Andersen et al v. Bayview Crematory, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-11904-RCL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan C Andersen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa DeBrosse Johnson +1 617 850 9065 +1 617 850 9067 DeBrosseJohnson@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MCKINLEY LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Charlip +1 954 921 2131 +1 954 921 2191 dcharlip@charliplawgroup.com
No Logo Britton Hall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Chairman & Ceo, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "David Johnson"

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Dawn Lattime, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Donna M Tomaso, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Edward Galvin JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa DeBrosse Johnson +1 617 850 9065 +1 617 850 9067 DeBrosseJohnson@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MCKINLEY LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Charlip +1 954 921 2131 +1 954 921 2191 dcharlip@charliplawgroup.com
No Logo Eleanor Poole, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MCKINLEY LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Charlip +1 954 921 2131 +1 954 921 2191 dcharlip@charliplawgroup.com
No Logo John Carlson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo John Foster, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Kathleen McDonough, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MCKINLEY LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Charlip +1 954 921 2131 +1 954 921 2191 dcharlip@charliplawgroup.com
No Logo Marie Ignoto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Patricia Hannigan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MCKINLEY LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Charlip +1 954 921 2131 +1 954 921 2191 dcharlip@charliplawgroup.com
No Logo Robert Delia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Sara-Anne Eames, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Shaun Ferris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Steven Dumais, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Suzanne Bourassa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
No Logo Tara McDonough, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
Space Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MCKINLEY LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Charlip +1 954 921 2131 +1 954 921 2191 dcharlip@charliplawgroup.com
v.
No Logo American Cremation Society, Inc, Defendant
No Logo American Society for Cremation, Defendant
No Logo American Society for Funeral Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth Funeral Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Does 1-50, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated, Defendant

Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by McKee Nelson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael E. Okolita +1 508 798 0717 +1 508 798 1850 mokolita@harleysvillegroup.com
No Logo Hart-Wallace Funeral Home, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gallagher & Cavanaugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheryl M. Bourbeau +1 978 452 0522 +1 978 452 0482 sherylb@gcattorneys.com
Space Richard E Cavanaugh +1 978 452 0522 +1 978 452 0482 richardc@gcattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Getman Schulthess & Steere PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dona Feeney +1 603 634 4300 +1 603 626 3647 dfeeney@gstss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lecomte, Emanuelson and Doyle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Wade Perkins +1 617 328 1900 +1 617 328 2030 mperkins@lecomtelaw.com
No Logo Larry Stokes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark, Hunt & Embry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Ahern, Jr. +1 617 494 1920 +1 617 494 1921 wahern@chelaw.com
Space Jeremy Y. Weltman +1 617 494 1920 +1 617 494 1920 jweltman@chelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Getman Schulthess & Steere PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dona Feeney +1 603 634 4300 +1 603 626 3647 dfeeney@gstss.com
No Logo Robert G. Hamel, Defendant
No Logo Roger Hamel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by arbella.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian K. Walsh +1 617 769 3500 +1 617 946 0569 brian.walsh@arbella.com
No Logo Stephen G. Scatamacchia, Defendant
No Logo Bayview Crematory, LLC, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Getman Schulthess & Steere PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dona Feeney +1 603 634 4300 +1 603 626 3647 dfeeney@gstss.com
No Logo Commonwealth Cremation & Shipping Service, Inc., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Riemer & Braunstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis E. McKenna +1 617 880 3454 +1 617 692 3453 dmckenna@riemerlaw.com
No Logo Cremation Society of Massachusetts, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph M. Desmond +1 617 439 7500 +1 617 342 4935 jdesmond@morrisonmahoney.com
No Logo Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by arbella.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian K. Walsh +1 617 769 3500 +1 617 946 0569 brian.walsh@arbella.com
No Logo Roger Hamel, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by arbella.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian K. Walsh +1 617 769 3500 +1 617 946 0569 brian.walsh@arbella.com
Office Boston
Filed 9/20/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Suffolk
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
105-cv-11140-RCL
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CASREF
  Entries (176) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Status Conference
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 7/15/2008. Further Status Conference set for 9/9/2008 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Notice of Rescheduling
    ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: The Status Conference previously scheduled for 7/8/2008 is rescheduled to 7/15/2008 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
      LREF
      Legal Document 138 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Lisa DeBrosse Johnson (Johnson, Lisa)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
        Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [137] Motion to Continue. (Bowler, Marianne)
          LREF
          Legal Document 137 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008, Terminated: 7/7/2008 Motion to Continue
          MOTION to Continue July 8 Status Conference by Bayview Crematory, LLC.(Feeney, Dona)
            LREF
            Legal Document 136 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay: ORDER entered. Separate and Final Judgment in favor of Neptune Society against Edward Crematory, LLC et al.(York, Steve)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
              Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [135] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Bowler, Marianne)
                LREF
