SUPERVALU, INC. v. UNITED EGG PRODUCERS, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-06736

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2019 at 10:40 AM EDT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Cal-maine Foods, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIAN E. ROBISON +1 214 698 3370 +1 214 999 7770 BRobison@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIAN E. ROBISON +1 214 698 3370 +1 214 999 7770 BRobison@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Nucal Foods, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/06/2014 William M. Goodman +1 415 421 6140 +1 415 398 5030 wgoodman@kasowitz.com
TERMINATED: 03/06/2014 William M. Goodman +1 415 421 6140 +1 415 398 5030 wgoodman@kasowitz.com
No Logo Rose Acre Farms, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Donald Michael Barnes +1 202 778 3056 +7783 778 778 3063 DBARNES@PORTERWRIGHT.COM
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Donald Michael Barnes +1 202 778 3056 +7783 778 778 3063 DBARNES@PORTERWRIGHT.COM
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Cosmos Monica, Jr. +1 202 778 3050 +1 202 778 3063 jmonica@porterwright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Cosmos Monica, Jr. +1 202 778 3050 +1 202 778 3063 jmonica@porterwright.com
No Logo DAYBREAK FOODS, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2015 Scott Arthur Eggers +1 212 969 3412 +1 212 969 2900 Seggers@proskauer.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2015 Adrian Fontecilla +1 212 839 5626 +1 212 839 5599 afontecilla@proskauer.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2015 Christopher E. Ondeck +1 202 416 5865 condeck@proskauer.com
No Logo HILLANDALE FARMS EAST, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Wendelynne J. Newton +1 412 562 8932 +1 412 562 1041 wendelynne.newton@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY THEODORE H. JOBES +1 215 299 2786 tjobes@foxrothschild.com
No Logo HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA., INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Wendelynne J. Newton +1 412 562 8932 +1 412 562 1041 wendelynne.newton@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY THEODORE H. JOBES +1 215 299 2786 tjobes@foxrothschild.com
No Logo HILLANDALE FARMS, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Wendelynne J. Newton +1 412 562 8932 +1 412 562 1041 wendelynne.newton@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY THEODORE H. JOBES +1 215 299 2786 tjobes@foxrothschild.com
No Logo HILLANDALE-GETTYSBURG, L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Wendelynne J. Newton +1 412 562 8932 +1 412 562 1041 wendelynne.newton@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY THEODORE H. JOBES +1 215 299 2786 tjobes@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Michael Foods, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie C. Mahan +1 202 682 7231 carrie.mahan@weil.com
No Logo MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES, L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/11/2014 RYAN M. HURLEY +1 317 237 1144 +1 317 237 1000 ryan.hurley@faegreBD.com
TERMINATED: 03/11/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathy Lynn Osborn +1 317 237 8261 +1 317 237 1000 klosborn@faegrebd.com
No Logo NATIONAL FOOD CORP., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin L. Gray, Jr. +1 206 628 7665 +1 206 628 7699 montygray@dwt.com
No Logo OHIO FRESH EGGS, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keating, Muething & Klekamp, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M Callow, Jr. +1 513 579 6400 +1 513 579 6419 jcallow@kmklaw.com
No Logo R.w. Sauder, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTINE C. LEVIN +1 215 994 4000 christine.levin@dechert.com
No Logo Sparboe Farms Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/18/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Troy J Hutchinson +1 612 977 8415 +1 612 977 8650 thutchinson@briggs.com
No Logo UNITED EGG ASSOCIATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JAN P. LEVINE +1 215 981 4714 +1 215 359 1606 levinej@pepperlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBIN P. SUMNER +1 215 981 4652 +1 215 689 2836 sumnerr@pepperlaw.com
No Logo United Egg Producers, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JAN P. LEVINE +1 215 981 4714 +1 215 359 1606 levinej@pepperlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBIN P. SUMNER +1 215 981 4652 +1 215 689 2836 sumnerr@pepperlaw.com
No Logo UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JAN P. LEVINE +1 215 981 4714 +1 215 359 1606 levinej@pepperlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/10/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBIN P. SUMNER +1 215 981 4652 +1 215 689 2836 sumnerr@pepperlaw.com
