American Graphics Institute, Inc. v. Acquired Learning, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11857-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Graphics Institute, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hamilton Brook Smith & Reynolds, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Brody +1 978 341 0036 +1 978 341 0136 David.Brody@hbsr.com
Space F. James Coe +1 978 341 0036 +1 978 341 0136 james.coe@hbsr.com
Space John L. Dupre, Esq. +1 978 341 0036 +1 978 341 0136 jdupre@hbsr.com
Space Giovanna Helen Fessenden +1 978 341 0036 +1 978 341 0136 giovanna.fessenden@HBSR.com
v.
No Logo Acquired Learning, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sager & Schaffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven T. Sager +1 508 898 9900 +1 508 898 9889 ssager@sagerlegal.com
No Logo Clark Edwards, Defendant
No Logo Dean Novosat, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sager & Schaffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven T. Sager +1 508 898 9900 +1 508 898 9889 ssager@sagerlegal.com
No Logo Judeann Stipe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sager & Schaffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven T. Sager +1 508 898 9900 +1 508 898 9889 ssager@sagerlegal.com
No Logo Sage Advice, LTD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sager & Schaffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven T. Sager +1 508 898 9900 +1 508 898 9889 ssager@sagerlegal.com
Office Boston
Filed 9/14/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Middlesex
Terminated 1/10/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TRADE
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Consent JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Joseph L. Tauro : FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT ON CONSENT.(Abaid, Kim)
    LREF
    Legal Document 79 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Agreement for Judgment
    AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT Final Order and Judgment on Consent by American Graphics Institute, Inc., Acquired Learning, Inc., Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Sage Advice, LTD. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
      LREF
      Legal Document 78 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: 1/2/2007 Declaration
      DECLARATION of Giovanna Fessenden by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
        LREF
        Legal Document 77 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: 1/2/2007 Opposition to Motion
        Opposition re [75] MOTION to Set Aside Default Against Acquired Learning, Inc. and Sage Advice, Ltd., filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
          LREF
          Legal Document 76 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
          MEMORANDUM in Support re [75] MOTION to Set Aside Default Against Acquired Learning, Inc. and Sage Advice, Ltd., filed by Acquired Learning, Inc., Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Sage Advice, LTD. (Sager, Steven)
            LREF
            Legal Document 75 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006, Terminated: 1/10/2007 Motion to Set Aside Default
            MOTION to Set Aside Default Against Acquired Learning, Inc. and Sage Advice, Ltd., by Acquired Learning, Inc., Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Sage Advice, LTD.(Sager, Steven)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry 72. corrected because: Per attorney request, replaced document with a corrected copy. (Abaid, Kim)
                LREF
                Legal Document 74 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acquired Learning, Inc., Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Sage Advice, LTD re [73] Affidavit in Support by Kenneth Kennedy. (Sager, Steven)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 73 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Affidavit in Support
                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re [72] Reply to Response to Motion, by Kenneth Kennedy. (Sager, Steven)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 72 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [70] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ronald H. Pollack, Jr., Donald R. Geiter, Joshua G. Parsons Filing fee $ 150. filed by Acquired Learning, Inc., Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Sage Advice, LTD. (Sager, Steven) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2006 (Abaid, Kim).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 71 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Opposition to Motion
                      Opposition re [70] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ronald H. Pollack, Jr., Donald R. Geiter, Joshua G. Parsons Filing fee $ 150. filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Coe, F.)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                        Filing fee: $ 150.00, receipt number 77069 for [70] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ronald H. Pollack, Jr., Donald R. Geiter, Joshua G. Parsons Filing fee $ 150. (Abaid, Kim)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered. Response due by 1/22/2007. re motion for summary judgment(14 days after close of discovery).(Lovett, Zita)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 1/10/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ronald H. Pollack, Jr., Donald R. Geiter, Joshua G. Parsons Filing fee $ 150. by Acquired Learning, Inc., Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Sage Advice, LTD.(Sager, Steven)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Steven T. Sager on behalf of Acquired Learning, Inc., Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Sage Advice, LTD (Sager, Steven)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 68 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff for Clarification on Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [67] Motion for Extension of Time (Lovett, Zita)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time of 14 days to File a Response to the Motion for Summary Judgment by Acquired Learning, Inc., Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Sage Advice, LTD.(Abaid, Kim)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by F. James Coe on behalf of American Graphics Institute, Inc. (Coe, F.)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                        Request for Production of Documents from Dean Novosat and Judeann Stipe. (Abaid, Kim)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 64 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Response
