USA v. Socrates Valencia
Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 85-cr-00185
District Judge Herbert Jay Stern, presiding

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States of America

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Hunt Dumont
Space MARIANNE ESPINOSA MURPHY +1 973 622 3000
v.
No Logo Valencia Rojas, Socrates de Jesus, Defendant
Officially listed as "Valencia, Socrates"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Kessler
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 843.F
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/16/1985, Entered: None Judgment and Probation/Commitment Order
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/29/1985, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/29/1985, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/29/1985, Entered: None Notice of Allocation and Assignment
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/29/1985, Entered: None Criminal Information
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/21/1985, Entered: None Letter
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/28/1984, Entered: None Cover Sheet
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 1,275 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?