Sekula v. Midland Credit Management, Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-02822

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 5:38 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Yakov Y. Sekula, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip A. Downey, Esq.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Jon Fishbein +1 516 791 4400 +1 516 791 4411 fishbeinadamj@gmail.com
No Logo Yakov Y. Sekula , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip A. Downey, Esq.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Jon Fishbein +1 516 791 4400 +1 516 791 4411 fishbeinadamj@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Encore Capital Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Midland Credit Management, Inc., Defendant
Midland Funding LLC Midland Funding LLC, Defendant
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 34 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?