                Legal Document 135 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 6/2/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                MOTION for Extension of Time to August 1, 2008 to Complete Discovery by Alan C Andersen.(Charlip, David)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [134] Motion to Continue. The status conference is continued until July 8, 2008 at 2:30 p.m. (Bowler, Marianne)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 134 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008, Terminated: 5/6/2008 Motion to Continue
                    Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference to July 8, 2008 by Hart-Wallace Funeral Home.(Bourbeau, Sheryl)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 133 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                      separate and final judgment attached Letter/request (non-motion) from maureen reilly. (Reilly, Maureen)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                        Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [132] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Bowler, Marianne)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 132 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008, Terminated: 4/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/01/08 to Complete Discovery by Edward Galvin JR..(Johnson, Lisa)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Order on Motion for Settlement
                            Judge William G. Young: Electronic ORDER entered granting [124] Motion for Settlement (Hourihan, Lisa)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Order on Report and Recommendations
                              Judge William G. Young: Electronic ORDER entered approving [129] Report and Recommendations. A Separate and Final Judgment pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) shall be entered. Counsel to file a proposed form of Judgment. Promptly. (York, Steve)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 131 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE by John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole, Donna M Tomaso, Suzanne Bourassa of Vacation/Unavailability (Charlip, David)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [130] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 130 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008, Terminated: 2/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Bayview Crematory, LLC.(Feeney, Dona)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 129 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008, Terminated: 4/16/2008 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                      Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re [124] Assented to MOTION for Settlement and entry of separate and final judgment filed by Neptune Society INC., Recommendation: ALLOWED and that the court enter a separate and final certified Rule 54(b)judgment. Objections to R&R due by 2/20/2008(Feeney, Eileen)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 128 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MandiJo Hanneke (Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                          Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered denying Motion for Protective Order [122] to the extent that video depositions shall be permitted and withdrawing that portion of the motion referring to the actual taking of the depositions and granting [126] Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Status Conference
                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2007 as to [126] Second MOTION for Extension of Time, [124] Assented to MOTION for Settlement and entry of separate and final judgment and [122] Emergency MOTION for Protective Order. Rulings made as stated on the record in open court. The court adopts the schedule proposed in MOTION [126] and MOTION [125] is voluntarily withdrawn. Further Status Conference set for 2/4/2008 at 2:30 PM. (Duffy, Marc)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 127 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Y. Weltman on behalf of Larry Stokes (Weltman, Jeremy)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 126 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007, Terminated: 12/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (Corrected) by Edward Galvin JR..(Charlip, David)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Terminate Motions
                                                  Motions terminated: [125] Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Enlarge Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Edward Galvin JR.. ( This motion is terminated because it has been refiled as [126] ). (York, Steve)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 125 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007, Terminated: 12/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                    Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Enlarge Scheduling Order Deadlines by Edward Galvin JR..(Charlip, David) Modified on 12/11/2007 (York, Steve).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 124 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007, Terminated: 4/16/2008 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                      Assented to MOTION for Settlement and entry of separate and final judgment by Neptune Society INC.,.(Reilly, Maureen)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. Hearing on [122] MOTION for Protective Order set for 12/12/2007 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 123 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Response to Motion
                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [122] Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Edward Galvin JR., Patricia Hannigan, Kathleen McDonough, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A to Response# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B to Response# (3) Exhibit Exhibit C to Response)(Charlip, David)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 122 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007, Terminated: 12/12/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                            Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Bayview Crematory, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) # (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K)(Feeney, Dona)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 121 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Answer
                                                              NEPTUNE SOCIETY'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, Amended CROSSCLAIM against Bayview Crematory, LLC by Neptune Society INC.,.(Reilly, Maureen)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 120 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint, ANSWER to Crossclaim of Hamel, Wickens & Troupe and Roger Hamel by Bayview Crematory, LLC.(Feeney, Dona)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 119 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Answer
