Bowen v. Takata Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-20922

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 6:45 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jack Bowen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Highland Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Takata Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Tk Holdings Inc., Defendant
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting (574) Motion for Modification of Orders Dismissing Case Without Prejudice in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM. The listed S.D. Fla cases are STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO and either Case No. 14-24009-CIV-MORENO or Case No. 15-20664-CIV-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/23/2015. (gp) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None MDL Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 6/23/2015 08:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/6/2015. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, All Cases (gp) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
        Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (yha) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jack Bowen (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s)) (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE : Status Conference set in 1:15-md-02599-FAM for 5/1/2015 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/15/2015. This Document relates to: All Cases, 1:15-md-02599-FAM (gp) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR: Paul C. Huck Jr added. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/31/2015. {filed date: 03/31/2015 in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM} (gp) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE of FILING by John Delionado re 453 Order Referring Case to Special Master in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John J. Delionado) {filed date: 03/25/2015 in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM} (gp) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER. John Delionado appointed. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/24/2015. {filed date: 03/25/2015 in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM} (gp) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER SETTING FILING REQUIREMENT Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Order Setting Status Hearing) {filed date: 03/23/2015 in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM} (gp) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                      JOINT REPORT on ORGANIZATION by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC, FCA US LLC, Ford Motor Company, Highland Industries, Inc., Honda of America Mfg., Inc., Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. {filed date: 03/23/2015 in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM} (gp) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER APPOINTING PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL AND SETTING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/12/2015. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM; All Cases (gp) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                          MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Florida Southern. FLSD Case Number 1:15-cv-20922-FAM with documents 1-6. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (gp) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Gdanski on behalf of Jack Bowen. Attorney Jonathan Gdanski added to party Jack Bowen(pty:pla). (Gdanski, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Louis Haberman on behalf of Jack Bowen (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                CORRECTED Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno (jc) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (yha) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (yha) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT against Highland Industries, Inc., TK Holdings Inc., Takata Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7531004, filed by Jack Bowen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?