Arbour v. The Microoptical Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11730-JLA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:32 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ann Marie Arbour, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R Ardito +1 508 431 2222 +1 508 431 2211 drardito@aol.com
v.
No Logo The Microoptical Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Hale +1 617 570 1252 +1 617 227 8591 rhale@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erin S. Martino +1 617 946 4927 +1 617 946 4801 emartino@seyfarth.com
Office Boston
Filed 8/22/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1218(2) Americans with Disabilities Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Bristol
Terminated 1/26/2006
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander : ORDER entered: SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Lovett, Jarrett)
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
    REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. After mediation, the case was settled. Please enter a 30 day order of dismissal.(Tyler, Rebecca)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Lovett, Jarrett)
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
        STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ann Marie Arbour, The Microoptical Corporation. (Martino, Erin)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Notice of ADR Conference
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference. Mediation with principals present set for 12/15/2005 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 on the third floor before ADR Panel Member Marilyn H. Zuckerman, Esq. Confidential mediation statements must be received by Ms. Zuckerman NO LATER THAN 12/8/05 at the following address: P.O. Box 610209 Newton Highlands, MA 02461.(Tyler, Rebecca)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider
            Electronic Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Marilyn Zuckerman, Esq. appointed.(Tyler, Rebecca)
              LREF
              Blank 18 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/11/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing and Scheduling Conference held on October 18, 2005 before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/345-6787 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                LREF
                Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Answer
                ANSWER to Complaint by The Microoptical Corporation.(Martino, Erin)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider
                  Electronic Notice Regarding assignment to ADR Provider. Counsel are instructed to confer with eachother and choose three mutually agreeable names from the Court's list of ADR Panel members. (The list may be accessed through the court's website at www.mad.uscourts.gov, click on "guides and publications", then click on "ADR Panel Members".) In addition, choose three dates on which all counsel and principals are available to attend the mediation. The three names and dates must be provided to the ADR Program (by calling 617-748-4140) NO LATER THAN November 16, 2005.(Tyler, Rebecca)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Rejection of Filing re: Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures and Settlement Proposal sent to David R. Ardito. (Patch, Christine)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                      Case Reassigned to Judge Joyce London Alexander. Judge Patti B. Saris no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing. (Patch, Christine)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Consent by all parties to Jurisdiction by US MagisCourt Filing
                        CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ann Marie Arbour, The Microoptical Corporation.. (Patch, Christine)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                          Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 4/28/2006. Plaintiff's expert designation deadline: 2/28/06. Defendant's expert designation deadline: 2/28/06. Summary Judgment Motion due by 5/31/2006; opposition due by 6/30/06. Hearing on Summary Judgment or Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. Case to be referred to Mediation program: November, 2005. Parties consent to trial by Magistrate. (Patch, Christine)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                            Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation: November, 2005. (Patch, Christine)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Scheduling Conference
                              ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2005. Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2005 re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Count IV Of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Microoptical Corporation. Court hears argument of counsel. Court denies Motion to Dismiss. Court sets discovery and motion filing schedule. Hearing on Summary Judgment motion set for 7/26/05 at 2:00 p.m. Parties conset to trial before Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Court Reporter Lee Marzilli.) (Alba, Robert)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment - MicroOptical Corporation Local Rule 16.1(D)(3) Certification)(Hale, Robert)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Rejection of Filing re: Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Complaint sent to David Ardito (Patch, Christine)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Erin S. Martino on behalf of The Microoptical Corporation (Martino, Erin)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal Of Counts II And III Of Plaintiff's Complaint by Ann Marie Arbour, The Microoptical Corporation. (Martino, Erin)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Hearing on [4] MOTION to Dismiss Count IV Of Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2005 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Erin S. Martino in Support re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Count IV Of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Microoptical Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Hale, Robert)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Count IV Of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Microoptical Corporation. (Hale, Robert)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005, Terminated: 1/26/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss Count IV Of Plaintiff's Complaint by The Microoptical Corporation.(Hale, Robert)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 state court record
                                                STATE COURT Record The Microoptical Corporation served on 8/2/2005, answer due 8/22/2005.. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2005 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Letter sent to Attorney re inactive status.
                                                    Letter sent to Attorney Erin S. Martino advising of inactive status in the Bar of this Court. Notice, reregistration and ECF application included. (Patch, Christine)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Microoptical Corporation. (Patch, Christine)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Notice of Removal
                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Microoptical Corporation from Bristol County Superior Court, case number 2005-00783. $ 250, receipt number 66413. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Patch, Christine)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?