USA v. Hunt
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cr-10221-RCL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 13, 2021 at 8:18 AM DT (1 month ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia W. Lie +1 617 748 3183

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Lang +1 617 748 3175 +1 617 748 3954 james.lang@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Boston
Filed 8/24/2005
County Barnstable
Terminated 8/29/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-3
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841A=CD.F CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE - SELL, DISTRIBUTE, OR DISPENSE - Distribution of Cocaine Base 21USC841(a)(1)(A) AND CRIMINAL FORFEITURE 21USC853
Count 1-3
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841A=CD.F CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE - SELL, DISTRIBUTE, OR DISPENSE - Distribution of Cocaine Base 21USC841(a)(1)(A) AND CRIMINAL FORFEITURE 21USC853
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Pretrial Services/Probation Request
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 USCA Mandate
      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Robert Hunt re [26] Notice of Appeal. This cause came on to be heard on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The sentence imposed by the district court is affirmed. Mandate issued in the USCA 10/9/2007 (Ramos, Jeanette)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Appeal Record Returned
        Appeal Record Returned as to Robert Hunt: (Ramos, Jeanette)
          LREF
          Legal Document 44 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Letter (non-motion)
          Letter from Robert Hunt (York, Steve)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Docket Sheet sent
            Docket sheet sent to Robert Hunt (York, Steve)
              LREF
              Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 OrderCourt Filing
              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. Final Order of Forfeiture as to Robert Hunt (York, Steve)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [42] Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Robert Hunt (1) (York, Steve)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007, Terminated: 2/1/2007 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                  MOTION for Forfeiture of Property as to Robert Huntby USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Carris, Eugenia)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 USM Process Receipt and Return
                    US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Publication. served Delivered on 11/7/2006 (York, Steve)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 USM Process Receipt and Return
                      US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for One Blue 1999 Ford Expedition, vin# 1fmpu18l9xlb24120 Seized on 10/12/2006 (York, Steve)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 USM Process Receipt and Return
                        US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture. Robert Hunt served Delivered on 9/27/2006 (York, Steve)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 USM Process Receipt and Return
                          US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture. Nakia Hunt served Delivered on 9/27/2006 at 7 Raintree Circle, Apartment # 2L Brockton MA 02301 (York, Steve)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 USM Process Receipt and Return
                            US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture. Nakia Hunt served Delivered on 9/26/2006 at 93 Mora Street, Dorchester, MA 02124 (York, Steve)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Letter (non-motion)
                              Letter Regarding Robert Hunt (York, Steve)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Supplemental Record Sent USCA
                                Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal as to Robert Hunt re [26] Notice of Appeal, Documents included: 34 (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing as to Robert Hunt held on August 28, 2006 before Judge Lindsay. Court Reporter: Debra M. Joyce. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-4410 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Supplemental Record Sent USCA
                                    Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal as to Robert Hunt re [26] Notice of Appeal, Documents included: 32 (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 32 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea as to Robert Hunt held on May 22, 2006 before Judge Lindsay. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-8728 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Transcript Order Acknowledgment Form received from
                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT FORM received from USCA and addressed to Debra M. Joyce as to Robert Hunt' Transcript order form filed in USCA on September 22, 2006. Transcript ordered: 8/28/06 Sentencing due by 12/11/2006. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Transcript Order Acknowledgment Form received from
                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT FORM received from USCA and addressed to Marcia Patrisso as to Robert Hunt' Transcript order form filed in USCA on September 22, 2006. Transcript ordered: 5/22/06 Change of Plea due by 12/11/2006. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Robert Hunt (1), Count(s) 1-3, The defendant is committed to the custody of the BOP for 120 months on each of counts 1-3, the sentence on each count to run concurrent one count with the other. The defendant is to serve a term of Supervised Release of 8 years with Special Conditions. No Fine. Special Assessment of $300. AMENDED JUDGMENT - to include forfeiture of One Blue 1999 Ford Expedition (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Order on Motion to Correct
                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [27] Motion to Correct Judgment to Include Forfeiture as to Robert Hunt (1) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 USCA Case Number
