USA v. Fernandez et al
Criminal Case North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 1:05-cr-00209-MR-DLH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 8:12 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Ascik AUSA +1 828 259 0644 +1 828 271 4122 brody.cole@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas Michael Kent +1 828 259 0679 thomas.kent@usdoj.gov
Space Jill Westmoreland Rose +1 828 271 4661 +1 828 271 4670 jill.rose@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Asheville
Filed 6/6/2005
County Buncombe
Terminated 8/30/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-6801.F
Offense Level 4
Count 1s
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-6801.F
Offense Level 4
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (203) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 128 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting [127] Motion to Dismiss as to Armida Arragon Arroyos (2). Bill of Indictment in this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Dft Armida Arragon Arroyos. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/29/2014. (klb)
    LREF
    Legal Document 127 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014, Terminated: 10/29/2014 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss Indictment as to Defendant Arroyos by USA as to Armida Arragon Arroyos. Responses due by 11/7/2014 Motions referred to Dennis Howell(Kent, Thomas)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Thomas Michael Kent appearing for USA. (Kent, Thomas)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
        Case as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Armida Arragon Arroyos, Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi reassigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. District Judge Lacy Thornburg no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (jhg)
          LREF
          Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
          Case as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Armida Arragon Arroyos, Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi reassigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. District Judge Lacy Thornburg no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (jhg)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Transfer Out/Probationer
            Probation Jurisdiction Transferred to District of Arizona as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi Transmitted Transfer of Jurisdiction form, with certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet. (Attachments: # (1) letter)(jhg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2009: # (2) docket sheet) (jhg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2009: attachment(s) added on 4/10/2009: # (3) Financial Record) (jhg). Modified on 4/10/2009 (jhg).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 124 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
              ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Time excluded from 3/5/07 until 5/7/07. Docket Call set for 5/7/2007 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg.. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 2/23/07. (pdf)
                LREF
                Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: (siw)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: (siw)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Docket Call set for 5/7/2007 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(pdf)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Docket Call set for 5/7/2007 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(pdf)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                        Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: (siw)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 123 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Time excluded from 12/27/06 until 3/5/07. Docket Call reset for 3/5/2007 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg.. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 12/27/06. (siw)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Judgment Returned Executed
                            Judgment Returned Executed as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi on 10/26/06. (pdf)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                              ORDER denying [119] Motion extension of report date as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3). Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 10/23/06. (pdf)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Time excluded from 10/23/06 until 1/8/07. Docket Call set for 1/8/2007 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg.. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 10/23/06. (pdf)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006, Terminated: 10/23/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  First MOTION Extend Reporting date by Peujon Deslin Nazifi. (True, Ronald)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 USMS Return of Service
                                    USMS Return of Service re [115]Final Order for Forfeiture of Property (pdf)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 USMS Return of Service
                                      USMS Return of Service re [115] Final Order for Forfeiture of Property (pdf)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay Court Filing
                                        CJA 20 as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez: Authorization to Pay Mary Victoria Jayne. Amount: $ 6,510.48, Voucher # 060912000023. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 9/8/06. (lhg)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                          FINAL ORDER DIRECTING FORFEITURE OF PROPERTY as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Peujon Deslin Nazifi.. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 9/19/06. (pdf)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
                                            JUDGMENT as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3), Count(s) 2s, Imprisoned for a term of 24 months; supervised release for a term of 3 years; pay $100 assessment - AMENDED JUDMENT: Amended as to date of imposition of sentence on page 1, only.. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 9/15/06. (siw)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                              JUDGMENT as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3), Count(s) 2s, Imprisoned for a term of 24 months; supervised release for a term of 3 years; pay $100 assessment. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 9/13/06. (pdf)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                JUDGMENT as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1), Count(s) 1s, 2s, Imprisoned for a term of 200 months on count 1 and a term of 200 months on count 2 to be served concurrently; supervised release for a term of 5 years on count 1 and a term of 3 years on count 2 all such terms to run concurrently; pay assessment of $200; pay court appointed counsel fees. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 9/13/06. (pdf)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                  Attorney update in case as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi. Attorney Jeffrey J. Rogers and Ronald C. True terminated. (pdf)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                    Attorney update in case as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi. Attorney Jeffrey J. Rogers and Ronald C. True terminated. (pdf)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                      Attorney update in case as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. Attorney M. Victoria Jayne terminated. (pdf)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                        Attorney update in case as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. Attorney M. Victoria Jayne terminated. (pdf)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Time excluded from 8/30/06 until 11/6/06.. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 8/30/06. (siw)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006, Terminated: 8/30/2006 Motion to Reduce Sentence
