American Reinsurance Company et al v. American International Group et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11840-MLW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Re-insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo American United Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Dorinco Reinsurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Hartford Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Houston Casualty Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Monumental Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Pan-American Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo ReliaStar Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Sun Life Assurance Company Of Canada, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
No Logo Swiss Re Life & Health America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathy McFarland

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Christine Dusek +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 robin.dusek@lovells.com
Space Joseph T. McCullough +1 312 832 4400 +1 312 832 4444 joe.mccullough@lovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch, Brewer, Hoffman & Fink LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Robbins +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 arobbins@lynchbrewer.com
Space Steven L. Schreckinger +1 617 951 0800 +1 617 951 0811 sschreckinger@lynchbrewer.com
v.
No Logo Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Office Boston
Filed 9/9/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $15000000
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition non-reportable closing
County Suffolk
Terminated 9/7/2006
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 05-2788[Suffolk County Superior Court]
Def Custody Status
Flag STAYED
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 70 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Trenwick America Reinsurance Corporation by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company. (Robbins, Anne)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
    Judge Mark L. Wolf : ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [69] Status Report. ALLOWED. The parties shall, by December 21, 2007, report whether this case may be dismissed. (O'Leary, Dennis)
      LREF
      Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT of Settlement per Court's Order of June 4, 2007 by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company. (Robbins, Anne)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
        Judge Mark L. Wolf : ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [68] Status Report. ALLOWED. The stay shall continue. The parties shall report further on settlement by September 29, 2007. (O'Leary, Dennis)
          LREF
          Legal Document 68 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT on Status of Settlement (per Court's Order of April 22, 2007) by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company. (Robbins, Anne)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
            Judge Mark L. Wolf : ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [67] Status Report,, filed by Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company,, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada,, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company,, Houston Casualty Company,, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America,, Monumental Life Insurance Company,, First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company,, Reliastar Life Insurance Company,, John Hancock Life Insurance Company,, Hartford Life Insurance Company,, American Reinsurance Company,, American United Life Insurance Company,, Dorinco Reinsurance Company,, Insurance Corporation of Hannover,, Pan American Life Insurance Company,, Phoenix Life Insurance Company,, Swiss Re Life & Health America,, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation. A further status report or motion to dismiss Trenwick shall be filed by May 18, 2007. (O'Leary, Dennis)
              LREF
              Legal Document 67 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT on Status of Settlement by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company. (Robbins, Anne)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                Judge Mark L. Wolf : ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [66] Stipulation of Dismissal,,, filed by Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company,, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada,, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company,, Houston Casualty Company,, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America,, Monumental Life Insurance Company,, First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company,, Reliastar Life Insurance Company,, John Hancock Life Insurance Company,, American International Group,, Hartford Life Insurance Company,, American Reinsurance Company,, American United Life Insurance Company,, Dorinco Reinsurance Company,, Insurance Corporation of Hannover,, Pan American Life Insurance Company,, Phoenix Life Insurance Company,, Swiss Re Life & Health America,, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation. ALLOWED. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                  Judge Mark L. Wolf : ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [65] Status Report,, filed by Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company,, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada,, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company,, Houston Casualty Company,, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America,, Monumental Life Insurance Company,, First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company,, Reliastar Life Insurance Company,, John Hancock Life Insurance Company,, American International Group,, Hartford Life Insurance Company,, American Reinsurance Company,, American United Life Insurance Company,, Dorinco Reinsurance Company,, Insurance Corporation of Hannover,, Pan American Life Insurance Company,, Phoenix Life Insurance Company,, Swiss Re Life & Health America,, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation. Plaintiffs and Trenwick shall, by April 20, 1997, confer and report further concerning settlement. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
                    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Against AIG by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American International Group, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company. (Robbins, Anne)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT (First Joint) by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American International Group, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company. (Robbins, Anne)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company re [61] Notice of Appeal, of Withdrawal of Notice of Appeal (Schreckinger, Steven)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Entry dated 10/3/06, Filing Fee received: Text modified to correct the Appeal filing fee amount from $50.00 to $455.00 (Boyce, Kathy)
                            LREF
                            Blank 63 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing (Continued) held on September 7, 2006 before Judge Wolf. Court Reporter: Richard H. Romanow. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-0370 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                              LREF
                              Blank 62 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on September 6, 2006 before Judge Wolf. Court Reporter: Richard H. Romanow. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-0370 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                Filing fee: $455.00 receipt number 75404 for [61] Notice of Appeal, (Boyce, Kathy) Text modified on 10/6/2006 to correct the filing fee amount from previously entered as $50.00 to $455.00 (Boyce, Kathy).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006, Terminated: 10/12/2006 Notice of Appeal
