Ahead, Inc. v. Golf Design U.S.A. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11839-REK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 8:21 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ahead, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vickie L. Henry +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 vhenry@foleyhoag.com
Space Jeremy A. Younkin +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 jyounkin@foleyhoag.com
v.
No Logo Golf Design U.S.A., Defendant
No Logo John Tate, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 9/9/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Bristol
Terminated 1/10/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PATENT
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Folan, Karen)
    LREF
    Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ahead, Inc. (Younkin, Jeremy)
      LREF
      Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Complaint
      COMPLAINT against Golf Design U.S.A., John Tate Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 66751, filed by Ahead, Inc..(Folan, Karen)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Folan, Karen)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Summons Issued
          Summons Issued as to Golf Design U.S.A., John Tate. (Folan, Karen)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 38 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?