No Logo Supervalu Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by nussbaumpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda P. Nussbaum +1 212 702 7053 +1 212 681 0300 lnussbaum@nussbaumpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda P. Nussbaum +1 212 702 7053 +1 212 681 0300 lnussbaum@nussbaumpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vanek, Vickers & Masini, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Paul Germaine +1 312 224 1505 +1 312 224 1510 dgermaine@vaneklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Paul Germaine +1 312 224 1505 +1 312 224 1510 dgermaine@vaneklaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE, OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AGAINST DAYBREAK FOODS, INC. ADDITIONAL INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN. (SEE PAPER NO. 1224 IN 08-MD-2002) SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/30/2015. 6/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (aeg, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE by SUPERVALU, INC. of Change of Firm Affiliation. Certificate of Service. (NUSSBAUM, LINDA) Modified on 4/30/2015 (ems).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES OF PLAINTIFFS THE KROGER CO., SAFEWAY INC., WALGREEN CO., HY-VEE, INC., ALBERTSONS LLC, THE GREAT ATLANTIC & PACIFIC TEA COMPANY, INC., H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY AND CONOPCO, INC., GIANT EAGLE, INC., SUPERVALU INC., PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC., WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., ROUNDY'S SUPERMARKETS, INC., H.J. HEINZ COMPANY, L.P., C&S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., KRAFT FOODS GLOBAL, INC., GENERAL MILLS, INC., NESTLE USA, INC., AND THE KELLOGG COMPANY AGAINST DEFENDANTS HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA., INC., HILLANDALE-GETTYSBURG, L.P., HILLANDALE FARMS EAST, INC., AND HILLANDALE FARMS, INC., ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITH EACH SIDE BEARING ITS OWN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation) 7/1/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 1004 IN 08-MD-2002) (ems) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER THAT THE ORAL ARGUMENT ON DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS SPARBOE'S COUNTERCLAIM SCHEDULED FOR 10:00 AM ON JUNE 27, 2014 IS CANCELLED BECAUSE THE PARTIES HAVE SETTLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/18/2014; 6/19/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 996 IN 08-MD-2002). (tjd) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES OF PLAINTIFFS THE KROGER CO., SAFEWAY INC., WALGREEN CO., HY-VEE, INC., ALBERTSONS LLC, THE GREAT ATLANTIC & PACIFIC TEA COMPANY, INC., H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY AND CONOPCO, INC., GIANT EAGLE, INC., SUPERVALU INC., PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC., WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., ROUNDY'S SUPERMARKETS, INC., H.J. HEINZ COMPANY, L.P., C&S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., KRAFT FOODS GLOBAL, INC., GENERAL MILLS, INC., NESTLE USA, INC., AND THE KELLOGG COMPANY AGAINST DEFENDANT SPARBOE FARMS, INC. ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITH EACH SIDE BEARING ITS OWN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/18/2014; (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation) 6/18/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 995 IN 08-MD-2002).(tjd) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE COUNTERCLAIMS IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES OF COUNTERPLAINTIFF SPARBOE FARMS, INC. AGAINST COUNTERDEFENDANTS THE KROGER CO., SAFEWAY INC., ALBERTSONS LLC, THE GREAT ATLANTIC & PACIFIC TEA COMPANY, INC., H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY, GIANT EAGLE, INC., PUBLIX SUPERMARKETS, INC., WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC., AND C&S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC. ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITH EACH SIDE BEARING ITS OWN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/18/2014; (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation) 6/18/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 994 IN 08-MD-2002).(tjd) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER THAT THE ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED TO BE HELD AT 10:00 A.M. ON 5/12/2014 IN COURTROOM 10B, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106 (SEE 4/21/2014 ORDER, DOC. NO. 949), IS RESCHEDULED TO BEGIN AT 1:45 P.M. ON THE SAME DAY AND IN THE SAME LOCATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/5/2014. 