Sheehan v. Far East Electrical
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11634-RGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anthony J. Salamone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
No Logo Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
No Logo Russell F. Sheehan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Far East Electrical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sovereign Bancorp, Inc., Trustee
Officially listed as "Sovereign Bank"
Office Boston
Filed 8/5/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Suffolk
Terminated 2/28/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns : ed. DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED in favor of plaintiff (Flaherty, Elaine)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Flaherty, Elaine)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [12] Motion for Default Judgment against Far East Electrical (Flaherty, Elaine)
        LREF
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
        Proposed Document(s) submitted by Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan(as he is Administrator, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.). Document received: Default Judgment. (Geiman, Gregory)
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Affidavit
          AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan(as he is Administrator, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.). (Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of Richard P. Gambino as to Military Service, Infancy and Incompetence by Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan(as he is Administrator, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.). (Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
              AFFIDAVIT of Richard P. Gambino in Support re [12] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Far East Electrical, Inc. filed by Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan(as he is Administrator, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM in Support re [12] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Far East Electrical, Inc. filed by Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan(as he is Administrator, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.). (Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006, Terminated: 2/27/2006 Motion for Default Judgment
                  MOTION for Default Judgment as to Far East Electrical, Inc. by Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                    Judge Richard G. Stearns : STANDING ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered. (Johnson, Mary)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                      NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Far East Electrical, Inc. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Motion to Correct
                        MOTION to Correct [8] MOTION for Entry of Default by Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan(as he is Administrator, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.).(Geiman, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
                          MOTION for Entry of Default by Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan(as he is Administrator, Electrical Workers' Health and Welfare Fund, Local 103 I.B.E.W.).(Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                            Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [8] Motion for Entry of Default, granting [9] Motion to Correct (Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 1/3/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Far East Electrical, Inc. served on 11/29/2005, answer due 12/19/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Answer
                                ANSWER of Trustee by Sovereign Bank, filed. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Summons to Trustee Returned Executed
                                  SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed Sovereign Bank served on 9/26/2005, answer due 10/17/2005. (Sills, Anne)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Writ Issued
                                    WRIT of attachment issued (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Order on Motion for Writ
                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [2] Motion for Writ (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION for Writ filed by Russell F. Sheehan. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 ~Motion for Writ
                                          Ex parte MOTION for Writ by Russell F. Sheehan.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against Far East Electrical, Inc. Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 66067, filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Russell F. Sheehan, Russell F. Sheehan, Russell F. Sheehan, Russell F. Sheehan. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Summons Issued
                                                Summons Issued as to Far East Electrical, Inc.. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?