                                                                  Answer to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Hart-Wallace Funeral Home.(Bourbeau, Sheryl)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 118 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc.(Bourbeau, Sheryl)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 117 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Derek A. Wallace.(Bourbeau, Sheryl)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 116 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Linda Stokes, Larry Stokes.(Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 115 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          Judge Marianne B. Bowler : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE:DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOCKET ENTRY # 112) is DENIED. DEFENDANT NEPTUNE SOCIETY,INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO JOIN DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOCKET ENTRY # 113)is ALLOWED. Defendants are directed to file a responsive pleading to the first amended complaint, Docket Entry #10 on or before October 29, 2007.(Feeney, Eileen)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Status Conference
                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 10/18/2007. The courts hears argument on MOTIONS to Strike [112] and [113], takes the motions under advisement. Further Status Conference set for 12/12/2007 at 2:30 PM. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 114 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                              Quarterly RESPONSE to Motion re [113] MOTION to Strike plaintiffs' first amended complaint, [112] MOTION to Strike [110] Amended Complaint, filed by Edward Galvin JR., Patricia Hannigan, Kathleen McDonough, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole. (Charlip, David)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 113 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007, Terminated: 10/19/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                MOTION to Strike plaintiffs' first amended complaint by Neptune Society INC.,.(Reilly, Maureen)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007, Terminated: 10/19/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                  MOTION to Strike [110] Amended Complaint, by Bayview Crematory, LLC, Derek A. Wallace, Linda Stokes, Larry Stokes, Hart-Wallace Funeral Home, Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc.(Feeney, Dona)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                    Defendants Hamel, Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc. and Roger Hamel's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against Bayview Crematory, LLC by Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc, Roger Hamel.(Walsh, Brian)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                      First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc, Larry Stokes, Roger Hamel, Bayview Crematory, LLC Derek A. Wallace, Linda Stokes, Hart-Wallace Funeral Home, Inc., Neptune Society, Inc., and Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc., filed by Edward Galvin JR., Patricia Hannigan, Kathleen McDonough, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole. (Attachments: # (1) Cover Letter per Magistrate Judge Bowler's Order [Docket # 105])(Charlip, David)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 109 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        Judge Marianne B. Bowler : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (DOCKET ENTRY #105) is ALLOWED to the extent that plaintiffs may add the necessary allegations to set forth diversity jurisdiction and to conform the complaint to the parties' stipulations and the Report and Recommendation. The motion is otherwise DENIED including the addition of the eight proposed plaintiffs.(Feeney, Eileen) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2007 (Feeney, Eileen).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 108 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                          NOTICE by Edward Galvin JR., Patricia Hannigan, Kathleen McDonough, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole of Firm Name Change (Kaufman, Evan)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                            Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 9/14/2007. Further Status Conference set for 10/18/2007 at 2:00 PM. Hearing on MOTION to Amend [105] held. The court takes the motion under advisement. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered finding as moot [91] MOTION for Leave to File Non-Conforming Memorandum by Linda Stokes. (Lindsay, Reginald)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Order on Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for [99] Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Cremation Society of Massachusetts, Neptune Society INC.,, Commonwealth Funeral Services, Inc., Larry Stokes, Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc, Hart-Wallace Funeral Home, Derek A. Wallace, Linda Stokes, Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc, Bayview Crematory, LLC, Commonwealth Cremation & Shipping Service, Inc., Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated, Roger Hamel Action on motion: The motion is denied. In addition, the court approves the parties' stipulations entered on the court's docket as documents 96, 101, and 102. (Lindsay, Reginald)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 107 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  NOTICE by Edward Galvin JR., Patricia Hannigan, Kathleen McDonough, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole re [105] MOTION to Amend Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Amended Complaint)(Charlip, David)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 106 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Opposition re [105] MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Bayview Crematory, LLC, Derek A. Wallace, Linda Stokes, Larry Stokes, Hart-Wallace Funeral Home, Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc. (Feeney, Dona)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 105 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007, Terminated: 9/21/2007 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend Complaint by Edward Galvin JR., Patricia Hannigan, Kathleen McDonough, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Charlip, David)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                        Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [104] Motion to Continue. The status conference is continued until September 14, 2007 at 2:30 and the remainder of the motion is allowed. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007, Terminated: 8/3/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue Status Conference of August 15, 2007 to Post August 21, 2007 and to Enlarge Discovery Dates by Edward Galvin JR., Patricia Hannigan, Kathleen McDonough, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole.(Charlip, David)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 103 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007, Terminated: 8/30/2007 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Judge Marianne B. Bowler: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to [99] MOTION to Dismiss. This court RECOMMENDS that the motion to dismiss [99] be DENIED. This court further RECOMMENDS the approval and adoption of the parties stipulations [96], [101] and [102]. Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2007. Remaining plaintiffs should seek leave to amend the complaint within 30 days. Status Conference set for 8/15/2007 at 2:30 PM. