Tompkins, et al v. Exec. Comm. Southern Baptist, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, Case No. 15-2053

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 4:49 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Craig Carslile, Directors, Lifeway Christian Resources Of The Southern Baptist Convention, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo D. August Boto, Executive Vp, Executive Committee Of The Southern Baptist Convention, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by gjplaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Guenther +1 614 329 2100 jpguenther@gjplaw.com

Represented by The Wolfe Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. Roach +1 505 243 4419 +1 505 243 4169 roachlawfirm@yahoo.com
No Logo David Weekley, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo Executive Committee Of The Southern Baptist Convention, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Olivia Neidhardt +1 505 243 4419 +1 505 243 4169 olivianeidhardt@hotmail.com

Represented by gjplaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Guenther +1 614 329 2100 jpguenther@gjplaw.com

Represented by The Wolfe Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. Roach +1 505 243 4419 +1 505 243 4169 roachlawfirm@yahoo.com
No Logo Frank S. Page, President And Ceo, Executive Committee Of The Southern Baptist Convention, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Olivia Neidhardt +1 505 243 4419 +1 505 243 4169 olivianeidhardt@hotmail.com

Represented by The Wolfe Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. Roach +1 505 243 4419 +1 505 243 4169 roachlawfirm@yahoo.com
No Logo Glorieta 2.0, Inc., Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo Jerry L. Rhyne, Cfo, Lifeway Christian Resources Of The Southern Baptist Convention, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo Larry D. Cannon, Secretary, Lifeway Christian Resources Of The Southern Baptist Convention, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo Leonard Russo, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo Lifeway Christian Resources Of The Southern Baptist Convention, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo Lifeway Christian Resources Of The Southern Baptist Convention, Inc., Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo Southern Baptist Convention, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Olivia Neidhardt +1 505 243 4419 +1 505 243 4169 olivianeidhardt@hotmail.com

Represented by gjplaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Guenther +1 614 329 2100 jpguenther@gjplaw.com

Represented by The Wolfe Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. Roach +1 505 243 4419 +1 505 243 4169 roachlawfirm@yahoo.com
No Logo Terry Looper, Directors Of Glorieta 2.0, Inc., Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo Terry S. Braswell, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo Thom Rainer, President, Lifeway Christian Resources Of The Southern Baptist Convention, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo Travis Best, Defendant - Appellee

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Kiehne +1 505 848 1838 +1 505 848 1889 ekiehne@modrall.com
Space Rufus E. Thompson +1 505 848 1800 +1 505 848 1889 rthompson@modrall.com
No Logo L. Kirk Tompkins, Plaintiff - Appellant

Represented by Mary Stewart Law, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L. Kirk Tompkins +1 501 680 4408 Kirk.Tompkins@comcast.net
No Logo Susie Tompkins, Plaintiff - Appellant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susie Tompkins +1 501 680 4408
Nature of Suit 3240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:13-CV-00840-JB-CG
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:13-CV-00840-JB-CG
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009421931 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
[10267274] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. James T. Roach for Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Southern Baptist Convention, Mr. Frank S. Page and Mr. D. August Boto. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/27/2015. Manner of Service: email [15-2053]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
    [10267257] Notice of appearance submitted by James T. Roach James P. Guenther for Appellees Mr. D. August Boto, Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Mr. Frank S. Page and Southern Baptist Convention for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/27/2015. Manner of Service: email. [15-2053]--[Edited 04/27/2015 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/27/2015] JTR
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009421697 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
      [10267147] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Emil John Kiehne and Mr. Rufus E. Thompson for Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc., Glorieta 2.0, Inc., Mr. David Weekley, Mr. Leonard Russo, Mr. Terry Looper, Mr. Thom Rainer, Mr. Jerry L. Rhyne, Mr. Larry D. Cannon, Mr. Terry S. Braswell, Mr. Travis Best and Mr. Craig Carslile. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 100 parties. Served on 04/27/2015. Manner of Service: email [15-2053]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
        [10267116] Notice of appearance submitted by Rufus E. Thompson Emil J. Kiehne for Appellees Mr. Larry D. Cannon, Glorieta 2.0, Inc., Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc., Mr. Thom Rainer, Mr. Jerry L. Rhyne, Southern Baptist Convention and Mr. David Weekley for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/27/2015. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 04/27/2015 by AD. PDF removed, pleading redocketed 4-27-15] [15-2053] EJK
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009413988 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
          [10263074] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal due 05/26/2015. Notice of appearance due on 04/27/2015 for Appellees Travis Best, D. August Boto, Terry S. Braswell, Larry D. Cannon, Craig Carslile, Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Glorieta 2.0, Inc., Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc., Terry Looper, Frank S. Page, Thom Rainer, Jerry L. Rhyne, Leonard Russo, Southern Baptist Convention and David Weekley. Appellants' opening brief due on 05/26/2015 for L. Kirk Tompkins and Susie Tompkins. [15-2053]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009410272 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
            [10261083] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellants' motion for permission to file electronically. (Please refer to the order for specific instructions.) Served on 04/03/2015. [15-2053]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009409990 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
              [10260954] Appellants' motion filed by Mr. L. Kirk Tompkins and Ms. Susie Tompkins for permission to file electronically. Served on 04/02/2015. Manner of Service: email. [15-2053]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009409967 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                [10260945] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. L. Kirk Tompkins and Ms. Susie Tompkins. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/02/2015. Manner of Service: US mail [15-2053]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                  [10260305] Notice of an NDA re-sent to Mr. James P. Guenther.[15-2053]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009408672 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                    [10260211] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/01/2015 Notice of appearance due on 04/15/2015 for Travis Best, D. August Boto, Terry S. Braswell, Larry D. Cannon, Craig Carslile, Executive Committee of the Southern Baptist Convention, Glorieta 2.0, Inc., Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Lifeway Christian Resources of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc., Terry Looper, Frank S. Page, Thom Rainer, Jerry L. Rhyne, Leonard Russo, Southern Baptist Convention and David Weekley. Notice of appearance due on 05/01/2015 for L. Kirk Tompkins and Susie Tompkins. [15-2053]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 246 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?