Romney v. Rumsfeld
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11821-GAO

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:22 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Mitt Romney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Barnico +61772 722 00x3380 +1 617 727 3076 tom.barnico@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenney & Sams, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Kerrigan +1 617 727 3118 drkerrigan@kandslegal.com
v.
No Logo Anthony J. Principi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Donald H. Rumsfeld, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Harold W. Gehman, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo James H. Bilbray, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo James T. Hill, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo James W. Vinson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lloyd W. Newton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Philip Coyle, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Samuel K. Skinner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Sue E. Turner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo The Defense Base Closure and Realignment Commission, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
Office Boston
Filed 9/7/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Suffolk
Terminated 9/22/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/24/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mitt Romney. c/s (Edge, Eugenia)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/24/2005 Affidavit of Service
    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas A. Barnico, Counsel Mitt Romney. Harold W. Gehman, Jr served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005; James W. Vinson served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005; James T. Hill served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005; Lloyd W. Newton served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005; Samuel K. Skinner served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005; Sue E. Turner served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005; Donald H. Rumsfeld served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005; The Defense Base Closure and Realignment Commission served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005; Anthony J. Principi served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005; James H. Bilbray served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005; Philip Coyle served on 9/14/2005, answer due 10/4/2005. Acknowledgement filed by Mitt Romney. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Original summons)(Edge, Eugenia)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
      Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: ORDER entered denying [2] Motion for TRO (Lyness, Paul)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Harold W. Gehman, Jr, James W. Vinson, James T. Hill, Lloyd W. Newton, Samuel K. Skinner, Sue E. Turner, Donald H. Rumsfeld, The Defense Base Closure and Realignment Commission, Anthony J. Principi, James H. Bilbray, Philip Coyle. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Appendix Q, Text of 2005 Defense Base Closure and Realignment Commission Final and Approved Recommendations# (2) Exhibit Blagojevich v. Rumsfeld, No. 05-3595 (7th Cir. Sept. 7, 2005)# (3) Exhibit Corzine v. Rumsfeld, No. 05-4127 (3d Cir. Sept. 7, 2005))(Quinlivan, Mark)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE by Harold W. Gehman, Jr, James W. Vinson, James T. Hill, Lloyd W. Newton, Samuel K. Skinner, Sue E. Turner, Donald H. Rumsfeld, The Defense Base Closure and Realignment Commission, Anthony J. Principi, James H. Bilbray, Philip Coyle of Recent Decisions (Attachments: # (1) State of Missouri v. Rumsfeld# (2) Corzine v. 2005 Defense Base Closing & Realignment Commission# (3) Blagojevich v. Rumsfeld)(Quinlivan, Mark)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Quinlivan on behalf of all defendants (Quinlivan, Mark)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Affidavit in Support
              AFFIDAVIT of Samuel M. Shiver in Support re [3] Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed. (Catino2, Theresa)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mitt Romney, filed. (Catino2, Theresa)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion for TRO
                  MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Mitt Romney, filed.(Catino2, Theresa)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 66676, filed by Mitt Romney. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Catino2, Theresa)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Motion Hearing
                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2005 re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mitt Romney,. The court takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter Shelly Killian.) (Lyness, Paul)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Catino3, Theresa)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 197 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?