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 6/4/2007. Counsel report the status of remaining Pltfs. All Hunt (05-11140-RCL) pltfs. are dismissed, five Andersen (05-11904-RCL) pltfs. remain. Pending motions to dismiss are still under advisement, further status conference date to be set out within ruling.(Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 102 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice Claims of Plaintiff Dennis Fowler by Dennis Fowler. (Charlip, David)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 101 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiffs, Alan C. Anderson, Suzanne Bourassa, Robert Della, Sara-Anne Eames, John Foster, Britton Hall, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Donna Tomaso, John Carlson & Shaun Ferris for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction & Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff, Steven Dumais by Alan C Andersen. (Charlip, David)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 5/8/2007 as to [99] MOTION to Dismiss and [92] MOTION to Compel. Rulings made as stated on the record in open court. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                      Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered, after hearing, withdrawing [92] Motion to Compel, without prejudice to renewal at a later date. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Hearing on MOTION to Dismiss [99] set for 5/8/2007 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 100 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [99] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by all plaintiffs. (Charlip, David)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 99 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007, Terminated: 8/30/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Commonwealth Funeral Services, Inc., Bayview Crematory, LLC, Derek A. Wallace, Linda Stokes, Larry Stokes, Commonwealth Cremation & Shipping Service, Inc., Cremation Society of Massachusetts, Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated, Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc, Roger Hamel, Hart-Wallace Funeral Home, Neptune Society INC.,, Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc.(Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on [92] MOTION to Compel set for 5/8/2007 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 98 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [92] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by all plaintiffs. (Charlip, David)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 97 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [92] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by all plaintiffs. (Charlip, David)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                    Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 79236 re: [90] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David H. Charlip (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 96 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re [1] Complaint,,, Withdrawal of Class Allegations by Alan C Andersen. (Charlip, David)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2007, Entered: 3/25/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                        Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [94] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [92]. No further extensions to be granted. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 95 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [94] MOTION for Extension of Time to April 11, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to [92] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Linda Stokes. (Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 94 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007, Terminated: 3/25/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to April 11, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to [92] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Alan C Andersen.(Charlip, David)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                              Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [90] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 93 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [92] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Linda Stokes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, Part 1# (2) Exhibit 1, Part 2# (3) Exhibits 2-5)(Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 92 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007, Terminated: 5/8/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Linda Stokes.(Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 91 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007, Terminated: 8/30/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Non-Conforming Memorandum by Linda Stokes.(Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 90 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007, Terminated: 3/12/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David H. Charlip by Alan C Andersen.(Johnson, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 89 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa DeBrosse Johnson on behalf of Alan C Andersen (Johnson, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                          Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [88] Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007, Terminated: 3/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Class Certification Briefing Schedule by John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Dennis Fowler, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole, Donna M Tomaso, Suzanne Bourassa.(Stewart, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 87 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Theodore M. Hess-Mahan (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 86 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Stewart on behalf of John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Dennis Fowler, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole, Donna M Tomaso, Suzanne Bourassa (Stewart, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 85 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Perkins on behalf of Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc (Perkins, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 84 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Perkins on behalf of Hart-Wallace Funeral Home (Perkins, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 83 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Perkins on behalf of Derek A. Wallace (Perkins, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 82 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                        Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by American Cremation Society, Inc.