Alpine Laser Clinic, Inc., v. Candela Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11747-RWZ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alpine Laser Clinic, Inc.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Walter Oney, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Oney +1 978 343 3390 +1 978 343 3397 Walter.Oney@oneylaw.com
v.
No Logo Candela Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cunningham, Machanic, Cetlin, Johnson & Harney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Zall +1 508 651 7524 +1 508 653 0119 bzall@cmlaw.net
Office Boston
Filed 8/24/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $90000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346 Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Middlesex
Terminated 5/10/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Johnson, Jay)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Alpine Laser Clinic, Inc.,, Candela Corporation. (Zall, William)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Scheduling Conference
      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel : Scheduling Conference held on 11/8/2005. Judge accepts proposed schedule a, b & c; Further Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
        First JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Zall, William)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Certificate of Consultation
          CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Regarding Litigation Budget and ADR by William M. Zall on behalf of Candela Corporation. (Zall, William)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Certificate of Consultation
            CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re budget and ADR (Local Rule 16.1) by Walter C Oney, Jr on behalf of Alpine Laser Clinic, Inc.,. (Oney, Walter)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Candela Corporation. (Zall, William)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Answer
                  ANSWER to Complaint by Candela Corporation.(Zall, William)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                    Judge Rya W. Zobel : Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Candela Corporation answer due 9/30/2005. (Urso, Lisa)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005, Terminated: 9/15/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 30, 2005 to File Answer re [1] Complaint by Candela Corporation.(Zall, William)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Candela Corporation served on 8/26/2005, answer due 9/15/2005. (Johnson, Jay)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alpine Laser Clinic, Inc.,. (Nici, Richard)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against Candela Corporation Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 66468, filed by Alpine Laser Clinic, Inc.,. (Attachments: # (1) Cover Sheet)(Nici, Richard)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (Nici, Richard)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Summons Issued
                                Summons Issued as to Candela Corporation. (Nici, Richard)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?