                                          Responses and Objections to Document Requests by Acquired Learning, Inc., Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Sage Advice, LTD. (Abaid, Kim)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 63 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Statement of Facts
                                            STATEMENT of facts re [60] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 62 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Affidavit in Support
                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re [60] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Christopher Smith. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [60] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006, Terminated: 1/10/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Endorsed ORDER entered re conference held on October 24, 2006. cc/cl(Edge, Eugenia)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                      Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Show Cause Hearing
                                                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Show Cause Hearing held on 10/24/2006. Parties do not settle; case set for finalpre-trial conference January 16, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Carol Scott.) (Lovett, Zita)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Mail Returned
                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Electronic Notice of Hearing scheduled for 10/24/06 @ 11:00 sent to Clark Edwards returned. (Edge, Eugenia)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : HEARING TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT OR SHOW CAUSE is set for 10/24/2006 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry 57 corrected because: Wrong party was selected when docketing, corrected filers and docket text. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Status Report
                                                                STATUS REPORT of Settlement Negotiations and Request for Show Cause Hearing by American Graphics Institute, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) # (4) Exhibit D)(Fessenden, Giovanna) Modified on 9/26/2006 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Status Report
                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Dean Novosat. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Final Order and Judgment on Consent# (2) Proposed Settlement Agreement)(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 56 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                    NOTICE by American Graphics Institute, Inc. of Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # (1) Preliminary Injunction Order)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 55 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                      NOTICE by Acquired Learning, Inc. of Default Judgment Against Defendants ALI & Sage Advice, Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Default Judgment Against Defendants ALI & Sage Advice, Ltd.)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                        NOTICE by American Graphics Institute, Inc. of Default Judgment Against Clark Edwards (Attachments: # (1) Default Judgment Against Clark Edwards)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Clark Edwards.(Abaid, Kim) Modified on 7/12/2006 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                            Proposed Document(s) submitted by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Order: Default Judgment Against Clark Edwards. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 52 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 51 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Acquired Learning, Inc. and Sage Advice, LTD.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 49 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. Plaintiff American Graphics Institute and Defendants Stipe and Novosat shall report to this court by September 27, 2006 regarding the status of their settlement negotiations.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 48 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                    NOTICE by American Graphics Institute, Inc. of Hearing (Attachments: # (1))(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing :Motion Hearing/Status conference set for 6/29/2006 12:30 PM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                                                                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT - [43] Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants Judeann Stipe and Dean Novosat is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. [38] Motion to Set Aside Default and [39] Motion to Set Aside Default are ALLOWED.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                                                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [42] Affidavit filed by Dean Novosat - Accepting this document as a motion to set aside default, said motion is ALLOWED.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Affidavit in Opposition
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Judeann Stipe in Opposition re [41] Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                                                              NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [43] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Judeann Stipe and Dean Novosat, [44] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [45] Affidavit in Support of Motion,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 1/10/06. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                NOTICE of DISMISSAL by American Graphics Institute, Inc. of Carl Leinbach Under Rule 41(a) Fed. R. Civ. P., Without Prejudice (Fessenden, Giovanna) Modified on 1/5/2006 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re [43] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Judeann Stipe and Dean Novosat filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Stipe Return of Service)# (2) Exhibit B (Novosat Return of Service))(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [43] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Judeann Stipe and Dean Novosat filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006, Terminated: 1/15/2006 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                      MOTION for Default Judgment as to Judeann Stipe and Dean Novosat by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Form of Order for Default Judgment))(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Affidavit