(Desmond, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 81 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc. (Cavanaugh, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 80 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hart-Wallace Funeral Home. (Cavanaugh, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Cavanaugh on behalf of Derek A. Wallace (Cavanaugh, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 78 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Cavanaugh on behalf of Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc (Cavanaugh, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 77 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Cavanaugh on behalf of Hart-Wallace Funeral Home (Cavanaugh, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 76 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Sheryl M. Bourbeau on behalf of Derek A. Wallace, Hart-Wallace Funeral Home, Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 75 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Derek A. Wallace.(Cavanaugh, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 74 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc.(Cavanaugh, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 73 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hart-Wallace Funeral Home.(Cavanaugh, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                            Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Commonwealth Cremation & Shipping Service, Inc..(McKenna, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Larry Stokes.(Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 70 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Linda Stokes.(Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 69 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Bayview Crematory, LLC.(Feeney, Dona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 68 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc.(Walsh, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 67 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Donna M Tomaso.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 66 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Eleanor Poole.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Tara McDonough.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 64 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Kathleen McDonough.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 63 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Dawn Lattime.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 62 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by David Johnson.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Marie Ignoto.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Patricia Hannigan.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Britton Hall.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Edward Galvin JR..(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Dennis Fowler.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by John Foster.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Shaun Ferris.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Sara-Anne Eames.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Steven Dumais.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Robert Delia.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by John Carlson.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Suzanne Bourassa.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Alan C Andersen.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Dennis E. Mckenna. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. re [45] Stipulation all the parties regarding the stipulation. (Lindsay, Reginald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/31/2006 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Referred for: Case Management, Dispositive motions and Class Certification motions(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2006. Court approves stipulation to consolidate cases for discovery only. Counsel to submit new stipulation with changes approved at the scheduling conference. Case to be referred to Magistrate Judge Bowler for Case Management and any dispositive motions and class certification motions for report and recommendation. Automatic disclosure due by 11/20/06. Fact discovery due by 8/5/07. Class certification motions due by 3/20/07. Response to motion for class certification due by 4/20/07. Motions for leave to file reply briefs due by 4/30/07. Expert disclosure due by 9/5/07. Rebuttal expert disclosure due by 10/5/07. Rebuttal expert disclosure due by 10/5/07. Discovery to be completed by 11/5/2007. Motions due by 12/7/2007. (Court Reporter None Present.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Dennis Fowler, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Donna M Tomaso, Bayview Crematory, LLC, Derek A. Wallace, Linda Stokes, Larry Stokes, Cremation Society of Massachusetts, Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated, Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc, Roger Hamel, Hart-Wallace Funeral Home, Neptune Society INC.,, Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc, Suzanne Bourassa. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference and Proposed Scheduling Order Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered denying [24] Motion to Dismiss and [25] Motion to Dismiss. The motion to dismiss of defendant Dracut Funeral Home is denied because the defendant has not shown that this court is without jurisdiction or that this court should abstain given the strong preference for class actions to proceed in federal court expressed in the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005, 119 Stat. 4. Defendant Neptune's motion to dismiss is denied because, on the present record, it appears there is personal jurisdiction over Neptune as the plaintiffs have alleged that Neptune committed a tort in Massachusetts. The clerk shall set a scheduling conference. (RCL, law1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc served on 1/18/2006, answer due 2/7/2006. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bayview Crematory, LLC.(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [24] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated. (Okolita, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [38] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [24] MOTION to Dismiss. A reply of no more than ten double-spaced pages with customary margins may be filed. Replies due by 3/15/2006. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [38] MOTION for Extension of Time to 03-07-06 to File Response/Reply filed by Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated. (Okolita, Michael) Modified on 3/9/2006 (York, Steve).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006, Terminated: 3/8/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to 03-07-06 to File Response/Reply by Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated.(Okolita, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2006 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Theodore M. Hess-Mahan in Opposition re [25] MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Dennis Fowler, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole, Donna M Tomaso, Suzanne Bourassa. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [25] MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Dennis Fowler, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole, Donna M Tomaso, Suzanne Bourassa. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Theodore M. Hess-Mahan in Opposition re [24] MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Dennis Fowler, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole, Donna M Tomaso, Suzanne Bourassa. