USA v. Tomas Troncoso, et al
Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 85-cr-00010
District Judge Herbert Jay Stern, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States of America

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Hunt Dumont
Space MARIANNE ESPINOSA MURPHY +1 973 622 3000
v.
No Logo Mancini, Jose, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira D. London +1 212 683 8000 +1 212 683 9422 iradlondon@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GARGIULO & MCMENIMEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J. McMenimen +1 617 482 0600 +1 617 482 0604 bmcmenimen@apslaw.com
No Logo Troncoso, Tomas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira D. London +1 212 683 8000 +1 212 683 9422 iradlondon@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GARGIULO & MCMENIMEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J. McMenimen +1 617 482 0600 +1 617 482 0604 bmcmenimen@apslaw.com
No Logo Valencia Rojas, Socrates de Jesus, Defendant
Officially listed as "Valencia, Socrates"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Kessler
Space Ira D. London +1 212 683 8000 +1 212 683 9422 iradlondon@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GARGIULO & MCMENIMEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J. McMenimen +1 617 482 0600 +1 617 482 0604 bmcmenimen@apslaw.com
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 55 Filed: 12/28/1990, Entered: None Court Filing
MANCINI-Letter from Judge to Deft. indicating there is no pending motion before the Court. filed 12-27-90(Ackerman)
    LREF
    Blank 54 Filed: 9/3/1990, Entered: None
    MANCINI-Update motion to examine Grand Jury Minutes, Disclosure of evidence & Grand Jury Transcripts filed 8-10-90 defaulted.
      LREF
      Blank 53 Filed: 9/3/1990, Entered: None
      TRONOSCO-ORDER, that deft's petition be and hereby is Denied filed 8-3-90(BIssell)
        LREF
        Blank 52 Filed: 9/3/1990, Entered: None
          LREF
          Blank 51 Filed: 9/9/1988, Entered: None
            LREF
            Blank 50 Filed: 3/1/1988, Entered: None
              LREF
              Blank 49 Filed: 2/1/1988, Entered: None
                LREF
                Blank 48 Filed: 2/1/1988, Entered: None
                  LREF
                  Blank 47 Filed: 12/15/1987, Entered: None
                    LREF
                    Blank 46 Filed: 7/10/1987, Entered: None
                      LREF
                      Blank 45 Filed: 11/12/1986, Entered: None
                        LREF
                        Blank 44 Filed: 11/5/1986, Entered: None
                          LREF
                          Blank 43 Filed: 10/21/1986, Entered: None
                            LREF
                            Blank 42 Filed: 10/21/1986, Entered: None
                              LREF
                              Blank 41 Filed: 8/19/1986, Entered: None
                                LREF
                                Blank 40 Filed: 8/19/1986, Entered: None
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 39 Filed: 5/15/1986, Entered: None
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 39 Filed: 5/9/1986, Entered: None
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 37 Filed: 3/6/1986, Entered: None
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 12/10/1985, Entered: None
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 36 Filed: 11/27/1985, Entered: None
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 35 Filed: 11/27/1985, Entered: None
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 34 Filed: 11/27/1985, Entered: None
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 33 Filed: 11/27/1985, Entered: None
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 11/27/1985, Entered: None
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 11/27/1985, Entered: None
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 11/14/1985, Entered: None
                                                      TOMAS TRONCOSO-ORDER denying deft's motion for reduction of sentence, filed 11-12-85. (Stern) n/m
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 10/4/1985, Entered: None
                                                        TOMAS TRONCOSO-Motion of deft. for reduction of sentence, cert. of service, filed 10-2-85. m/c
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 9/10/1985, Entered: None
                                                          JOSE MANCINI-ORDER granting deft. permission to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal; denying deft's motion of appointment of counsel for lack of jurisdiction, filed 9-6-85. (Stern) n/m (Cert. copy to USCA)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/9/1985, Entered: None
                                                            Jose Mancini - RECORD ON APPEAL SENT TO USCA. (USCA 85-5526)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 9/5/1985, Entered: None
                                                              JOSE MANCINI-ORDER denying deft's motion for extension of ime and appointment of CJA counsel, filed 9-4-85. (Stern) n/m
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 8/2/1985, Entered: None
                                                                Copies of NOA sent to USCA, AUSA Andrew Baxter, Esq. deft, USP & USN.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 8/2/1985, Entered: None
                                                                  JOSE MANCINI-Pro se notice of appeal of deft, filed 7-26-85 at 2:30 P.M. (Fee ltr sent) (USCA # 85-5526)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/17/1985, Entered: None
                                                                    SOCRATES VALENCIA-ORDER dismissing indictment 85-10, with leave of the Court granted, filed. (Stern) n/m (Cert copy to USM & USP) (PLEAD GUILTY to info 85-185)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/17/1985, Entered: None
                                                                      JOSE MANCINI-Judgment and commitment ORDER, filed 7-16-85. n/m
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 7/17/1985, Entered: None
                                                                        JOSE MANCINI Hrg. on motion of deft. to strike portions of the presentence report. ORDERED motion DENIED. SENTENCE: Ct 1: 20 yrs Ct 2: 20 yrs to run concurrently with sentence imposed on Ct 1. $100.00 special assessment to be paid. ORDERED deft. remanded (Stern)(7-16-85)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 7/16/1985, Entered: None
                                                                          JOSE MANCINI-Motion of deft. to strike portions of the presentence and incorporated memerandum of law, filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 6/10/1985, Entered: None
                                                                            TOMAS TRONCOSO-Judgment and commitment ORDER, filed. (Stern) n/m
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/10/1985, Entered: None