5/5/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 955 IN 08-MD-2002) (ems) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. EGGERS on behalf of DAYBREAK FOODS, INC. with Certificate of Service(EGGERS, SCOTT) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Appearance by ADRIAN FONTECILLA on behalf of DAYBREAK FOODS, INC. with Certificate of Service(FONTECILLA, ADRIAN) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HELD ON DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS'/COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY CAL-MAINE AND ROSE ACRE ON MAY 12, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTOOM 10B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/21/2014; 4/21/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 949 IN 08-MD-2002). (tjd) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CAL-MAINE FOODS, INC. and ROSE ACRE FARMS, INC.'s Counterclaim Against Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs. Redacted Copy, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service. (See Paper # 924 in 08-md-2002). (tjd) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HELD ON DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS'/COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE AS UNTIMELY THE COUNTERCLAIMS OF SPARBOE, CAL-MAINE, AND ROSE ACRE ON APRIL 3, 2014 IN COURTROOM 10B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/12/2014; 3/12/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 919 IN 08-MD-2002). (tjd) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES, L.P. IN 10-6705, 11-820, 10-6736, 10-6737, 11-510, AND 12-88 ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJDUICE WITH EACH SIDE BEARING ITS OWN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/10/2014;. 3/11/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 913 IN 08-MD-2002). (tjd) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41 PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST NUCAL FOODS, INC. IN 10-6705, 11-820, 10-6736, 10-6737, 11-510, 12-88 ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE WITH EACH SIDE BEARING ITS OWN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/6/2014; 3/6/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 911 IN 08-MD-2002). (tjd) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41 PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS IN THE ABOVE CASES AGAINST NATIONAL FOOD CORP. ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE WITH EACH SIDE BEARING ITS OWN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/20/2014; 2/21/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 901 IN 08-MD-2002). (tjd) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CAL-MAINE FOODS, INC. and ROSE ACRE FARMS, INC.'s Counterclaim Filed Under Seal Against Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs. (See Paper # 896 in 08-md-2002). (FILED UNDER SEAL). (tjd) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, Answer with Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against SUPERVALU, INC. by ROSE ACRE FARMS, INC..(MONICA, JOHN) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by NUCAL FOODS, INC..(GOODMAN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, by DAYBREAK FOODS, INC..(ONDECK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by HILLANDALE FARMS, INC..(JOBES, THEODORE) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by HILLANDALE FARMS EAST, INC..(JOBES, THEODORE) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by HILLANDALE-GETTYSBURG, L.P..(JOBES, THEODORE) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CAL-MAINE FOODS, INC..(ROBISON, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, and Defenses to Second Amended Complaint by MICHAEL FOODS, INC..(ANDERSON, CARRIE) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by OHIO FRESH EGGS, LLC.(CALLOW, JOSEPH) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Defendant's ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA., INC..(JOBES, THEODORE) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, by R.W. SAUDER, INC..(LEVIN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, / Answer With Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS, INC..(LEVINE, JAN) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, / Answer With Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by UNITED EGG PRODUCERS, INC..(LEVINE, JAN) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE H. JOBES on behalf of HILLANDALE FARMS, INC. with Certificate of Service(JOBES, THEODORE) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE H. JOBES on behalf of HILLANDALE FARMS EAST, INC. with Certificate of Service(JOBES, THEODORE) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE H. JOBES on behalf of HILLANDALE-GETTYSBURG, L.P. with Certificate of Service(JOBES, THEODORE) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE H. JOBES on behalf of HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA., INC. with Certificate of Service(JOBES, THEODORE) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint, re Second Amended Complaint by SPARBOE FARMS, INC..