                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [60] Order, Set/Clear Flags, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by all plaintiffs. $ 455 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 10/19/2006. (Schreckinger, Steven)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                    Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. For the reasons stated in court on September 7, 2006, it ishereby ORDERED that:1. Defendant Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation?sRenewed Motion to Stay (Docket No. 38) is ALLOWED.2. Defendant American International Group, Inc.?s RenewedMotion to Stay (Docket No. 40) is ALLOWED.3. The plaintiffs? Renewed Motion to Remand (Docket No. 35)is DENIED.4. This case is STAYED.5. The parties shall, by February 28, 2007, and every sixmonths thereafter, report whether this case may be dismissed.(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                      Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark L. Wolf : Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2006 re [9] MOTION to Stay filed by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation,, [35] MOTION to Remand (Renewed) filed by Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company,, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada,, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company,, Houston Casualty Company,, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America,, Monumental Life Insurance Company,, First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company,, Reliastar Life Insurance Company,, John Hancock Life Insurance Company,, Hartford Life Insurance Company,, American Reinsurance Company,, American United Life Insurance Company,, Dorinco Reinsurance Company,, Insurance Corporation of Hannover,, Pan American Life Insurance Company,, Phoenix Life Insurance Company,, Swiss Re Life & Health America,. (Court Reporter Romanow.) (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Terminated Case
                                        Civil Case Terminated. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                          Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark L. Wolf : Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2006 re [9] MOTION to Stay filed by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation,, [35] MOTION to Remand (Renewed) filed by Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company,, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada,, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company,, Houston Casualty Company,, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America,, Monumental Life Insurance Company,, First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company,, Reliastar Life Insurance Company,, John Hancock Life Insurance Company,, Hartford Life Insurance Company,, American Reinsurance Company,, American United Life Insurance Company,, Dorinco Reinsurance Company,, Insurance Corporation of Hannover,, Pan American Life Insurance Company,, Phoenix Life Insurance Company,, Swiss Re Life & Health America,, [52] First MOTION to Strike filed by American International Group,. (Court Reporter Romanow.) (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                            Letter/request (non-motion). (Harding, John)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE by American International Group of AIG's Supplemental Citation of Authority (Harding, John)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                Proposed Document(s) submitted by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company. Document received: Supplemental Amended Complaint. (Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [53] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Amended Complaint filed by all plaintiffs. (Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006, Terminated: 9/7/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Amended Complaint by all plaintiffs.(Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006, Terminated: 9/7/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                      First MOTION to Strike by American International Group.(Harding, John)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [51] Addendum to Motion/Memorandum,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 9/1/2006. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Addendum to Motion/Memorandum
                                                          Supplemental ADDENDUM re [35] MOTION to Remand (Renewed) Aprising the Court of New Developments filed by American Reinsurance Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5)(Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [50] Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 8/31/2006. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                              NOTICE by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation re Remark filing of redacted pleadings (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Krim, Eben)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [9] MOTION to Stay, [35] MOTION to Remand (Renewed), [3] MOTION to Stay, [12] MOTION to Remand: Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2006 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                  Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting [49] Motion to Continue. The court is not available on September 21, 2006. The hearing is rescheduled for September 6, 2006 at 11:00 AM. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                    Joint MOTION for Adjournment of the 8/7/06 Hearing by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American International Group, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company, FILED.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [12] MOTION to Remand, [3] MOTION to Stay, [35] MOTION to Remand (Renewed), [9] MOTION to Stay: Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf. (Attachments: # (1))(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [46] Notice (Other). Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 6/23/2006. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          NOTICE by American International Group of Filing of Defendant AIG, Inc.'s Redacted Pleadings (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7))(Harding, John)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE by American International Group of Correction to Appearance of Counsel (Harding, John)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                                              NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for [45] Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 5/5/2006. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                NOTICE by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company of Filing of Redacted Pleadings (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit B, Tab 1# (4) Exhibit B, Tab 2# (5) Exhibit B, Tab 3# (6) Exhibit B, Tab 4# (7) Exhibit B, Tab 5# (8) Exhibit B, Tab 6# (9) Exhibit B, Tab 7# (10) Exhibit B, Tab 8# (11) Exhibit B, Tab 9# (12) Exhibit C# (13) Exhibit D)(Robbins, Anne)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                  Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting [16] Motion to Seal, granting [18] Motion to Seal, granting [26] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kathy McFarland for First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company and Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Robin C. Dusek for First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company and Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Joseph T McCullough for First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company and Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, granting [30] Motion to Seal Document, granting [32] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, granting [43] Motion for Leave to File, granting [2] Motion to Seal Document, granting [5] Motion to Seal, granting [13] Motion to Seal. Counsel shall file a notice of appearance to make sure all their contact information is on the docket correctly and should take the necessary steps required to become registered for electronic filing. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [36] Assented to MOTION to Seal DEFENDANT TRENWICK AMERICA REINSURANCE CORPORATION?S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS RENEWED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? RENEWED MOTION FOR REMAND, [43] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File REPLY MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANT TRENWICK AMERICA REINSURANCE CORPORATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS RENEWED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION and certificate of service filed by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation. (Krim, Eben)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006, Terminated: 4/14/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File REPLY MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANT TRENWICK AMERICA REINSURANCE CORPORATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS RENEWED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation.(Krim, Eben)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Remark