                                                            Second MOTION to Reduce Sentence Amended 5K1.1 by USA as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. (Rose, Jill)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Docket Call reset for 11/6/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (siw)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Docket Call reset for 11/6/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (siw)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Sentencing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lacy Thornburg :Sentencing held on 8/30/2006. Party Raphael Arroyos Fernandez terminated. Government attorney: Jill Rose.Defendant attorney: Victoria Jayne. (Court Reporter Karen Miller.) (siw)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                    ORAL ORDER as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez re [108] MOTION for Departure, [110] Second MOTION to Reduce Sentence Amended 5K1.1 GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 8/30/06. (siw)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Sentencing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lacy Thornburg :Sentencing held on 8/30/2006. Party Peujon Deslin Nazifi terminated. Government attorney: Jill Rose.Defendant attorney: Jeffrey Rogers & Ronald True. (Court Reporter Karen Miller.) (siw)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006, Terminated: 9/13/2006 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                        Supplemental MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Final Order of Forfeiture by USA as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Armida Arragon Arroyos, Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi. (Ascik, Thomas)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006, Terminated: 8/30/2006 Motion for Departure
                                                                          MOTION for Downward Departure 5K1.1 by USA as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. (Rose, Jill) Modified on 8/25/2006 to correct docket text (tme).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                            MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Final Forfeiture by USA as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Armida Arragon Arroyos, Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of IRS Agent Fish# (2) Affidavit of Deputy USM Howard)(Ascik, Thomas)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez: Sentencing set for 8/30/2006 04:00 PM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(siw)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez: Sentencing set for 8/30/2006 04:00 PM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(siw)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Notice of PSI Completion
                                                                                  NOTICE OF PSI COMPLETION as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, defendant can be scheduled for sentencing anytime after 8/22/06. (siw)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Notice of PSI Completion
                                                                                    NOTICE OF PSI COMPLETION as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi, defendant can be scheduled for sentencing anytime after 8/25/06. (siw)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi: Sentencing set for 8/30/2006 11:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(siw)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi: Sentencing set for 8/30/2006 11:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(siw)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006 USMS Return of Service
                                                                                          USMS Return of Service as to USA - Public Notice - Asheville, NC (siw)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 USMS Return of Service
                                                                                            USMS Return of Service - Public Notice - Tucson, Arizona (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER as to Armida Arragon Arroyos, ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Armida Arragon Arroyos; Time excluded from 7/10/2006 until 9/11/2006. Docket Call set for 9/11/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 6/19/2006. (Koechley, Jeanie)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 USMS Return of Service
                                                                                                USMS Return of Service re [99] Preliminary Order for Forfeiture of Property (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Time excluded from 4/17/06 until 7/10/06. . Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 4/14/06. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Docket Call reset for 7/10/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Docket Call reset for 7/10/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER DIRECTING FORFEITURE OF PROPERTY as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Peujon Deslin Nazifi. . Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 4/7/06. (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 98 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006, Terminated: 5/12/2006 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                                                          First MOTION for Forfeiture of Property by USA as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Armida Arragon Arroyos, Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi. (Attachments: # (1))(Ascik, Thomas)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Time excluded from 2/24/06 until 5/1/06. . Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 2/24/06. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Docket Call reset for 5/1/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Docket Call reset for 5/1/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Docket Call reset for 3/6/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Time excluded from 12/30/05 until 3/6/06. . Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 12/30/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [92] Motion to Dismiss as to Ahmad Nazifi (4)without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 11/17/05. (Wilson, Sharon) Modified on 11/17/2005 (Wilson, Sharon).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005, Terminated: 11/17/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by USA as to Ahmad Nazifi. (Rose, Jill)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Proposed document submitted to Judge.
