Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.
Page 1 Page 2 Page 3 Page 4 Page 5
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
1969 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1817 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1742 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1741 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1739 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1738 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1737 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1722 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1721 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1664 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1648 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1646 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1637 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1629 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1628 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1626 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1623 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1622 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1621 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1617 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1609 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1587 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1576 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1575 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1535 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1365 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1364 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1358 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1345 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1340 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1337 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1336 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1335 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1334 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1327 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1266 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1259 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1258 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1257 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1256 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1251 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1170 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1169 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
307 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
306 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
288 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
261 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
258 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
257 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
256 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
255 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
254 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
253 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
252 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
251 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
250 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
249 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
248 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
247 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
246 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
245 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
241 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
238 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
233 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
232 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
229 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
227 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
224 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
220 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
219 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
217 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
215 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
214 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
213 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
211 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
210 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
205 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
200 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
199 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
198 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
197 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
194 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
193 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
186 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
184 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
183 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
182 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
180 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
176 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
175 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
172 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
168 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
166 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
161 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
154 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
153 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
152 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
150 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
149 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
148 |
Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
147 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
146 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
145 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
144 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
143 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
142 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
141 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
133 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
132 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
131 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
130 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
129 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
128 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
127 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
126 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
125 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
124 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
123 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
122 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
121 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
120 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
118 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
117 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
116 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
112 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
111 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
110 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
106 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
105 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
104 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
102 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
101 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
98 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
97 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
96 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
95 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
94 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
93 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
91 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
90 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
89 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
88 |
Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
87 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
86 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
84 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
83 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
82 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
81 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
80 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
79 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
78 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
77 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
76 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
75 |
Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
74 |
Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
73 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
72 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
71 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
70 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
69 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
68 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
65 |
Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
61 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
60 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
54 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
53 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
52 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
51 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
50 |
Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
49 |
Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
48 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
47 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
46 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
45 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
44 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
43 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
42 |
Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
41 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
38 |
Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
36 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
35 |
Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
34 |
Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
33 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
31 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
28 |
Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
26 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
24 |
Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
22 |
Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
21 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1912 |
Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 |
Order |
|
ORDER denying [61] Novell's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment without Prejudice to being renewed after discovery on the issues has been completed. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/28/08. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(mcb, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1911 |
Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Conference Call Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1910 |
Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 |
Order on Motion to Compel |
|
ORDER granting (64) Motion to Compel in case 1:05-cv-01087-JFM; granting (1905) Motion to Compel in case 1:00-md-01332-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/26/08 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1909 |
Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 |
Motion to Seal |
|
MOTION to Seal Opposition to Novell's Motion for Summary Judgment by Microsoft Corporation Responses due by 9/8/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1908 |
Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 |
~Notice (other) |
|
NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Filing of Opposition to Novell's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Webb, G) (Sealed Documents rec'd in paper format 8/22/08) Modified on 8/26/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/4/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1907 |
Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 |
Sealed Document + |
|
Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1906 |
Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 |
Response |
|
RESPONSE re (1904 in 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 67 in 1:05-cv-01087-JFM) Notice (Other) by Microsoft Corporation re Motion to Compel Rule 104.7 Certificate filed by Novell, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1905 |
Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008, Terminated: 8/26/2008 |
Motion to Compel |
|
MOTION to Compel by Microsoft Corporation Responses due by 8/25/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Supporting Memorandum, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1904 |
Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 |
~Notice (other) |
|
NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re (64 in 1:05-cv-01087-JFM) MOTION to Compel Rule 104.7 Certificate (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1903 |
Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 |
Reply to Response to Motion |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re (64 in 1:05-cv-01087-JFM) MOTION to Compel filed by Microsoft Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1902 |
Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re (64 in 1:05-cv-01087-JFM) MOTION to Compel filed by Novell, Inc.. Replies due by 8/22/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1901 |
Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION re Briefing Schedule by Microsoft Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1900 |
Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 |
Order on Motion For Leave to File. |
|
PAPERLESS ORDER granting (60) Motion by Novell for Leave to File its motion for summary judgment in case 1:05-cv-01087-JFM under seal; granting (1898) Motion by Novell for Leave to File its motion for summary judgment under seal in case 1:00-md-01332-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/21/08 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1899 |
Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 |
~Notice (other) |
|
NOTICE by Novell, Inc. of Filing of Documents Under Seal Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Johnson, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2008: # (1) Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment, # (2) Sealed Memorandum in Support, # (3) Text of Proposed Order, # (4) Sealed Appendix of Exhibits, # (5) Sealed Exhibit 1, # (6) Sealed Exhibit 2, # (7) Sealed Exhibit 3, # (8) Sealed Exhibit 4, # (9) Sealed Exhibit 5, # (10) Sealed Exhibit 6, # (11) Sealed Exhibit 7, # (12) Sealed Exhibit 8, # (13) Sealed Exhibit 9, # (14) Sealed Exhibit 10) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2008: # (15) Sealed Exhibit 11, # (16) Sealed Exhibit 12, # (17) Sealed Exhibit 13, # (18) Sealed Exhibit 14, # (19) Sealed Exhibit 15, # (20) Sealed Exhibit 16, # (21) Sealed Exhibit 17, # (22) Sealed Exhibit 18, # (23) Sealed Exhibit 19, # (24) Sealed Exhibit 20, # (25) Sealed Exhibit 21, # (26) Sealed Exhibit 22) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 8/19/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1898 |
Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 |
Motion for Leave to File |
|
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Novell, Inc. Responses due by 8/1/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1897 |
Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 |
Reply to Response to Motion |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re (1892 in 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 53 in 1:05-cv-01087-JFM) MOTION for Other Relief Seeking Collateral Estoppel filed by Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Appendix A)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1896 |
Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 |
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp |
|
Paperless ORDER granting [1895] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/14/08. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1895 |
Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008, Terminated: 5/14/2008 |
Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Novell, Inc. Responses due by 6/2/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1894 |
Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re [1892] MOTION for Other Relief Seeking Collateral Estoppel filed by Microsoft Corporation. Replies due by 5/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1893 |
Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 |
Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 5/12/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1892 |
Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 |
Motion for Other Relief |
|
MOTION for Other Relief Seeking Collateral Estoppel by Novell, Inc. Responses due by 4/28/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Appendix A, # (4) Appendix B, # (5) Appendix C, # (6) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1891 |
Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 |
Order |
|
ORDER AMENDING the Protective Order. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/12/08Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1890 |
Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 |
Scheduling Order |
|
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/21/2009. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/5/08Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1889 |
Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1888 |
Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 |
Order |
|
ORDER re: Protective Order. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/31/08 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-01087-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1887 |
Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Proposed Order (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1886 |
Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by John A Jurata, Jr on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:07-cv-02851-JFM(Jurata, John)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1885 |
Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 |
Status Report |
|
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) Re Scheduling Order by Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1884 |
Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Conference Call (Novell, Inc. v. Microsoft Corp. JFM-05-1087)) (Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1883 |
Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 |
Request for Hearing/Trial date |
|
Request for Hearing/Trial Letter To Judge Motz Requesting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:07-cv-02851-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1882 |
Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 |
Request for Hearing |
|
Request for Hearing re (34 in 1:07-cv-02851-JFM) MOTION to Dismiss Claims. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:07-cv-02851-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1881 |
Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 |
USCA Mandate |
|
MANDATE of USCA as to [1864] Notice of Appeal filed by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1879 |
Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Samson on behalf of Daisy Mountain Fire District (Samson, Mark)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1880 |
Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 |
USCA Mandate |
|
MANDATE of USCA as to [1776] Notice of Appeal filed by Novell, Inc. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1878 |
Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 |
Order |
|
CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER No. 31 from the MDL Panel transferring this case from the District of Arizona to the District of Maryland (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1877 |
Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 |
USCA Judgment |
|
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) "Affirming" the judgment of the district court as to [1776] Notice of Appeal filed by Novell, Inc. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1876 |
Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 |
~Notice (other) |
|
NOTICE by Aubrey Bernard of Firm Name Change (Rosen, Henry)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1875 |
Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007, Terminated: 12/12/2007 |
Certificate of Clerk |
|
Certificate of Clerk certifying the record is complete for appeal purposes re: [1864] Notice of Appeal (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1874 |
Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 |
Judgment* |
|
FINAL JUDGMENT Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/9/07 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:04-cv-03705-JFM, City and County of San Francisco, et al v Microsoft(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1873 |
Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 |
Order |
|
