McNally v. J.Michael Landscaping, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11624-RWZ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:58 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo James Merloni, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
No Logo Martin F. Walsh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo New England Laborers Training Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Paul J McNally, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo J.Michael Landscaping, Inc., Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 8/4/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Middlesex
Terminated 6/30/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Writ Issued
WRIT of Execution issued (Urso, Lisa)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Urso, Lisa)
      LREF
      Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
      Judge Rya W. Zobel : endorsed ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered as to J. Michael Landscaping, Inc. (Urso, Lisa)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
        Judge Rya W. Zobel : endorsedORDER entered granting [28] Motion for Default Judgment against J. Michael Landscaping, Inc. (Urso, Lisa)
          LREF
          Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
            Proposed Document(s) submitted by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. Document received: Default Judgment. (Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Affidavit
                AFFIDAVIT of Philip M. Mackay by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT of Thomas P.V. Masiello as to Military Service, Infancy and Incompetence by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Geiman, Gregory) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2006 (Johnson, Jay).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [28] MOTION for Default Judgment as to J. Michael Landscaping, Inc. filed by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006, Terminated: 6/27/2006 Motion for Default Judgment
                      MOTION for Default Judgment as to J. Michael Landscaping, Inc. by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        Judge Rya W. Zobel : Electronic ORDER entered granting [27] Motion for Extension of Time to File to 6/5/06 to file default judgment (Urso, Lisa)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006, Terminated: 5/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to June 5, 2006 to File for Entry of Default Judgment by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            Judge Rya W. Zobel : Electronic ORDER entered granting [26] Motion for Extension of Time to File default judgment to 5/5/06. (Urso, Lisa)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006, Terminated: 4/25/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to May 5, 2006 to File for Entry of Default Judgment by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to J.Michael Landscaping, Inc. (Johnson, Jay)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Terminate Motions
                                  Motions terminated: [24] MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Martin F. Walsh,, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund,, James Merloni, Jr, Paul J McNally,, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund,, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund,. (Johnson, Jay)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006, Terminated: 3/24/2006 Motion for Entry of Default
                                    Request for Entry of Default by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. As to J.Michael Landscaping,Inc.(Geiman, Gregory) Modified on 3/24/2006 (Johnson, Jay).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Summons Returned Executed
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Peabody Construction Company, Inc. served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Summons Returned Executed
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Modern Continental Construction CO., Inc. served on 1/6/2006, answer due 1/26/2006. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Summons Returned Executed
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Barletta Engineering Corporation served on 12/23/2005, answer due 1/12/2006. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                            Judge Rya W. Zobel : ORDER entered granting [11] Motion for approval of attachment (Urso, Lisa)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Order on Motion for WritCourt Filing
                                              Judge Rya W. Zobel : ORDER entered granting [16] Motion for Writ (Urso, Lisa)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                Judge Rya W. Zobel : ORDER for Preliminary Injunction entered. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Terminate Motions
                                                  Motions terminated: [8] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Martin F. Walsh,, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund,, James Merloni, Jr, Paul J McNally,, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund,, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund,. (see document #18) (Urso, Lisa)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Motion Hearing
                                                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel : Motion Hearing held on 1/12/2006 re [8] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Martin F. Walsh,, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund,, James Merloni, Jr, Paul J McNally,, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund,, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund,, [16] MOTION for Writ of Attachment filed by Martin F. Walsh,, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund,, James Merloni, Jr, Paul J McNally,, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund,, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund,, [11] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant filed by Martin F. Walsh,, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund,, James Merloni, Jr, Paul J McNally,, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund,, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund,. No one appears for the defendants. Judge allows motions; (Court Reporter Catherine Handel.) (Urso, Lisa)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [16] MOTION for Writ of Attachment, [8] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, [11] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant: Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Terminate Documents
                                                        Documents terminated: [17] MOTION to Correct [11] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant filed by Martin F. Walsh,, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund,, James Merloni, Jr, Paul J McNally,, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund,, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund,. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: #17 "motion to correct" corrected because: WRONG EVENT. This is not a motion. The pleading is a corrected certificate of consultation and should have been filed as such. In the future the filer should call the clerks office if there are questions. The clerk will make the fix. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005, Terminated: 12/8/2005 Motion to Correct
                                                            Corrected LR 7.1(a)(2) Certification Re: [11] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund.(Geiman, Gregory) Modified on 12/8/2005 (Johnson, Jay).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 ~Motion for Writ
                                                              MOTION for Writ of Attachment by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                Proposed Document(s) submitted by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. Document received: Finding and Order of Approval of Attachment. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Affidavit
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Affidavit
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Philip M. Mackay by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [11] MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant filed by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        MOTION for Attachment of Personal Property of Defendant by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          NOTICE of 3 Summonses Issued re [7] Amended Complaint,, (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                            Proposed Document(s) submitted by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. Document received: Order for Preliminary Injunction. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [8] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barletta Engineering Corporation, Modern Continental Construction CO., Inc., Peabody Construction Company, Inc., J.Michael Landscaping, Inc., filed by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Terminate Motions
                                                                                    Mooting terminated: [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Martin F. Walsh,, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund,, James Merloni, Jr, Paul J McNally,, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund,, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund,, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund,. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed J.Michael Landscaping, Inc. served on 9/20/2005, answer due 10/11/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Philip Mackay re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Anne Sills re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                COMPLAINT against J.Michael Landscaping, Inc. Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 66012, filed by James Merloni, Jr, Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund, Massachusetts Legal Services Fund, Martin F. Walsh, Massachusetts Laborers Annuity Fund, Paul J McNally, Massachusetts Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, New England Laborers Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to J.Michael Landscaping, Inc.. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?