Liu v. Raufer
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00453
District Judge Paul A. Engelmayer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 2:28 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Meiyan Liu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of Avrum J. Rosen, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary J. Yerman +1 212 219 0288 +1 212 219 8177 mgyerman@aol.com
v.
No Logo Susan Raufer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 702
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 1. This action is withdrawn and dismissed without costs or attorneys' fees. 2. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS") has scheduled an interview for plaintiff on December 3, 2015 at 8:00 a.m. 3. USCIS will make good-faith efforts to complete the adjudication of the asylum application of plaintiff within two weeks of completion of the final interview, receipt of any additional evidence submitted in response to a request by USCIS, and security checks being cleared and fully vetted. 4. In light of the commitments contained in paragraph 2, the claims that seek an order compelling USCIS to schedule plaintiff for an asylum interview are hereby withdrawn and dismissed with prejudice. 5. In light of the commitments contained in paragraph 3, the claims that seek an order compelling USCIS to complete the adjudication of plaintiff's asylum application are hereby withdrawn and dismissed without prejudice to the filing of a new action in the event USCIS does not complete the adjudication of any application described in paragraph 3 within a reasonable period of time. 6. Nothing in this stipulation and order shall preclude USCIS from raising any available defense in any such new action as described in paragraph 5. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/8/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of Susan Raufer. (Reddy, Kirti) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary J. Yerman on behalf of Meiyan Liu. (Yerman, Gary) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Susan Raufer served on 2/6/2015, answer due 4/7/2015. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Meiyan Liu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 Exhibit USPS Online Proof of Delivery upon US Attorney Office, SDNY)(Yerman, Gary) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
            PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Meiyan Liu (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401115080).Document filed by Meiyan Liu.(moh) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 255 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?