Amaral v. Drake Petroleum Company Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11778-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:06 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marnie J Amaral, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lindsey M. Straus +1 508 896 8008 +1 617 249 1674 lindseystraus@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Drake Petroleum Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Zizik, Powers, O'Connell, Spaulding & Lamontagne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian A. O'Connell +1 781 320 5402 +1 781 320 5444 boconnell@zizikpowers.com
Space Cathryn Spaulding +1 781 263 0229 +1 781 431 8749 cspaulding@zizikpowers.com
Office Boston
Filed 8/26/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 2801 Petroleum Marketing Practices Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Bristol
Terminated 12/26/2006
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Rynne, Michelle)
    LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Drake Petroleum Company Inc.,. (O'Connell, Brian)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Order
      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered. Status Report due by 1/2/2007.(Rynne, Michelle)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by Drake Petroleum Company Inc.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Joint Motion for Standstill of Scheduling Order)(Spaulding, Cathryn)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Order on Motion to Stay
          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [10] Motion to Stay scheduling order. Parties shall file a status report by 11/1/06. (Rynne, Michelle)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006, Terminated: 8/11/2006 Motion to Stay
            Joint MOTION to Stay re Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines, by Drake Petroleum Company Inc.,.(Spaulding, Cathryn)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
              NOTICE of Change of Address by Cathryn Spaulding (Spaulding, Cathryn)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Further scheduling/Status Conference set for 1/30/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Discovery to be completed by 8/1/2006. Motions due by 12/22/2006. Status report due 1/23/07. (Rynne, Michelle)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Order on Motion to Amend
                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [8] Motion to Amend scheduling order. Fact Discovery completed by 8/1/06. Plaintiff's expert reports due by 9/29/06. Defendant's experts reports due by 10/27/06. Expert discovery completed by 11/24/06. Summary judgment motions due by 12/22/06. Status report due 1/23/07. Further scheduling/status conference reset for 1/30/07 at 2:30 p.m. (Rynne, Michelle)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006, Terminated: 6/8/2006 Motion to Amend
                    Joint MOTION to Amend [7] Scheduling Order, by Drake Petroleum Company Inc.,.(Spaulding, Cathryn)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Further scheduling/Status Conference set for 11/30/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2006. Discovery due by 7/1/2006. Motions due by 10/26/2006. Status report due 11/22/06.(Rynne, Michelle)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Scheduling Conference
                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2005, Motions terminated: [2] MOTION to Amend complaint filed by Marnie J Amaral in state court - ALLOWED. Schedule set: Amendments to pleadings by 2/1/06, all fact discovery to be completed by 7/1/06, plaintiff's experts by 7/28/06, defendant's experts by 8/25/06, expert discovery including depositions completed by 9/28/06, summary judgment motions by 10/26/06. (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                          JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Straus, Lindsey)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005 state court record
                            STATE COURT Record exhibits A-I not scanned. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2# (2) Part 3)(Nici, Richard)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Answer
                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Drake Petroleum Company Inc.,.(Spaulding, Cathryn)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Order
                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered.ELECTRONIC ORDER REQUIRING ELECTRONIC FILING. It is hereby ORDERED that, unless leave is granted, upon good cause shown, to file paper documents in lieu of electronic filing via this Court's CM/ECF system, ALL future submissions in this case must be electronically filed. Such filings shall be made in accordance with, and subject to, the terms and conditions of electronic filing as set forth by this Court. All parties and counsel who choose to appear in this action must make arrangements to register for participation in electronic case filing, if they have not already done so. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Notices, Orders and Memoranda of the Court will only be filed and served electronically. Once a party or counsel has registered for electronic filing, it is his/her responsibility to monitor his/her e-mail to ensure receipt of electronic notices. Any changes in e-mail addresses must be reported to the Court immediately (Nici, Richard).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Motion to Amend
                                    Assented - to MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Marnie J Amaral.(Nici, Richard).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Notice of Removal
                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Drake Petroleum Company Inc., from Bristol County Superior Court, case number BRCV2004-01354-C. $ 250, receipt number 66523, filed by Drake Petroleum Company Inc.,. (Attachments: # (1) Part2# (2) Part 3# (3) Part 4# (4) Cover Sheet)(Nici, Richard)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Nici, Richard)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?