AL-ALWI v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00681

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 16, 2020 at 12:36 AM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MOATH HAMZA AHMED AL-ALWI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by QC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramzi Kassem +1 718 340 4558 +1 718 340 4478 ramzi.kassem@law.cuny.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Connolly +1 410 332 0444 +1 410 659 0436 jconnolly@zuckerman.com
v.
No Logo ASHTON B. CARTER, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary of Defense Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
No Logo BARACK H. OBAMA, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
President Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
President 
TERMINATED: 02/22/2017 Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
President 
TERMINATED: 02/22/2017 Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
No Logo DAVID HEATH, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Colonel Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Colonel Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
No Logo KYLE J. COZAD, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Rear Admiral Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Rear Admiral Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Unclassified Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [Dkt. #1] is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that respondents' Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment [Dkt. #15] is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety. SO ORDERED. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/21/2017. (jth) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/21/2017. (jth) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None USCA Order (No Link)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ORDER of USCA ORDERED that the motion be granted, and this petition be dismissed. USCA Case Number 16-5368. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ERRATA to Notice to the Court by ASHTON B. CARTER, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II 27 Notice (Other),,,,,,,, filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DAVID HEATH, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, PETER J. CLARKE, JEFFREY HABERSON, TOM COPERMAN, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JOHN DOE, ROBERT GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DONNIE THOMAS, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, KYLE J. COZAD, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., BRUCE E. VARGO, DAVID E. HEATH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID THOMAS, JR., COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TOM COPEMAN, STEVEN BLAISDELL, WADE F. DAVIS, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., MARK H. BUZBY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GORDON R. ENGLAND. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Notice to the Court, # 2 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ASHTON B. CARTER, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 68, # 2 Exhibit 69, # 3 Exhibit 70, # 4 Exhibit 71, # 5 Exhibit 72, # 6 Exhibit 73, # 7 Exhibit 74)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Hearing
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Respondents' Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment by ASHTON B. CARTER, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/31/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE re 15 Notice (Other), Motion to Dismiss filed by MOATH HAMZA AHMED AL-ALWI. (Kassem, Ramzi) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/20/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/19/2015. (jf) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Show Cause Returned Executed
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Case reassigned to Judge Richard J. Leon as related to case 05-cv-2223. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MOATH HAMZA AHMED AL-ALWI (rdj) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MOATH HAMZA AHMED AL-ALWI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?