ORDER CERTIFYING Settlement Class and Approving Settlement. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/9/07 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:04-cv-03705-JFM City and County of San Francisco, et al v Microsoft(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1872 |
Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 |
~Motion for Settlement |
|
MOTION for Settlement Approval and Unconditional Certification of Class [Memorandum of Points and Authorities] by City and County of San Francisco, County of Santa Clara, County of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, County of San Mateo, County of Contra Costa. Responses due by 1/29/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Andrew Novak# (2) Affidavit Tiffaney Allen# (3) Exhibit Final Judgment# (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Crew, Eugene)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1871 |
Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER APPROVING Stipulation of Dismissal in JFM-00-2445 Brems, P.C. v Microsoft Corp. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/20/06Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:00-cv-02445-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
-- |
Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 |
USCA Case Number |
|
USCA Case Number 06-2278 for [1864] Notice of Appeal filed by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. Case Manager - Merlene Smith-Taylor (sls, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1870 |
Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER DISMISSING JFM-00-1242 Cox, et al v Microsoft without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/4/06 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:00-cv-01242-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1869 |
Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Cancellation of Monthly Conference Call (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
-- |
Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 |
USCA Appeal Fees |
|
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 14637012828 re [1864] Notice of Appeal filed by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1868 |
Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006, Terminated: 12/12/2007 |
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet |
|
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [1864] Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1864 |
Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006, Terminated: 12/12/2007 |
Notice of Appeal |
|
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [1858] Judgment, [1860] Order, by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. Filing fee $ 1. Appeal Record due by 12/27/2006. (Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1863 |
Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER DIRECTING that Plaintiff Show Cause on or before November 29, 2006 as to why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/14/06Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:00-cv-01242-JFM Cox, et al v Microsoft(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1862 |
Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 |
Remark |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before the Court on October 30, 2006 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1861 |
Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 |
Stipulation and Order |
|
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice in JFM-00-1249 DeJulius v Microsoft. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/31/06 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:00-cv-01249-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1860 |
Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-05-2413 RESCINDING the paperless order entered by this court on October 12, 2006 granting plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/30/06 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1859 |
Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Cancellation of Monthly Call (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1858 |
Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 |
Judgment* |
|
FINAL JUDGMENT in JFM-05-2413 in favor of Microsoft Corporation against GO Computer, Inc. and S. Jerrold Kaplan. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/30/06Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1857 |
Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Conference Call Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1856 |
Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re [1854] MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan.Replies due by 11/9/2006. (Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1855 |
Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 |
Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment |
|
MOTION to Alter/Amend Judgment or Enter Judgment by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 11/13/2006 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1854 |
Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 |
Motion to Shorten Time |
|
MOTION to Shorten Time by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 11/13/2006 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1853 |
Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 |
Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment |
|
MOTION to Alter/Amend Judgment or Enter Judgment (Proposed Final Judgment) by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 11/13/2006 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1852 |
Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 |
Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment |
|
MOTION to Alter/Amend Judgment or Enter Judgment (Supporting Memorandum) by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 11/13/2006 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1850 |
Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Motion to Enter Judgment, etc. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1849 |
Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Requesting Court to enter Microsoft's proposed Final Judgment Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1848 |
Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Second Correspondence re: Defendant's Proposed Additional Order (Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1847 |
Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 |
Substantive legal issues - addressing |
|
Substantive legal issues - addressing Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1846 |
Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Defendant's proposed additional order (Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1845 |
Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: attached proposed Final Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit proposed Final Judgment)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1844 |
Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 |
Stipulation and Order |
|
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL in 1:00-cv-01263-JFM Pryor v Microsoft. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/16/06Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:00-cv-01263-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1843 |
Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 |
Order |
|
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING (60 in 1:05-cv-02413-JFM)and (1842 in 1:00-md-01332-JFM) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/12/06 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1842 |
Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal |
|
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan (Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1841 |
Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 |
Order on Motion for Reconsideration |
|
ORDER granting (55) Motion by plaintiff for Reconsideration in case 1:05-cv-02413-JFM; granting (1824) Motion of plaintiff for Reconsideration in case 1:00-md-01332-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/11/06 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1840 |
Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 |
Memorandum Opinion |
|
MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/11/06. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:05-cv-02413-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1839 |
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER APPROVING 1:06-cv-01026-JFM Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Tangent Computer Inc. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/29/06. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:06-cv-01026-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1838 |
Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Rescheduling of Conference Call (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1837 |
Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 |
Order |
|
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL in case 00-2146 without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/25/06. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1836 |
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER DIRECTING that the stay is lifted and dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/18/06 Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:00-cv-01608-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1835 |
Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER DISMISSING this action Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/18/06. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01332-JFM, 1:00-cv-01250-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1834 |
Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 |
Request for Conference |
|
Request for Conference (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1833 |
Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER APPROVING Stipulation of Counsel re: paragraph 12 of the Order conditionally certifying settlement class and granting preliminary approval of class action settlement. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/21/06(cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1832 |
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 |
Order |
|
AMENDED ORDER in JFM-04-3705 conditionally certifying settlement class and granting preliminary approval of class action settlement (entered nunc pro tunc). Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/21/06. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1831 |
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Amended Order Conditionally Certifying Settlement Class and Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1830 |
Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Proposed Amended Order (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1829 |
Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 |
