Cox v. Bay Area Credit Services, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:15-cv-01111

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 1:23 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald Cox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa R. Wilcox +1 727 821 1707 +1 727 821 1734 lwilcox@wilcoxlawpa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by W. John Gadd, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William John Gadd +1 727 524 6300 +1 727 524 6330 wjg@mazgadd.com
v.
No Logo Hovg, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golden & Scaz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sangeeta Spengler +1 813 251 5500 +1 813 251 3675 SPSpengler@goldenscaz.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Case management and scheduling order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Case Management Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Appear Telephonically
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Notice to take judicial notice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by July 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/7/2015. (KTW)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Defendant shall file its response to the complaint by June 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/1/2015. (KTW) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                      SUMMONS issued as to HOVG, LLC. (BSN) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT against HOVG, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number tpa 300030) filed by Ronald Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BSN) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?