                                                                                        Remark - A redacted filing of all sealed documents shall be made for the public record (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                          Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting [36] Motion to Seal, granting [37] Motion to Seal Document, granting [41] Motion to Seal (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006, Terminated: 2/6/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                            ASSENTED TO MOTION to Seal Pltfs' Memorandum in Opposition to the Renewed Motions of Defts AIG Inc. and Trenwick to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2006 (Boyce, Kathy). Modified on 2/3/2006 to add electronic document which was inadvertently not e-filed (hard copy was initially submitted) (Boyce, Kathy).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006, Terminated: 2/6/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                              Assented to MOTION to Seal Document (RENEWED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION) by American International Group.(Harding, John)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006, Terminated: 2/6/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal DEFENDANT TRENWICK AMERICA REINSURANCE CORPORATION?S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS RENEWED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? RENEWED MOTION FOR REMAND by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation.(Krim, Eben)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                  Filing fee: $ 150.00, receipt number 69460 regarding Motion of Kathy L. McFarland, Robin C. Dusek and Joseph T. McCullough to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006, Terminated: 9/7/2006 Motion to Remand
                                                                                                    MOTION to Remand (Renewed) by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company.(Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by American Reinsurance Company.(Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [12] MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court filed by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A, Spitzer Complaint# (2) Exhibit Spitzer Complaint, Ex. 1# (3) Exhibit Spitzer Complaint, Ex. 2# (4) Exhibit Spitzer Complaint, Ex. 3# (5) Exhibit Spitzer Complaint, Ex. 4# (6) Errata Spitzer Complaint, Ex. 5# (7) Exhibit Spitzer Complaint, Ex. 6# (8) Exhibit Spitzer Complaint, Ex. 7)(Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005, Terminated: 4/14/2006 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company.(Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Enlarge Time by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American International Group, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company. (Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Order on Motion for Modification
                                                                                                              Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting [29] ASSENTED TO MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Defts American International Group, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005, Terminated: 4/14/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal Document TRENWICK AMERICA REINSURANCE CORPORATION'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND AND REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF TRENWICK'S MOTION TO STAY by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation.(Krim, Eben)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in secure file room. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in secure file room. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2005, Entered: 11/12/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                      Judge Mark L. Wolf : ElectronicORDER entered granting [24] Motion Briefing Schedule (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion to Modify
                                                                                                                        ASSENTED TO MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Defts American International Group, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005, Terminated: 4/14/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathy L. McFarland, Robin C. Dusek and Joseph T. McCullough by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Kathy McFarland in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application# (2) Affidavit of Robin C. Dusek# (3) Affidavit Joseph T. McCullough)(Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                            Judge Mark L. Wolf : ElectronicORDER entered granting [25] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005, Terminated: 11/10/2005 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                              First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to File Consolidated Brief by American International Group.(Harding, John)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION for Entry of Briefing Schedule by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American International Group, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Anne Robbins and Steven L. Schreckinger (Robbins, Anne)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Scott P. Lewis (Lewis, Scott)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Robbins on behalf of all plaintiffs (Robbins, Anne)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Substitute Corrected Pltfs' Memorandum of law in Opposition to Defts' Motions to Stay Proceedings by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Impound Materials by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Impound Materials by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Impound Materials by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Motion to Remand
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court by First Allmerica Financial Life Insurance Company, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Insurance Corporation of Hannover, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Pan American Life Insurance Company, Phoenix Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Swiss Re Life & Health America, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, American United Life Insurance Company, Dorinco Reinsurance Company, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Enlarge Time by American Reinsurance Company. (Schreckinger, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document No. 10, State Court Record corrected: to modify the text to omit the "answer due date" wording as the parties have filed motions to stay the case pending arbitration in lieu of an answer. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                              Judge Mark L. Wolf : ElectronicORDER entered granting [4] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ronald S. Rauchberg for Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, Margaret A. Dale for Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, David L. Shaul for Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 state court record
                                                                                                                                                                STATE COURT Record American International Group served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation served on 9/9/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Part II of State Court Record)(Boyce, Kathy) Modified on 9/29/2005 to correct the text of entry which had previously read answer due date 9/29/05 - both parties had filed motion to stay case pending arbitration. (Boyce, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                  Filing fee: $150.00, receipt number 66978 regarding Document No. 4, Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration, by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005, Terminated: 9/26/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald S. Rauchberg, Margaret A. Dale and David L. Shaul by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation.(Krim, Eben)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005, Terminated: 4/14/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation.(Krim, Eben)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant MOTION to Impound Materials by American International Group, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation.(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant AIG'S MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation.(York, Steve) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2005 (York, Steve).
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American International Group, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation from Suffolk County Superior Court, case number 05-2788. $ 250, receipt number 66780, filed by American International Group, Trenwick American Reinsurance Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Part 1# (2) Exhibit Part 2# (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?