Response in Support of Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Support re [1824] MOTION for Reconsideration re [1817] Memorandum Opinion filed by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. Replies due by 9/1/2006. (Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1828 |
Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence relating to document 1827 - status report submitted by Microsoft. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
1827 |
Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 |
Status Report Submitted |
|
Status Report Submitted by Microsoft Corporation (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1826 |
Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re [1824] MOTION for Reconsideration re [1817] Memorandum Opinion filed by Microsoft Corporation. Replies due by 8/18/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1825 |
Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Conference Call rescheduling (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1824 |
Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006, Terminated: 10/11/2006 |
Motion for Reconsideration |
|
MOTION for Reconsideration re [1817] Memorandum Opinion by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. Responses due by 8/4/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Steven Benz# (2) Declaration of E. Crew# (3) Declaration of S. Jerrold Kaplan)(Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1823 |
Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 |
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief |
|
PAPERLESS ORDER granting [1815] Motion to seal Appendix B to the Settlement Agreement until one business day after the Opt-Out Date, as defined in the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/11/06 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1822 |
Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-04-3705 Conditionally Certifying Settlement Class and Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/7/06. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1821 |
Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 |
Notice of Change of Address |
|
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey M Johnson (Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1820 |
Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Monthly Conference Call rescheduled (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1819 |
Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 |
Order on Motion to Stay |
|
ORDER denying [1759] Motion of Plaintiffs to Stay Proceedings Pending State-Court Litigation or, In the Alternative, for an Order Coordinating Discovery with Plaintiffs' State Court Action. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/30/06. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1818 |
Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-05-2413 (1) grants summary judgment in favor of Microsoft as to all claims other than the claims based upon antitrust injuries allegedly suffered by Lucent Technologies, Inc., in its own right as an alleged competitor of Microsoft as a result of Microsoft?s alleged violations of the federal antitrust laws ("the direct Lucent claims"); (2) strikes plaintiff?s allegations in the Amended Complaint concerning the "direct Lucent" claims; and (3) dismisses the "direct Lucent" claims without prejudice.. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/29/06. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1817 |
Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 |
Memorandum Opinion |
|
OPINION in JFM-05-2413. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/29/06. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1816 |
Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 |
Motion to Amend/Correct |
|
MOTION to Amend/Correct [1811] MOTION for Settlement Approval and Conditional Certification of Class to Attach Text of Proposed Order by City and County of San Francisco, County of Santa Clara, County of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, County of San Mateo, County of Contra Costa. Responses due by 7/14/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Crew, Eugene)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1815 |
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006, Terminated: 7/11/2006 |
Motion for Miscellaneous Relief |
|
MOTION for leave to file Appendix to Settlement Agreement under Seal re [1811] MOTION for Settlement Approval and Conditional Certification of Class by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 7/13/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Notice of Materials submitted under Seal)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1814 |
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 |
Affidavit |
|
AFFIDAVIT re [1811] MOTION for Settlement Approval and Conditional Certification of Class of Brian Rosewarne by City and County of San Francisco, County of Santa Clara, County of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, County of San Mateo, County of Contra Costa. (Crew, Eugene)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1813 |
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 |
Affidavit |
|
AFFIDAVIT re [1811] MOTION for Settlement Approval and Conditional Certification of Class of Andrew Novak by City and County of San Francisco, County of Santa Clara, County of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, County of San Mateo, County of Contra Costa. (Crew, Eugene)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1812 |
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 |
Memorandum |
|
Memorandum re [1811] MOTION for Settlement Approval and Conditional Certification of Class filed by City and County of San Francisco, County of Santa Clara, County of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, County of San Mateo, County of Contra Costa. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Crew, Eugene)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1811 |
Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 |
~Motion for Settlement |
|
MOTION for Settlement Approval and Conditional Certification of Class by City and County of San Francisco, County of Santa Clara, County of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, County of San Mateo, County of Contra Costa. Responses due by 7/13/2006 (Crew, Eugene)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1810 |
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION of Counsel for extension of time to respond to Complaint by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1809 |
Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Conference call cancelled (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1808 |
Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving re [1807] Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/16/06. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1807 |
Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION Extending Time for Response to Tangent Computer Complaint by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1806 |
Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 |
USCA Mandate |
|
MANDATE of USCA as to [1570] Notice of Appeal,, filed by Blaine Cox,, Debra Cunningham,, Elizabeth Strickland,, Rene Gonzalez,, Eric Ferrell,, Clay Tyler,, Peter Haklar,, Franklin L DeJulius,, Paul A Deiter,, Eric S Lazarus,, Gary Leach,, Jay S Quigley,, John W Redmann,, Harold A Phillips,, John Glase,, Johanna M McWhinney,, Carl C Conrad,, Rinaldo Veltri,, Linda Dameron Kloth,, Thomas McCaleb,, Vicki McCaleb,, Gale Ruffin,, Paul L Howard,, James Woods,, Leyton T Brown, (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1805 |
Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 |
USCA Order |
|
ORDER of USCA "Awarding" Appellee $292.00 in costs as to [1570] Notice of Appeal,, filed by Blaine Cox,, Debra Cunningham,, Elizabeth Strickland,, Rene Gonzalez,, Eric Ferrell,, Clay Tyler,, Peter Haklar,, Franklin L DeJulius,, Paul A Deiter,, Eric S Lazarus,, Gary Leach,, Jay S Quigley,, John W Redmann,, Harold A Phillips,, John Glase,, Johanna M McWhinney,, Carl C Conrad,, Rinaldo Veltri,, Linda Dameron Kloth,, Thomas McCaleb,, Vicki McCaleb,, Gale Ruffin,, Paul L Howard,, James Woods,, Leyton T Brown, (Attachments: # (1))(nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1804 |
Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving re [1802] Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/2/06. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1803 |
Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Conference Call rescheduling (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1802 |
Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1801 |
Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 |
Request for Extension of Time to File |
|
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1800 |
Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 |
Memorandum |
|
Memorandum re [1742] MOTION to Dismiss Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit April 2005 Assignment)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1799 |
Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Corrected Correspondence re: reply brief. (signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1798 |
Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 |
Order |
|
CTO ORDER No. 30 from the MDL Panel transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1797 |
Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence regarding reply brief. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1796 |
Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 |
Memorandum |
|
Memorandum re [1742] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Supplemental Memorandum filed by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. (Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1795 |
Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 |
USCA Judgment |
|
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) "Affirming" the judgment of the District Court as to [1570] Notice of Appeal,, filed by Blaine Cox,, Debra Cunningham,, Elizabeth Strickland,, Rene Gonzalez,, Eric Ferrell,, Clay Tyler,, Peter Haklar,, Franklin L DeJulius,, Paul A Deiter,, Eric S Lazarus,, Gary Leach,, Jay S Quigley,, John W Redmann,, Harold A Phillips,, John Glase,, Johanna M McWhinney,, Carl C Conrad,, Rinaldo Veltri,, Linda Dameron Kloth,, Thomas McCaleb,, Vicki McCaleb,, Gale Ruffin,, Paul L Howard,, James Woods,, Leyton T Brown, (Attachments: # (1))(nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1794 |
Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1793 |
Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 |
Request for Extension of Time to File |
|
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1792 |
Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 |
Response |
|