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Objection to re [41] Opposition to Request to set aside default by Dean Novosat. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          Opposition re [38] MOTION to Set Aside Default, [39] MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                            Letter Requesting Hearing from Dean Novosat. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 1/15/2006 Motion to Set Aside Default
                                                                                                              MOTION to Set Aside Default by Judeann Stipe.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 1/15/2006 Motion to Set Aside Default
                                                                                                                MOTION to Set Aside Default by Dean Novosat.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                  Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entries 38 and 39. corrected because: Documents should be filed as a motion not a letter. Re-docketed with correct event. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re [35] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Acquired Learning, Inc. and Sage Advice, Ltd. of Giovanna H. Fessenden filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [35] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Acquired Learning, Inc. and Sage Advice, Ltd. filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005, Terminated: 6/29/2006 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Default Judgment as to Acquired Learning, Inc. and Sage Advice, Ltd. by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order for Default Judgment Against Acquired Learning, Inc. and Sage Advice, Ltd.)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                                                                                                            NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Carl Leinbach, Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Clark Edwards (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re [16] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Affidavit)(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [27] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum (Abaid, Kim) Modified on 11/22/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: on Preliminary InjunctionHearing set for 12/5/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Lovett, Zita)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Acquired Learning, Inc., Sage Advice, LTD (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Attorney for American Graphics Institute, Inc re [28] Request for notice of default by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Request for notice of default
                                                                                                                                          Request for notice of default. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005, Terminated: 11/21/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT by Carl Leinbach. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Affidavit in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Judeann Stipe in Opposition re [16] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Affidavit in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Dean Novosat and Sage Advice LTD in Opposition re [16] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Affidavit in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Clark Edwards in Opposition re [16] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Abaid, Kim) Modified on 10/20/2005 (Abaid, Kim).
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Clark Edwards.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re [16] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Christopher Smith filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B-D# (3) Exhibit E-I# (4) Exhibit J-P# (5) Exhibit Q-R# (6) Exhibit S-U# (7) Exhibit W-Y)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [16] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Cyndie Shaffstall by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [16] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Michael Silverman by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re [16] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Jason H. Eaddy filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1# (2) Appendix 2# (3) Appendix 3# (4) Appendix 4)(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [16] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005, Terminated: 6/29/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by American Graphics Institute, Inc..(Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Sage Advice, LTD served on 9/16/2005, answer due 10/6/2005. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Carl Leinbach served on 9/22/2005, answer due 10/12/2005. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Judeann Stipe served on 9/19/2005, answer due 10/11/2005. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Dean Novosat served on 9/19/2005, answer due 10/11/2005. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Clark Edwards served on 9/19/2005, answer due 10/11/2005. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Acquired Learning, Inc. served on 9/19/2005, answer due 10/11/2005. (Fessenden, Giovanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ElectronicORDER entered [3] Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to re-filing with certification pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) and Certificate of Service. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David Brody on behalf of all plaintiffs (Brody, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Smith by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Exhibit N# (15) Exhibit O# (16) Exhibit P# (17) Exhibit Q# (18) Exhibit R# (19) Exhibit S# (20) Exhibit T# (21) Exhibit U# (22) Exhibit V# (23) Exhibit W# (24) Exhibit X# (25) Exhibit Y)(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Jason H. Eaddy by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4)(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Cyndie Shaffstall by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Silverman by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by American Graphics Institute, Inc..(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 66886, filed by American Graphics Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Carl Leinbach, Acquired Learning, Inc., Judeann Stipe, Dean Novosat, Clark Edwards, Sage Advice, LTD. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Sorokin. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?