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Part 1# (2) Exhibit A Part 2)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [24] MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Dennis Fowler, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole, Donna M Tomaso, Suzanne Bourassa. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc. (Walsh, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against Bayview Crematory, LLC by Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc, Roger Hamel.(Walsh, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Brian K. Walsh on behalf of Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc, Roger Hamel (Walsh, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [30] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [25] MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 2/17/2006 (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [29] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [24] MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 2/17/2006 (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 17, 2006 to File Response/Reply as to [25] MOTION to Dismiss by John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Dennis Fowler, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole, Donna M Tomaso, Suzanne Bourassa.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 17, 2006 to File Response/Reply as to [24] MOTION to Dismiss by John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Dennis Fowler, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole, Donna M Tomaso, Suzanne Bourassa.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Linda Stokes, Larry Stokes.(Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Dorothy Pacimeo. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [25] Defendant Neptune Society INC. MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Pro.12(b)(2) filed by Neptune Society INC.,. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant Neptune Society INC. MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Pro.12(b)(2) by Neptune Society INC.,.(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005, Terminated: 7/24/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Alan C Andersen. Linda Stokes served on 12/12/2005, answer due 1/3/2006. Acknowledgement filed by Alan C Andersen. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Alan C Andersen. Larry Stokes served on 12/12/2005, answer due 1/3/2006. Acknowledgement filed by Alan C Andersen. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Alan C Andersen. Bayview Crematory, LLC served on 12/14/2005, answer due 1/3/2006. Acknowledgement filed by Alan C Andersen. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [20] Motion for Extension of Time to 12/26/2005 to file a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Neptune Society INC. (Hourihan, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Ahern, Jr on behalf of Linda Stokes, Larry Stokes (Ahern, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to 12/26/2005 to filing a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Neptune Society INC.,.(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen L. Reilly on behalf of Neptune Society INC., (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Grant S. Palmer by Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated, Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated.(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John J. DiChello by Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated, Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated.(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay : Electronic ORDER entered granting [16] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John J. DiChello for Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated, granting [17] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Grant S Palmer for Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated, (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 68616 regarding Pro Hac Vice (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commonwealth Cremation & Shipping Service, Inc., Commonwealth Cremation & Shipping Service, Inc.. (McKenna, Dennis) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2005 (York, Steve).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Commonwealth Cremation and Shipping Service, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Bayview Crematory, LLC, Bayview Crematory, LLC by Commonwealth Cremation & Shipping Service, Inc..(McKenna, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Bayview Crematory, LLC by Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2)(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Robert G. Hamel served on 11/1/2005, answer due 11/21/2005. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Cremation Society of Massachusetts served on 11/1/2005, answer due 11/21/2005. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Commonwealth Funeral Services, Inc. served on 10/17/2005, answer due 11/7/2005. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Commonwealth Cremation & Shipping Service, Inc. served on 10/17/2005, answer due 11/7/2005. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed American Society for Funeral Services, Inc. served on 10/19/2005, answer due 11/8/2005. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed American Society for Cremation served on 10/19/2005, answer due 11/8/2005. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed American Cremation Society, Inc served on 10/19/2005, answer due 11/8/2005. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by MandiJo Hanneke on behalf of Linda Stokes, Larry Stokes (Hanneke, MandiJo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Dana Abrahams. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Cremation Society of Massachusetts ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, First CROSSCLAIM Cremation Society of Massachusetts against Bayview Crematory, LLC by Cremation Society of Massachusetts.(Desmond, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Bayview Crematory, LLC, Derek A. Wallace, Linda Stokes, Larry Stokes, American Cremation Society, Inc, Stephen G. Scatamacchia, Commonwealth Cremation & Shipping Service, Inc., Cremation Society of Massachusetts, Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated, Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc, Roger Hamel, Hart-Wallace Funeral Home, Neptune Society INC.,, Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc, Does 1-50, Inclusive Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 67006, filed by John Carlson, Robert Delia, Steven Dumais, Sara-Anne Eames, Shaun Ferris, John Foster, Dennis Fowler, Edward Galvin JR., Britton Hall, Patricia Hannigan, Marie Ignoto, David Johnson, Dawn Lattime, Kathleen McDonough, Alan C Andersen, Tara McDonough, Eleanor Poole, Donna M Tomaso, Suzanne Bourassa. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2# (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Bayview Crematory, LLC, Derek A. Wallace, Linda Stokes, Larry Stokes, American Cremation Society, Inc, Stephen G. Scatamacchia, Commonwealth Cremation & Shipping Service, Inc., Cremation Society of Massachusetts, Dracut Funeral Home Incorporated, Hamel Wickens & Troupe Funeral Home, Inc, Roger Hamel, Hart-Wallace Funeral Home, Neptune Society INC.,, Simplicity Burial & Cremation, Inc, Does 1-50, Inclusive. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?