RESPONSE re [1764] Reply to Response to Motion,, [1751] Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, [1742] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jessica Pers# (2) Exhibit A to Pers Declaration# (3) Exhibit B to Pers Declaration# (4) Exhibit C to Pers Declaration# (5) Exhibit D to Pers Declaration)(DeVinne, Michael)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1791 |
Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving extension of time within which plaintiffs may file an amended complaint made in re [1789] Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/4/06. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1790 |
Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 |
Remark |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 17, 2006 before Judge Motz (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1789 |
Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1788 |
Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 |
Request for Extension of Time to File |
|
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1787 |
Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K Kellogg on behalf of Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan (Kellogg, Michael)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1786 |
Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 |
Certificate of Clerk |
|
Certificate of Clerk certifying the record is complete for appeal purposes re: [1776] Notice of Appeal (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1785 |
Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Chatham Crew on behalf of Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan (Crew, Eugene)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1784 |
Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 |
USCA Mandate |
|
MANDATE of USCA as to [1377] Notice of Appeal filed by Franklin L DeJulius,, Paul A Deiter,, Gary Leach, (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1783 |
Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 |
USCA Order |
|
ORDER of USCA "Consolidating" cases 05-cv-1087 and 00-md-1332 for purposes of briefing and oral argument as therein set forth as to [1776] Notice of Appeal filed by Novell, Inc., (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
-- |
Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 |
USCA Case Number |
|
USCA Case Number 06-1238 for [1776] Notice of Appeal filed by Novell, Inc.,. Case Manager - Merlene Smith-Taylor (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1782 |
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER APPROVING [1781] Notice filed by National Plaintiffs' Counsel, for withdrawal of appearance of Price O. Gielen. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/28/06 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1781 |
Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 |
~Notice (other) |
|
NOTICE by National Plaintiffs' Counsel to Withdraw Appearance (Gielen, Price)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1780 |
Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 |
Response in Support of Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Support re [1759] MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending State-Court Litigation or, In the Alternative, for an Order Coordinating Discovery with Plaintiffs' State Court Action filed by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. Replies due by 3/13/2006. (Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1779 |
Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1778 |
Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 |
Request for Extension of Time to File |
|
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1777 |
Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 |
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet |
|
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [1776] Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
-- |
Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 |
USCA Appeal Fees |
|
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 255 receipt number 1463707454 re [1776] Notice of Appeal filed by Novell, Inc., (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1776 |
Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 |
Notice of Appeal |
|
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [1770] Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), [1655] Order by Novell, Inc.. Filing fee $ 255. Appeal Record due by 3/23/2006. (Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1775 |
Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-00-1605 Glase, et al v Microsoft APPROVING [1774] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Microsoft Corporation Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/16/06. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1774 |
Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1772 |
Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re [1759] MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending State-Court Litigation or, In the Alternative, for an Order Coordinating Discovery with Plaintiffs' State Court Action Memorandum in Opposition filed by Microsoft Corporation. Replies due by 2/27/2006. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1771 |
Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re [1759] MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending State-Court Litigation or, In the Alternative, for an Order Coordinating Discovery with Plaintiffs' State Court Action filed by Microsoft Corporation. Replies due by 2/27/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Jessica S. Pers# (2) Exhibit A of Pers Declaration# (3) Exhibit B of Pers Declaration# (4) Exhibit C of Pers Declaration# (5) Exhibit D of Pers Declaration# (6) Exhibit E of Pers Declaration)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1770 |
Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 |
Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 5 |
|
ORDER in JFM-05-1087 Novell, Inc. v Microsoft Corporation granting [1769] Motion by Novell for Entry of a Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) as to Counts II, III, IV and V of Novell's Complant. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/13/06 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1773 |
Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 |
Remark |
|
Filing Fee received for Appeal USCA case No# 06-1134 (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1769 |
Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006, Terminated: 2/13/2006 |
~Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) |
|
MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Novell, Inc.. Responses due by 2/27/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Memorandum in Support and Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1768 |
Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 |
USCA Judgment |
|
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) "Affirming" the judgment of the District Court as to [1377] Notice of Appeal filed by Franklin L DeJulius,, Paul A Deiter,, Gary Leach,, [1376] Notice of Appeal filed by Franklin L DeJulius,, Paul A Deiter,, Gary Leach, (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1767 |
Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1766 |
Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence confirming the hearing date in Go Computer v. Microsoft - JFM-05-2413. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1765 |
Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Call-in information for conference call (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1764 |
Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 |
Reply to Response to Motion |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re [1763] Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief, [1742] MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declartion of Jessica Pers# (2) Exhibit KK to Pers Declaration# (3) Exhibit LL to Pers Declaration# (4) Exhibit MM to Pers Declaration# (5) Exhibit NN to Pers Declaration)(DeVinne, Michael)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1763 |
Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 |
Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages |
|
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/17/2006 (DeVinne, Michael)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1762 |
Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving re [1760] Request for Extension of Time to File filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/30/06. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1761 |
Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1760 |
Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 |
Request for Extension of Time to File |
|
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1759 |
Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006, Terminated: 6/30/2006 |
Motion to Stay |
|
MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending State-Court Litigation or, In the Alternative, for an Order Coordinating Discovery with Plaintiffs' State Court Action by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. Responses due by 2/13/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay# (2) Declaration of Steven F. Benz# (3) Exhibit A to Benz Declaration# (4) Exhibit B to Benz Declaration# (5) Exhibit C to Benz Declaration# (6) Exhibit D to Benz Declaration)(Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1758 |
Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 |
USCA Mandate |
|
MANDATE of USCA as to [1571] Notice of Appeal (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1757 |
Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 |
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief |
|
ORDER granting in part and denying in part [1705] Request of plaintiff to lift stay and transfer; directing counsel to report to the court on or before 2/3/06 as to how they wish to proceed further in this action. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/4/06. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1756 |
Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving [1755] Stipulation Re Briefing Schedule filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/4/06. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1755 |
Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1754 |
Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-05-1277 Walsh v Microsoft Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/29/05 (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1753 |
Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 |
Memorandum Opinion |
|
MEMORANDUM in JFM-05-1277 Walsh v Microsoft Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/29/05. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1752 |
Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 |
