KING v. PLAIN GREEN, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 5:11-cv-00978
District Judge Fred Biery, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 2:51 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sonja King, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lorenzana & Sarhan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha Beard-Duncan +1 512 338 0529 martha@beard-duncan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weisberg & Meyers, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon N Robbins +1 888 595 9111 +1 866 317 2674 jrobbins@consumerlawinfo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weisberg & Myers - Phoenix

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Snow Thompson, IV +1 888 595 9111 +1 866 565 1327 rthompson@attorneysforconsumers.com
v.
No Logo Plain Green, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (rf) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
    MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Sonja King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Panvini, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (rf) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
        MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Sonja King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Beard-Duncan, Martha) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Plain Green, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (rf) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
            Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Plain Green, LLC (rf) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Filing Clerk's Entry of Default by Sonja King (Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                MOTION for Default Judgment against Plain Green LLC by Sonja King. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT in Support of 6 Notice of Filing Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by Sonja King. (Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Filing Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by Sonja King (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonja King. Plain Green, LLC served on 12/19/2011, answer due 1/9/2012. (Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                        Summons Issued as to Plain Green, LLC. (kh2) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                          Certificate of Interested Parties by SONJA KING. (Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SONJA KING. (Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0542-4109412), filed by SONJA KING. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurz, Dennis) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 45 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?