                                                                              TOMAS TRONCOSO-ORDERED certain portions of transcript sealed until further ORDER of the Court. SENTENCE: Ct. 2: 20 yrs. and mandatory special assessment of $50.00 to be paid forthwith or deft. to stand committed until paid. Court recommends deft. be incarcerated within NY Metropolitan area and he receive immediate psychiatric eval. at an appropriate facility. ORDERED Cts 1 & 3, dismissed. (Stern)(6-7-85)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 6/10/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                TOMAS TRONCOSO-Ltr of Hope M. Hill, PhD. re deft's. psychological eval, filed 6-7-85.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/10/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                  TOMAS TRONCOSO-ORDER directing Warden, MCC in NY, NY, to take whatever precautions necessary to endure deft's personal security, in light of Dr. Hill's statement; arrange for the immediate exam of the deft. by a qualified psychiatrist, psycologist or other trained personnel to make an independent determination of the deft's current mental state, and to further arrange for continuing treatment of the deft. while he is incarcerated at the MCC, filed 6-7-85. (Stern) n/m
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/6/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                    MANCINI-Judgment of Acquital on Ct. 3 of the indictment, filed 6-5-85. (Stern)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/6/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                      MANCINI-Verdict sheet, filed 6-4-85.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 6/6/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                        MANCINI-Jury communication #1, filed 6-4-85.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/5/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                          JOSE MANCINI-Trial continued. Hrg. on appl. of deft. for a directed verdict. ORDERED appl. denied. Verdict: GUILTY on Cts. 1 & 2. NOT GUILTY on Ct. 3. ORDERED jury polled. ORDERED sentence date set for 7-10-85. (Stern)(6-4-85)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/4/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                            JOSE MANCINI-Trial w/jury moved before the Honorable Herbert J. STERN, U.S.D.J. Hrg. on appl. of deft. to dismiss indictment. ORDERED appl. denied. Trial adjourned to 6-4-85. (Stern)(6-3-85)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 6/3/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                              TOMAS TRONCOSO-Ex-Parte ORDER directing that Hope M. Mill, PhD., of 434 W. 120th St., NY,NY 10027, be admitted to the MCC, and is authorized to administer psychological diagnostic tests to the deft. (Stern)(5-29-85) n/m
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/29/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                JOSE MANCINI-Hrg. on deft's motions to suppress II and III. ORDERED motion to suppress II denied. ORDERED motion to suppress III granted. Counsel voluntarily withdrew motions to suppress I & IV. ORDERED trial date set for 6-3-85. (Stern)(5-29-85)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 4/15/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                  TOMAS TRONCOSO-Plea agreement, filed 4-12-85.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 4/15/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                    TOMAS TRONCOSO-Def. retracted Not Guilty plea. Plea: GUILTY to Count 2 Ordered sentence date for May 29, 1985. Ordered def. remanded. (Stern) (4-12-85)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/10/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                      TOMASO TRONCOSO-Status Con. Motion to suppress scheduled for 4-12-85. (Stern) (4-8-85)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/9/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                        JOSE MANCINI - Motion of def. for Omnibus relief re discovery, bill of particulars, severance, suppression, etc., and certificate of service, filed 4-8-85. (Brief submitted)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/26/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                          JOSE MANCINI - Plea - Not guilty to superceding indictment. Ordered trial date set for 5-29-85 at 10:00 a.m. Ordered bail continued. (Stern) (3-25-85)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 3/26/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SOCRATES VALENCIA - Plea - Not guilty to superseding indictment. Ordered trial date set for 5-29-85 at 10:00 a.m. Ordered bail continued. (Stern) (5-25-85)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 3/26/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                              TOMAS TRONCOSO - Plea - Not Guilty to superseding indictment. Ordered trial date set for 5-29-85 at 10:00 a.m. (Stern) (3-25-85)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/15/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                JOSE MANCINI - Record of Rule 40 Proceedings before U.S. Magistrate in the Southern District of Florida consisting of the following papers filed. Order and advice to deft. and commitment order setting removal hearing for 2-22-85 & Notice of appearance. Order on bond motion, fld. Copy of warrant from Dist. of N.J. Warrant of Removal. Magistrate's Docket Sheet, fld.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/15/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  THOMAS TRONCOSO - Motion of deft. to supress, fld. 2-8-85. (No Brief)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/15/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    THOMAS TRONCOSO - Motion of deft. to preserve and produce Handwritten notes, fld. 2-8-85. (No Brief)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/15/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      TOMAS TRONCOSO, etal - Notice of allocation & assignment fixing 2-26-85 at 10:00am for arriagnment filed.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/15/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        TOMAS TRONCOSO, etal - SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/15/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SOCRATES VALENCIA - Order substituting Michael S. Kessler as attorney for deft., fld. 2-13-85 (Stern) N/M
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/24/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SOCRATES VALENCIZ - Plea: Not Guilty Ordered trial date set for 3-13-85. Ordered bail continued and deft. remanded. (Stern) (1-23-85)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/24/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              TOMAS TRONCOSO Plea - Not Guilty
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/11/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                TOMAS TRONCOSO, etal - Notice of allocation & assignment fixing 1-23-85 at 10:00am for arraignment filed.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/11/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  TOMAS TRONCOSO, etal - INDICTMENT FILED.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/10/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Commitments returned, filed and executed.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 1/2/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Bail Hearing scheduled for Jan. 8, 1985.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 1/2/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Commitment issued.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 1/2/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Defendant held without bail on defendants own request.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/1985, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Complaint filed.
                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 409 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?