NEWTON -v- DISNEY-ABC TELEVISION GROUP
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-03318

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2018 at 2:53 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Application to Proceed IFP
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 5/20/2015. (nr, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Complaint Received
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?