                                                USCA Case Number as to Robert Hunt 06-2294 for [26] Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert Hunt,. (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                  Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal as to Robert Hunt to US Court of Appeals re [26] Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # (1))(Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Ex-Parte Motion as to Robert Hunt. (York, Steve)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006, Terminated: 9/27/2006 Motion to Correct
                                                      MOTION to Correct Judgment to Include Forfeiture as to Robert Huntby USA. (Barclay, Kristina)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006, Terminated: 10/9/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by Robert Hunt NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 9/18/2006. (fee not paid)(York, Steve)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Robert Hunt (1), Count(s) 1-3, The defendant is committed to the custody of the BOP for 120 months on each of counts 1-3, the sentence on each count to run concurrent one count with the other. The defendant is to serve a term of Supervised Release of 8 years with Special Conditions. No Fine. Special Assessment of $300. (Smith, Bonnie) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2006 (York, Steve).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Sentencing
                                                            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay :Sentencing held on 8/28/2006 for Robert Hunt (1), Count(s) 1-3, The defendant is committed to the custody of the BOP for 120 months on each of counts 1-3, the sentence on each count to run concurrent one count with the other. The defendant is to serve a term of Supervised Release of 8 years with Special Conditions. No Fine. Special Assessment of $300. The defendant is notifeid of the right to appeal. (Court Reporter D.Joyce.) (Smith, Bonnie)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Robert Hunt (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Kamholtz, Matthew)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Robert Hunt (York, Steve)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [22] Motion for Order as to Robert Hunt (1) (York, Steve)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006, Terminated: 8/1/2006 Motion for Order
                                                                    MOTION for Order (Preliminary Order of Forfeiture) to Issue as to Robert Huntby USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Carris, Eugenia)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Procedural Order re sentencing hearingCourt Filing
                                                                      Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Robert Hunt Sentencing set for 8/28/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay :Change of Plea Hearing as to Robert Hunt held on 5/22/2006. Defendant retracts previous plea of not guilty and enters plea of guilty to Counts 1-3 of the Indictment. Court finds factual basis, the plea is accepted and entered by Robert Hunt (1) Guilty Count 1-3. Sentencing set for 8/28/06 at 2:00PM (Court Reporter M. Patrisso.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE James F. Lang appearing for USA. (Lang, James)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Robert Hunt Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/22/2006 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2006 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [19] Sealed Motion as to Robert Hunt (1) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006, Terminated: 3/22/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                SEALED MOTION as to Robert Hunt. (York, Steve)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Robert Hunt Time excluded from 3/9/06 until 5/17/06. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay :Change of Plea Hearing as to Robert Hunt held on 3/9/2006. Defendant reports he is not ready to proceed. Change of Plea Hearing or Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Counsel agree to the exclusion of time until 5/17/06.(Court Reporter V. O'Hara.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Robert Hunt Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/9/2006 03:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY)(Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                                                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Robert Hunt Time excluded from 1/9/06 until 3/9/06. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                          ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay :Pretrial Conference as to Robert Hunt held on 1/10/2006. Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/9/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Court Reporter D. Joyce.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Robert Hunt Pretrial Conference reset for 1/9/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Status Report
                                                                                              Final Status Conference Report by Robert Hunt, USA as to Robert Hunt (York, Steve)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Robert Hunt Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MagCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered. ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION AFTER FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 116.5(C) as to Robert Hunt