USCA Judgment |
|
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy)"Affirming" the judgment of the District Court as to [1571] Notice of Appeal (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1751 |
Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re [1742] MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. Replies due by 1/6/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Steven F. Benz# (2) Exhibit A.1# (3) Exhibit A.2# (4) Exhibit A.3# (5) Exhibit A.4# (6) Exhibit A.5# (7) Kaplan Declaration# (8) Exhibit B.1# (9) Exhibit B.2# (10) Exhibit B.3# (11) Exhibit B.4# (12) Exhibit B.5# (13) Exhibit B.6# (14) Exhibit B.7# (15) Exhibit B.8# (16) Exhibit B.9# (17) Exhibit B.10# (18) Exhibit B.11# (19) Exhibit B.12# (20) Exhibit B.13# (21) Exhibit B.14# (22) Exhibit B.15# (23) Exhibit B.16# (24) Exhibit B.17# (25) Exhibit B.18# (26) Exhibit B.19# (27) Exhibit B.20# (28) Exhibit B.21# (29) Exhibit B.22# (30) Exhibit Exhibit B.23# (31) Titus Declaration# (32) Exhibit Exhibit C.1# (33) Exhibit C.2# (34) Exhibit C.3# (35) Exhibit C.4# (36) Warren Declaration)(Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1750 |
Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving request for an extension of time until January 31, 2006 within which plaintiffs may file an amended complaint made in re [1749] Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/22/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1749 |
Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1748 |
Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 |
Request for Extension of Time to File |
|
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1747 |
Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: 12/7/05 Conference call cancelled (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1746 |
Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice and Approval in JFM-00-1265 Kloth v Microsoft signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz 11/18/05. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1745 |
Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Kloth et al. v. Microsoft, No. 00-1265 by Microsoft Corporation. (Sergent, Randolph)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1744 |
Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving re [1743] Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation, Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/16/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1743 |
Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION re [1742] MOTION to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan, Microsoft Corporation. (Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1742 |
Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005, Terminated: 6/29/2006 |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
MOTION to Dismiss by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 11/21/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Supporting Memorandum# (2) Affidavit of Jessica Pers# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Exhibit D# (7) Exhibit E# (8) Exhibit F# (9) Exhibit G# (10) Exhibit H# (11) Exhibit I# (12) Exhibit J# (13) Exhibit K# (14) Exhibit L# (15) Exhibit M# (16) Exhibit N# (17) Exhibit O# (18) Exhibit P# (19) Exhibit Q# (20) Exhibit R# (21) Exhibit S# (22) Exhibit T# (23) Exhibit U# (24) Exhibit V# (25) Exhibit W# (26) Exhibit X# (27) Exhibit Y# (28) Exhibit Z# (29) Exhibit AA# (30) Exhibit BB# (31) Exhibit CC# (32) Exhibit DD# (33) Exhibit EE# (34) Exhibit FF# (35) Exhibit GG# (36) Exhibit HH# (37) Exhibit II# (38) Exhibit JJ)(Sergent, Randolph)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1741 |
Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 |
Remark |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before the Court on 10/27/05 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1740 |
Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-05-1608 Mark v Microsoft GRANTING Motion by Microsoft to Dismiss Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/2/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1739 |
Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 |
Memorandum Opinion |
|
MEMORANDUM in JFM-05-1608 Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/2/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1738 |
Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-05-1087 Novell v Microsoft APPROVING the parties request to postpone further discovery. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/1/05 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1737 |
Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER denying National Plaintiffs' Counsel's Motion for Attorneys' Fees-document [1575]. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/27/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1736 |
Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER APPROVING [1734] Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Realnetworks, Inc. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/20/05 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1735 |
Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re [1705] MOTION request to lift stay and transfer in O'Neill case filed by Microsoft Corporation. Replies due by 11/1/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Webb Affidavit)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1734 |
Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and [Proposed] Order by Realnetworks, Inc.. (Olson, Eric)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1733 |
Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving the schedule proposed in re [1732] Miscellaneous Correspondence. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/12/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1732 |
Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Microsoft's Response to O'Neill's Request to Lift Stay and Transfer (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1731 |
Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Price O Gielen on behalf of National Plaintiffs' Counsel (Gielen, Price)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1730 |
Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving re [1729] Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/11/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
1729 |
Filed: 10/10/2005, Entered: 10/10/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1728 |
Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION Re: Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan, Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1727 |
Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving re [1726] Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation and City and County of San Francisco that the time within which plaintiffs may file an amended complaint is extended through and until December 30, 2005. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/3/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1726 |
Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION of Counsel by City and County of San Francisco, Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1725 |
Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 |
Amended Complaint |
|
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation, filed by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. (Attachments: # (1) Redline Comparison)(Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1724 |
Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: conference call details for telephone hearing in JFM 04-968 (Sergent, Randolph)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1723 |
Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: 30(b)(6) deposition notice by RealNetworks, in JFM 04-968 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Sergent, Randolph)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1722 |
Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 |
Response in Opposition |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition to Microsoft Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Go Computer, Inc., S. Jerrold Kaplan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Proposed Order)(Benz, Steven)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1721 |
Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 |
~Notice (other) |
|
NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re [1709] MOTION to Dismiss the Cheeseman Action and to Recover its Costs Incurred in Bringing this Motion -Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Sergent, Randolph)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1720 |
Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sara Cheeseman. (Perkinson, Jacob)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1719 |
Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 |
Reply to Response to Motion |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re [1709] MOTION to Dismiss the Cheeseman Action and to Recover its Costs Incurred in Bringing this Motion filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Sergent, Randolph)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1718 |
Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005, Terminated: 6/29/2006 |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in GO Computer v. Microsoft (05-2413) by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 9/26/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support# (2) Affidavit of Jessica Pers# (3) Exhibit A to Pers Declaration# (4) Exhibit B to Pers Decl.# (5) Exhibit C to Pers Decl.# (6) Exhibit D to Pers Decl# (7) Exhibit E to Pers Decl.# (8) Exhibit F to Pers Decl.# (9) Exhibit G to Pers Decl.# (10) Exhibit H to Pers Decl.# (11) Exhibit I to Pers Decl.# (12) Exhibit J to Pers Decl.# (13) Exhibit K to Pers Decl.# (14) Exhibit L to Pers Decl.# (15) Exhibit M to Pers Decl.# (16) Exhibit N to Pers Decl.)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1717 |
Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 |
Order |
|
CTO ORDER No. 27 from the MDL Panel transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland (cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1716 |
Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re [1709] MOTION to Dismiss the Cheeseman Action and to Recover its Costs Incurred in Bringing this Motion filed by Sara Cheeseman. Replies due by 9/14/2005. (Perkinson, Jacob)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1715 |
Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-00-2441 Ray v Microsoft APPROVING Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/30/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1714 |
Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-00-1252 To the Rescue Comprehensive Computer Services v Microsoft APPROVING Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/30/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1713 |
Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Daniel C Ray, Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1712 |
Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Microsoft Corporation, To The Rescue Comprehensive Computer Services. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1711 |
Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-00-1268 Davenport v Microsoft APPROVING Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/24/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1710 |
Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 |
Affidavit |
|
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Randolph S. Sergent re: Microsoft's Motion to Dismiss the Cheeseman Action by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1709 |
Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
MOTION to Dismiss the Cheeseman Action and to Recover its Costs Incurred in Bringing this Motion by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 9/12/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Microsoft's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1708 |
Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Denise Davenport, Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
-- |
Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 |
~Notice (other) |
|
NOTICE of Transmission and Docket Sheet to the Fourth Circuit in re [1706] Memorandum Opinion, [1707] Order (ko, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1707 |
Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-05-1087 Novell, Inc. v Microsoft Certifying rulings to the Fourth Circuit for it to determine whether an interlocutory appeal should be taken Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/19/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1706 |
Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 |
Memorandum Opinion |
|
MEMORANDUM OPINION in JFM-05-1087 Novell v Microsoft Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/19/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1705 |
Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005, Terminated: 1/4/2006 |
Motion for Miscellaneous Relief |
|
MOTION request to lift stay and transfer by Matthew W O'Neill. Responses due by 9/1/2005 (Barnow, Ben)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1704 |
Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal in JFM-00-1602 Klein v Microsoft signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz 8/15/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1703 |
Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER approving re [1700] Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation, and City and County of San Francisco to extend the time for plaintiffs to file an amended complaint through and until October 3, 2005. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/15/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1702 |
Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Novell's restatement of its position regarding appellate issue (Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1701 |
Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Idy Klein, Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1700 |
Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION of Counsel by City and County of San Francisco, Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1699 |
Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 |
Order |
|
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING [1698] Stipulation of Dismissal in JFM-00-2137 O'Sullivan, Hicks & Patton LLP v Microsoft Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/4/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1698 |
Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by O'Sullivan Hicks and Patton LLP, Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1697 |
Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 |
Order |
|
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING [1695] Stipulation of Dismissal in JFM-00-2138 Conrad v Microsoft Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/3/05. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1696 |
Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Conference Call Agenda (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1695 |
Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 |
Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Carl C Conrad, Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1694 |
Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 |
Remark |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before the Court on July 18, 2005 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1693 |
Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 |
Remark |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before the Court on 7/6/05 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1692 |
Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 |
Response in Support of Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Support re [1672] MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of the Court's June 10 Ruling to the Extent it Denied Microsoft's Motion to Dismiss (with Supporting Memorandum as Attachment #1) Microsoft's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1292(b) filed by Microsoft Corporation. Replies due by 8/9/2005. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1691 |
Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: corrections to Realnetworks' characterization of meet-and-confer discussions in No. 04-968 (Sergent, Randolph)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1690 |
Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION of Counsel by City and County of San Francisco, Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1689 |
Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER granting re [1678] Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/14/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1688 |
Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER granting re [1686] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Join Parties, Amend Pleadings, and File Dispositive Motions filed by Microsoft Corporation, Realnetworks, Inc. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/14/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1687 |
Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 |
Response in Opposition to Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re [1672] MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of the Court's June 10 Ruling to the Extent it Denied Microsoft's Motion to Dismiss (with Supporting Memorandum as Attachment #1) filed by Novell, Inc.. Replies due by 7/26/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1686 |
Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005, Terminated: 7/14/2005 |
Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery |
|
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Join Parties, Amend Pleadings, and File Dispositive Motions by Realnetworks, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 7/29/2005 (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1685 |
Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5)(Webb, G) Modified on 7/12/2005 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1684 |
Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 |
Notice of service of reply to response to motion t |
|
NOTICE of service of reply to response to motion to compel discovery by Microsoft Corporation (Attachments: # (1))(Blavin, Jonathan)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1683 |
Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: agenda for scheduled July 6 conference (Sergent, Randolph)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1682 |
Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 |
Order |
|
Paperless ORDER granting re [1681] Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/5/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1681 |
Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005, Terminated: 7/5/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION of Counsel re filing amended complaint in City & County of San Francisco v. Microsoft by Microsoft Corporation. (Sergent, Randolph)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1680 |
Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Microsoft's MTD the Complaint in Mark v. Microsoft (recently transferred from the USDC for the District of S. Carolina) (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Exhibits to Opposition to MTD)(Barnow, Ben)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1679 |
Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Ben Barnow on behalf of Michael I Mark (Barnow, Ben)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1678 |
Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005, Terminated: 7/14/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION Re: RealNetworks, Inc. - Stipulated Amendment to Protective Order Regarding Source Code Production by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1677 |
Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Realnetworks, Inc. re [1676] Notice of service of response to motion to compel discovery, (Byars, John)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1676 |
Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 |
Notice of service of response to motion to compel |
|
NOTICE of service of response to motion to compel discovery by Realnetworks, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories# (2) Notice of Filing Under Seal# (3) Declaration of Eric Olson# (4) Exhibit 1 to Declaration# (5) Exhibit 2 to Declaration# (6) Exhibit 3 to Declaration# (7) Exhibit 4 to Declaration)(Byars, John)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1675 |
Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 |
Motion for Leave to File |
|
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal RealNetworks, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories by Realnetworks, Inc.. Responses due by 7/11/2005 (Byars, John)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1674 |
Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 |
Answer |
|
ANSWER to Complaint by Microsoft Corporation.(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1673 |
Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 |
Order |
|
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING [1671] Amended Stipulated Protective Order re: competitive cases incorporating the Novell, Inc. Amendment Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/24/05 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1672 |
Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 |
Motion for Certificate of Appealability |
|
