7463 3791 Filed by Plaintiff Barbara R. Bajovich (related document(s)3 Summons Service Executed) (Schmidt(NW), Kevin) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                      Certificate of Service of Domestic Return Receipt #7013 2250 0000 7463 3807 Filed by Plaintiff Barbara R. Bajovich (related document(s)3 Summons Service Executed) (Schmidt(NW), Kevin) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                        Certificate of Service of Summons on Bank of America, N.A. 10/30/2014; Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 10/30/2014 . (Schmidt(NW), Kevin) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                          Summons Issued on Bank of America, N.A. Date Issued 10/29/2014, Answer Due 11/28/2014; Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Date Issued 10/29/2014, Answer Due 11/28/2014. (pjn) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                            Adversary case 14-02167. (91 (declaratory judgment)) To Determine the Regular Monthly Mortgage Payment Complaint by Barbara R. Bajovich against Bank of America, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Receipt Number na, Fee Amount $350. (Schmidt(NW), Kevin) Modified on 10/29/2014 (pjn). (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?