(HUTCHINSON, TROY) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAL-MAINE FOODS, INC., DAYBREAK FOODS, INC., HILLANDALE FARMS EAST, INC., HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA., INC., HILLANDALE FARMS, INC., HILLANDALE-GETTYSBURG, L.P., MICHAEL FOODS, INC., MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES, L.P., NATIONAL FOOD CORP., NUCAL FOODS, INC., OHIO FRESH EGGS, LLC, R.W. SAUDER, INC., ROSE ACRE FARMS, INC., SPARBOE FARMS, INC., UNITED EGG PRODUCERS, INC., UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS, INC. filed by SUPERVALU, INC. Jury Demand.(tjd) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ORDER THAT THE DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/1/2013;3/1/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 798 IN 08-MD-2002). (tjd) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Defendant Sparboe Farms Inc.'s ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by SPARBOE FARMS, INC. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(HUTCHINSON, TROY) Modified on 11/5/2012 (tjd). (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by OHIO FRESH EGGS, LLC.(CALLOW, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Defendant Nucal Foods, Inc.'s Answer and Defenses to Supervalu, Inc. Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by NUCAL FOODS, INC..(GOODMAN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by MICHAEL FOODS, INC..(ANDERSON, CARRIE) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, With Affirmative Defenses and Proof of Service by UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS, INC..(LEVINE, JAN) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by CAL-MAINE FOODS, INC..(ROBISON, BRIAN) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, With Affirmative Defenses and Proof of Service by UNITED EGG PRODUCERS, INC..(LEVINE, JAN) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by DAYBREAK FOODS, INC..(ONDECK, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by ROSE ACRE FARMS, INC..(MONICA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES, L.P..(HURLEY, RYAN) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN M. HURLEY on behalf of MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES, L.P. (HURLEY, RYAN) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by R.W. SAUDER, INC..(LEVIN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, With Affirmative Defenses by NATIONAL FOOD CORP..(GRAY, MARVIN) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by MARVIN L. GRAY on behalf of NATIONAL FOOD CORP. with Certificate of Service(GRAY, MARVIN) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS IN THE KROGER AND SUPERVALU ACTIONS SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING MAY 1, 2012 TO AMEND THEIR AMENDED COMPLAINTS FOR THE SOLE PURPOSE OF NAMING PRESENTLY UNSPECIFIED AFFILIATES AS ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFFS OR SERVE AND FILE ADEQUATE INSTRUMENTS OF ASSIGNMENT OF CLAIMS AND/OR RATIFICATIONS ON BEHALF OF ANY PRESENTLY UNSPECIFIED AFFILIATES AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/11/2012; 4/12/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 652 IN 08-MD-2002). (tjd) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAL-MAINE FOODS, INC., DAYBREAK FOODS, INC., HILLANDALE FARMS EAST, INC., HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA., INC., HILLANDALE FARMS, INC., HILLANDALE-GETTYSBURG, L.P., MICHAEL FOODS, INC., MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES, L.P., NATIONAL FOOD CORP., NUCAL FOODS, INC., OHIO FRESH EGGS, LLC, R.W. SAUDER, INC., ROSE ACRE FARMS, INC., SPARBOE FARMS, INC., UNITED EGG PRODUCERS, INC., UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS, INC. filed by SUPERVALU, INC. Jury Demand.(tjd) Modified on 2/10/2012 (tjd). (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Disclosure by SUPERVALU, INC..(GERMAINE, DAVID) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Disclosure by SUPERVALU, INC..(GERMAINE, DAVID) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN P. SUMNER on behalf of UNITED EGG ASSOCIATION, UNITED EGG PRODUCERS, INC., UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SUMNER, ROBIN) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by JAN P. LEVINE on behalf of UNITED EGG ASSOCIATION, UNITED EGG PRODUCERS, INC., UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS, INC. with Certificate of Service(LEVINE, JAN) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SUPERVALU, INC..(jwl, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against CAL-MAINE FOODS, INC., DAYBREAK FOODS, INC., HILLANDALE FARMS EAST, INC., HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA., INC., HILLANDALE FARMS, INC., HILLANDALE-GETTYSBURG, L.P., MICHAEL FOODS, INC., MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES, L.P., NATIONAL FOOD CORP., NUCAL FOODS, INC., OHIO FRESH EGGS, LLC, R.W. SAUDER, INC., ROSE ACRE FARMS, INC., SPARBOE FARMS, INC., UNITED EGG ASSOCIATION, UNITED EGG PRODUCERS, INC., UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 033048.), filed by SUPERVALU, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?