MOTION for Certificate of Appealability of the Court's June 10 Ruling to the Extent it Denied Microsoft's Motion to Dismiss (with Supporting Memorandum as Attachment #1) by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 7/11/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum and Proposed Order# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2)(Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1671 |
Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION Amended Stipulated Protective Order Re Competitor Cases Incorporating the Novell Amendment by Novell, Inc.. (Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1670 |
Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Amended Stipulated Protective Order Re Competitor Cases (Johnson, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1669 |
Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Ted Dane on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Dane, Ted)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1668 |
Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 |
Remark |
|
Transcript of Proceedings held before the Court on June 7, 2005 (Court Report: Zajac) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1667 |
Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 |
Response in Support of Motion |
|
RESPONSE in Support re [1647] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum Specially Appearing In Opposition To National Plaintiffs' Counsel's Motion For Attorney Fees filed by Zelle, Hofmann, Voebel, Mason & Gette LLP. Replies due by 7/5/2005. (McGrath, William)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1666 |
Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley S Phillips on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Phillips, Bradley)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1665 |
Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H Blavin on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Blavin, Jonathan)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1664 |
Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 |
Response to Motion |
|
RESPONSE to Motion re [1647] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum Specially Appearing In Opposition To National Plaintiffs' Counsel's Motion For Attorney Fees and NPC's Request for Oral Argument filed by National Plaintiffs' Counsel. Replies due by 6/28/2005. (Landau, Brent)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1663 |
Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by John David Byars on behalf of Realnetworks, Inc. (Byars, John)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1662 |
Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 |
Order |
|
CTO ORDER #26 transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1661 |
Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 |
Redacted Document |
|
REDACTION to [1656] Notice of service of motion to compel discovery EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Singla, Rohit)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1660 |
Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 |
~Notice (other) |
|
NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (Singla, Rohit)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1659 |
Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Rohit K Singla on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Singla, Rohit)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1658 |
Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel N Weinstein on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Weinstein, Samuel)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1657 |
Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Microsoft Corporation re [1656] Notice of service of motion to compel discovery (Hwang, Hojoon)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1656 |
Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 |
Notice of service of motion to compel discovery |
|
NOTICE of service of motion to compel discovery by Microsoft Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 Motion to Compel# (2) Exhibit 2 Declaration of RKS)(Hwang, Hojoon)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1655 |
Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Microsoft's Motion to Dismiss; Counts II, III, IV, and V are dismissed and Counts I and VI are not dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/10/05. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1654 |
Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 |
Memorandum Opinion |
|
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/10/05. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1653 |
Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 |
Memorandum to Parties |
|
MEMORANDUM to Parties RE: Novell's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/10/05. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1652 |
Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Milton A Marquis on behalf of Novell, Inc. (Marquis, Milton)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1651 |
Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by R Bruce Holcomb on behalf of Novell, Inc. (Holcomb, R)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1650 |
Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-05-474 Peek v Microsoft GRANTING Motion to remand to the Circuit Court for Lonoke County Arkansas Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/3/05. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1649 |
Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 |
Memorandum Opinion |
|
MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/3/05. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1648 |
Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 |
Memorandum |
|
Memorandum re [1645] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Initial Opposition to NPC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Zelle, Hofmann, Voebel, Mason & Gette LLP. (McGrath, William)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1647 |
Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 |
Motion for Leave to File |
|
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum Specially Appearing In Opposition To National Plaintiffs' Counsel's Motion For Attorney Fees by Zelle, Hofmann, Voebel, Mason & Gette LLP. Responses due by 6/20/2005 (McGrath, William)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1646 |
Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 |
Reply to Response to Motion |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re [1615] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to National Plaintiffs' Counsel's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Surreply in Support of Initial Opposition to NPC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Kirby, McInerney & Squire, LLP, Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP, Lieff Cabraser, Heiman & Bernstein, LLP, Heideman Lezell Nudelman & Kalik PC, Kaufman Dickstein & Grunspan PA. (Dansicker, Andrew)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1645 |
Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 |
Motion for Leave to File |
|
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Initial Opposition to NPC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Kirby, McInerney & Squire, LLP, Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP, Lieff Cabraser, Heiman & Bernstein, LLP, Heideman Lezell Nudelman & Kalik PC, Kaufman Dickstein & Grunspan PA. Responses due by 6/20/2005 (Dansicker, Andrew)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1644 |
Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: materials submitted for in camera review. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1643 |
Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Walsh v. Microsoft - Microsoft's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1642 |
Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Correspondence re: Materials submitted for in camera review (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1641 |
Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 |
Stipulation |
|
STIPULATION of Counsel by Microsoft Corporation. (Webb, G)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1640 |
Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 |
Remark |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held before the court on 5/4/05 (Court Reporter: M Zajac) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1639 |
Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 |
Order |
|
CTO ORDER 25 from the MDL Panel transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1638 |
Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 |
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages |
|
Paperless ORDER granting [1636] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/5/05. (Motz, J.)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1637 |
Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 |
Reply to Response to Motion |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re [1615] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to National Plaintiffs' Counsel's Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by National Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Affidavit # (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Exhibit D# (7) Exhibit E# (8) Exhibit F# (9) Exhibit G# (10) Exhibit H# (11) Exhibit I# (12) Exhibit J)(Cormier, Christopher)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1636 |
Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005, Terminated: 5/5/2005 |
Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages |
|
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by National Plaintiffs' Counsel. Responses due by 5/23/2005 (Cormier, Christopher)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1635 |
Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 |
Remark |
|
Transcript of proceedings held before Judge Motz on 4/21/05 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1634 |
Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 |
Order |
|
CTO ORDER from the MDL Panel transferring the attached case to the District of MD (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2005 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1633 |
Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 |
Miscellaneous Correspondence |
|
Joint Correspondence re: source code protective order (Olson, Eric)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1632 |
Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 |
Request for Hearing/Trial date |
|
Request for Hearing/Trial on RealNetworks' Motion to Compel (Olson, Eric)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1631 |
Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 |
Order |
|
ORDER in JFM-04-3705 Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting plaintiffs leave to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/18/05(cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
|
|
 |
|
|