Wood v. Pfizer, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:15-cv-02048
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 2:51 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Juliene J. Wood, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline A. Olson +1 612 341 0400 +1 612 341 0844 jacqueline.olson@zimmreed.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gordon Rudd, Jr. +1 612 341 0400 +1 612 341 0844 gordon.rudd@zimmreed.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Selcer Zimmerman +1 612 341 0400 +1 612 341 0844 csz@zimmreed.com
v.
Pfizer, Inc. Pfizer, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Arqule, Inc.
Unknown Role, Icagen, Inc.
Unknown Role, Zoetis Inc.
Unknown Role, Celladon Corp
Unknown Role, Pfizer Production LLC
Unknown Role, Icu Medical Inc/de
Unknown Role, Upjohn Inc
Unknown Role, Insite Vision, Inc.
Unknown Role, pSivida LTD
Unknown Role, Cortexyme, Inc.
Unknown Role, Imara Inc.
Unknown Role, Bioatla, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott M Flaherty +1 612 977 8745 +1 612 977 8650 sflaherty@briggs.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Pfizer, Inc.. Jointly Signed by JULIENE J. WOOD, as Trustee for the next of kin of JOHN W. WOOD. Jr., Deceased. (Flaherty, Scott) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
    Summons Issued as to Pfizer, Inc.. (KNK) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Please use case number 15-cv-2048 (DWF/JJK). (KNK) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT - Demand For Jury Trial against Pfizer, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4390367.) Filed by Juliene J Wood. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, J) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 102 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?