                                                                                                                        Proposed document submitted to Judge Lacy Thornburg. (Rose, Jill)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Proposed document submitted to Judge.
                                                                                                                          Proposed document submitted to Judge Lacy Thornburg. (Rose, Jill)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Ahmad Nazifi Arraignment set for 11/17/2005 10:00 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Dennis Howell. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Acceptance of Guilty Plea
                                                                                                                              ACCEPTANCE and entry of Guilty Plea as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi signed by Dennis Howell. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Plea Hearing Held - Not CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Plea Hearing as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi held on 11/9/2005, Plea entered on 11/9/2005 by Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3) Guilty Count 2s. Case referral terminated for Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Standard Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Standard Discovery Order in case as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi. . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 11/09/05. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULING ORDER as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 11/09/05. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Arraignment as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3) Count 1s,2s held on 11/9/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Initial Appearance on S/S B/I as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi held on 11/9/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Docket Call set for 1/9/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                            Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi: (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                              Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi: (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Ahmad Nazifi: (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Ahmad Nazifi: (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER GRANTING GOVT'S ORAL MOTION TO CONTINUE as to Ahmad Nazifi. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER GRANTING GOVT'S ORAL MOTION TO CONTINUE as to Ahmad Nazifi. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/5/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Time excluded from 11/5/05 until 1/2/06. . Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 11/5/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Docket Call set for 1/2/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Docket Call set for 1/2/2006 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Acceptance of Guilty Plea
                                                                                                                                                              ACCEPTANCE and entry of Guilty Plea as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez signed by Dennis Howell. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Plea Hearing Held - Not CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Plea Hearing as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez held on 11/4/2005, Plea entered on 11/4/2005 by Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1) Guilty Count 1s,2s. Case referral terminated for Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULING ORDER as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez Docket Call set for 11/14/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg.. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 11/04/05. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Arraignment as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1) Count 1s,2s held on 11/4/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Initial Appearance on Superseding B/I as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez held on 11/4/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                        Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez: (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                          Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez: (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER GRANTING GOVT'S ORAL MOTION TO AMEND DEFT'S NAME TO READ: RAFAEL FERNANDEZ as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER GRANTING GOVT'S ORAL MOTION TO AMEND DEFT'S NAME TO READ: RAFAEL FERNANDEZ as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi Plea Agreement Hearing set for 11/9/2005 11:00 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Dennis Howell. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEA AGREEMENT as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi Arraignment set for 11/9/2005 11:00 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Dennis Howell. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                      Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi: (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                        Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi: (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S ORAL MOTION TO CONTINUE ARRAIGNMENT as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S ORAL MOTION TO CONTINUE ARRAIGNMENT as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005, Terminated: 9/13/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION dispense Initial Appear; Set Rule 11 Inquiry by Peujon Deslin Nazifi as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi. (True, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez Plea Agreement Hearing set for 11/4/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Dennis Howell. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi Arraignment set for 10/31/2005 10:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Dennis Howell. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 71 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                    INDICTMENT as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, Armida Arragon Arroyos (2) count(s) 2s, Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, Ahmad Nazifi (4) count(s) 2s. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Armida Arragon Arroyos. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 67 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Notice of Violation