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered. ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Robert Hunt. Time excluded from 12/14/2005 until 12/14/2005. Thus, as of December 14, 2005, EIGHTEEN (18) non-excludable days have occurred leaving FIFTY-TWO (52) days left to commence trial so as to be within the seventy-day period for trial set by statute. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                      Case as to Robert Hunt no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings :Final Status Conference as to Robert Hunt held on 12/14/2005. C. Lie for Gov't; M. Kamholtz for Def't. Upon review of joint final status report, court will send case back to District Court Judge. (Digital Recording) (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ElectronicORDER entered granting [15] Ex Parte Motion as to Robert Hunt (1) (York, Steve)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005, Terminated: 10/26/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            Ex Parte Motion as to Robert Hunt. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered. ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Robert Hunt. Time excluded from 8/24/2005 until 8/24/2005. Time excluded from 8/26/2005 until 8/26/2005. Time excluded from 8/26/2005 until 8/26/2005. Time excluded from 8/30/2005 until 9/26/2005. Time excluded from 10/11/2005 until 10/11/2005. Time excluded from 10/12/2005 until 12/9/2005. Thus as of December 9, 2005, FOURTEEN (14) non-excludable days will have occurred leaving FIFTY-SIX (56) days left to commence trial so as to be within the seventy-day period for trial set by statute. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered. ORDER FOR FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE (L.R. 116.5(C)) as to Robert Hunt (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Report and Order on Initial Status Conference by MCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered. REPORT AFTER INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 116.5(A)as to Robert Hunt (Russo, Noreen).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                    Joint STATUS REPORT by Robert Hunt, USA as to Robert Hunt (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings :Initial Status Conference as to Robert Hunt held on 10/11/2005, Con't Detention Hearing as to Robert Hunt held on 10/11/2005. C. Lie for Gov't, M. Kamholtz for Def't. Def't present in courtroom. Def't indicates that he is willing to remain in detention but would like to be able to request further hearing at another point. Upon review of the Joint Status Report, counsel indicates it is willing to submit expert reports 45 days prior to trial for Gov't and 21 days prior to trial for Def't. Def't indicates he needs time to file discovery motions due to CD's that counsel has just completed review. Non-discovery motions to be filed by December 9, 2005. Court sets Final Status Conf. for December 14, 2005 @ 2:30 PM. (Digital Recording) (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Notice re automatic disclosure
                                                                                                                        NOTICE re automatic disclosure as to Robert Hunt (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Exhibit/Witness List
                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT/WITNESS LIST for 8/30/2005 Detention Hearing as to Robert Hunt. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to Robert Hunt. Initial Status Conf. set for October 11, 2005 @ 10:30 A.M. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings :CONTINUED DETENTION HEARING as to Robert Hunt held on 8/30/2005. C. Lie for Gov't, M. Kamholtz for Def't. Defense counsel indicates that potential 3P custodian, Def'ts wife, was present at incident that gave rise to action. Court will continue Detention Hearing to October 11, 2005 @ 10:30 A.M. so that Defense counsel will have opportunity to listen to recordings Gov't to provide. (Digital Recorder) (Russo, Noreen).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings :ARRAIGNMENT as to Robert Hunt (1) Count 1-3 held on 8/30/2005, DETENTION HEARING as to Robert Hunt held on 8/30/2005, PLEA ENTERED by Robert Hunt (1) Not Guilty on counts 1-3. C. Lie for Gov't, M. Kamholtz for Def't, S. Brown for Pretrial Services. Initial Status Conf. Set for October 11, 2005 @ 10:30 A.M. Gov't calls ATF AGENT R. White as first witness. Direct exam by Gov't, Cross by Def't. No further evidence by Gov't. Defense Counsel indicates he would like hearing continued to afternoon of 8/30 so that Def'ts wife can be present. Court continues to 3:45 Pm. (Digital Recording.) (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Order on Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                  Mag.Judge Robert B. Collings : endorsement on motion ORDER entered granting [2] Motion to Unseal Case as to Robert Hunt (1) (Smith3, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Robert Hunt: Appointment of Attorney Matthew A. Kamholtz for Robert Hunt. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                      Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/25/05. as to Robert Hunt. (Smith3, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein :Initial Appearance as to Robert Hunt held on 8/26/2005. C. Lie for Gov't, with G. MacKinley, M. Kamholtz with Def't, USMJ Dien informs def't of his rights and charges. Def't submits CJA 23 form and requests counsel. Counsel is appointed; Gov't moves for detention and continuance; USMJ Dien orders the def't to temporary detention pending hearing before USMJ Collings; parties shall contact USMJ Collings to confirm time. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Arrest
                                                                                                                                          Arrest of Robert Hunt on August 25, 2005 (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Information to Establish Prior Conviction
                                                                                                                                            INFORMATION TO ESTABLISH PRIOR CONVICTION as to Robert Hunt by USA (Costello2, Helen)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings Reason for referral: Pretrial Proceedings as to Robert Hunt (Costello2, Helen) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2005 (Diskes, Sheila).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005, Terminated: 8/29/2006 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                GOVERNMENT'S MOTION to Seal Case and MOTION to Unseal Case upon defendant's arrestas to Robert Huntby USA. (Costello2, Helen) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2005 (Diskes, Sheila).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED INDICTMENT as to Robert Hunt (1) count(s) 1-3. (Costello2, Helen) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2005 (Diskes, Sheila).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?