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Bond violation by Probation Officer as to Armida Arragon Arroyos signed by Dennis Howell. (Wilson, Sharon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2010: # (1) Attachments) (pdf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appearance Bond Entered as to Armida Arragon Arroyos in amount of $ $30,000 Secured By Signature/Property, . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 09/16/05. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Armida Arragon Arroyos (2) $30,000 Secured By Signature/Property . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 09/16/05. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 64 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Motion Hearing as to Armida Arragon Arroyos held on 9/16/2005 re [62] MOTION for Bond filed by Armida Arragon Arroyos, (Court Reporter FTR.) (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Armida Arragon Arroyos [62] MOTION for Bond: Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2005 10:00 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Dennis Howell. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for consideration of Bond by Armida Arragon Arroyos. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fee: $ 100.00, receipt number 19855 re: [23] Order on Motion for Special Appearance (Wilson, Sharon) Modified on 9/2/2005 (Wilson, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Fee: $ 100, receipt number 19855 re: [22] Order on Motion for Special Appearance (Wilson, Sharon) Modified on 9/2/2005 (Wilson, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Ahmad Nazifi Time excluded from 8/30/05 until 11/14/05. . Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 8/30/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi Time excluded from 8/30/05 until 11/14/05. . Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 8/30/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [57] Motion to Continue as to Armida Arragon Arroyos (2) Docket Call set for 11/14/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg.. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 8/30/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF DETENTION as to Armida Arragon Arroyos . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/30/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Continue from the Sept. 12, 2005 term of Court by Armida Arragon Arroyos. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ahmad Nazifi: Docket Call set for 11/14/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ahmad Nazifi: Docket Call set for 11/14/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi: Docket Call set for 11/14/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi: Docket Call set for 11/14/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Detention Hearing as to Armida Arragon Arroyos held on 8/29/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Detention Hearing set for 8/29/2005 10:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Dennis Howell. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Detention Hearing as to Armida Arragon Arroyos held on 8/24/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Standard Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Standard Discovery Order in case as to Armida Arragon Arroyos. . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 08/24/05. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULING ORDER as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Docket Call set for 9/12/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg.. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 08/24/05. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Arraignment as to Armida Arragon Arroyos (2) Count 2 held on 8/24/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 20 as to Armida Arragon Arroyos: Appointment of Attorney Joel Trilling for Armida Arragon Arroyos. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER CONTINUING DETENTION HEARING UNTIL 08/29/05 AT 10:30 A.M. as to Armida Arragon Arroyos (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER CONTINUING DETENTION HEARING UNTIL 08/29/05 AT 10:30 A.M. as to Armida Arragon Arroyos (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/20/05. in case as to Ahmad Nazifi. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/20/05. in case as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/20/05. in case as to Armida Arragon Arroyos. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/20/05. in case as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Waiver......
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER of by Peujon Deslin Nazifi re: Conflict-Free Representation (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Waiver......
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER of by Ahmad Nazifi re: Conflict-Free Representation (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Standard Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Standard Discovery Order in case as to Ahmad Nazifi. . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/22/05. (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARRAIGNMENT/SCHEDULING ORDER as to Ahmad Nazifi Docket Call set for 9/12/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg.. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/22/05. (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appearance Bond Entered as to Ahmad Nazifi in amount of $ 25,000 unsecured, . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/22/05. (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/22/05. (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Initial Appearance as to Ahmad Nazifi held on 8/22/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Standard Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Standard Discovery Order in case as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi. . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/22/05. (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARRAIGNMENT/SCHEDULING ORDER as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi Docket Call set for 9/12/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg.. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/22/05. (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/22/05. (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appearance Bond Entered as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi in amount of $ 25,000 unsecured, . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/22/05. (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Initial Appearance as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi held on 8/22/2005 Docket Call set for 9/12/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1, 100 Otis St., Asheville, NC 28801 before Lacy Thornburg. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dennis Howell :Initial Appearance as to Armida Arragon Arroyos held on 8/22/2005 Arraignment set for 8/24/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2 before Dennis Howell. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Detention Hearing set for 8/24/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2 before Dennis Howell. (Ponder, Becky)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER of detention as to Armida Arragon Arroyos (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER of detention as to Armida Arragon Arroyos (Freeman, Phyllis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Detention Hearing set for 8/24/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2 before Dennis Howell. (Ponder, Becky)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos Detention Hearing set for 8/24/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2 before Dennis Howell. (Ponder, Becky)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to motion to waive and/or continue initial appearance is denied as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/19/05. (Wilson, Sharon) Modified on 8/19/2005 (Wilson, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [24] Motion to Continue initial appearance as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3), Ahmad Nazifi (4). Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/19/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Rule 5 Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Ahmad Nazifi (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Rule 5 Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Rule 5 Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Armida Arragon Arroyos (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Rule 5 Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005, Terminated: 8/19/2005 Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue or Waive Initial Appearance by Peujon Deslin Nazifi as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi. (True, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Order on Motion for Special AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [21] Motion for Special Appearance as to Ahmad Nazifi (4). Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/18/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arrest of Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Armida Arragon Arroyos, Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi in Tucson, Az. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF DOCKET ERROR by Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi CORRECTION: re [24] Error: Document not signed properly. No attorney's name on document, no certificate of service (Hankins, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF DOCKET ERROR by Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi CORRECTION: re [24] Error: Document not signed properly. No attorney's name on document, no certificate of service (Hankins, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Attorney update in case as to Ahmad Nazifi. Attorney David Lipartito for Ahmad Nazifi added. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Attorney update in case as to Ahmad Nazifi. Attorney David Lipartito for Ahmad Nazifi added. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Order on Motion for Special AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [20] Motion for Special Appearance as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3). Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 8/17/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney update in case as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi. Attorney Jeffrey J. Rogers for Peujon Deslin Nazifi added. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi. Attorney Jeffrey J. Rogers for Peujon Deslin Nazifi added. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005, Terminated: 8/18/2005 Motion for Special Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for admission pro hac vice by Ahmad Nazifi by Ahmad Nazifi. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005, Terminated: 8/17/2005 Motion for Special Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for admission pro hac vice by Jeffrey J. Rogers by Peujon Deslin Nazifi. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Waiver of Presence at Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Ahmad Nazifi (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Waiver of Presence at Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Peujon Deslin Nazifi (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald C. True appearing for Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [15] Motion to Continue as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1) from the Sept. 12, 2005. Signed by Judge Lacy Thornburg on 8/11/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005, Terminated: 8/11/2005 Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue from the Sept. 12, 2005 term of court by Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez: Docket Call set for 11/14/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez: Docket Call set for 11/14/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Armida Arragon Arroyos, Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi Initial Appearance set for 8/22/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #2 before Dennis Howell. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULING ORDER as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez Docket Call set for 9/12/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1 before Lacy Thornburg.. Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 08/01/05. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF DETENTION as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez . Signed by Judge David Keesler on 7/21/05. (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Keesler :Detention Hearing as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez held on 7/21/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Keesler :Detention Hearing as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez held on 7/21/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Keesler :Arraignment as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1) Count 1,2 held on 7/21/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Keesler :Arraignment as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1) Count 1,2 held on 7/21/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez: Docket Call set for 9/12/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez: Docket Call set for 9/12/2005 09:30 AM in Asheville Courtroom #1 before Lacy Thornburg. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 20 as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez: Appointment of Attorney M. Victoria Jayne for Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. (Wurst, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez Arraignment set for 7/21/2005 02:00 PM in Charlotte Magistrate Courtroom before David Keesler. Detention Hearing set for 7/21/2005 02:00 PM in Charlotte Magistrate Courtroom before David Keesler. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Attorney update in case as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. Attorney M. Victoria Jayne for Raphael Arroyos Fernandez added. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney update in case as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. Attorney M. Victoria Jayne for Raphael Arroyos Fernandez added. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER granting oral motion to apppoint counsel as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Oral or Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER granting oral motion to apppoint counsel as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Keesler :Initial Appearance as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez held on 7/18/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Keesler :Initial Appearance as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez held on 7/18/2005 (Court Reporter FTR.) (Anderton, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [8] Motion to Unseal Case as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1), Armida Arragon Arroyos (2), Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3), Ahmad Nazifi (4); granting [8] Motion to Unseal Document [8] MOTION to Unseal Case MOTION to Unseal Document as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1), Armida Arragon Arroyos (2), Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3), Ahmad Nazifi (4). Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 6/21/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Armida Arragon Arroyos, Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Armida Arragon Arroyos, Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Ahmad Nazifi. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Peujon Deslin Nazifi. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Armida Arragon Arroyos. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [1] Motion to Seal as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1), Armida Arragon Arroyos (2), Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3), Ahmad Nazifi (4). Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 6/7/05. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED INDICTMENT as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez (1) count(s) 1, 2, Armida Arragon Arroyos (2) count(s) 2, Peujon Deslin Nazifi (3) count(s) 1, 2, Ahmad Nazifi (4) count(s) 2. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Indictment by USA as to Raphael Arroyos Fernandez, Armida Arragon Arroyos, Peujon Deslin Nazifi, Ahmad Nazifi. (Wilson, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 562 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?