Blaufox v. Keane et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10278
District Judge Patti B. Saris, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 12:12 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Henry C. Blaufox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M. Stewart +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 astewart@shulaw.com
v.
No Logo Brian T. Keane, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo James D. White, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo John F. Keane, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo John F. Keane, Sr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
No Logo John F. Rockart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo John H. Fain, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo John J. Leahy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Keane, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Kirk E. Arnold, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Lawrence P. Begley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Maria A. Cirino, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Philip J. Harkins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Raymond W. Paris, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Renee Southard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Robert B. Atwell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Russell J. Campanello, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Wallace A. Cataldo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Winston R. Hindle, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Halston +1 617 526 6654 +1 617 526 5000 daniel.halston@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Prendergast +1 617 526 6181 +1 617 526 5000 james.prendergast@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon C. Simpson Jones +1 617 526 6887 +1 617 526 5000 sharon.simpsonjones@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy A. Watkins +1 617 526 6429 +1 617 526 5000 kristy.watkins@wilmerhale.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss (for Approval of Dismissal) by Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, # 2 Exhibit Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement, # 3 Exhibit Order and Final Judgment)(Watkins, Kristy) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Henry C. Blaufox of Firm Name Change (Stewart, Adam) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Stay Class and Derivative Action in Anticipation of Settlement by Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris.(Simpson Jones, Sharon) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Kristy A. Watkins on behalf of Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris (Watkins, Kristy) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
          AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Henry C. Blaufox.(Stewart, Adam) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B. Rudman on behalf of Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris (Rudman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Halston on behalf of Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris (Halston, Daniel) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Prendergast on behalf of Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris (Prendergast, James) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon C. Simpson Jones on behalf of Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris (Simpson Jones, Sharon) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B. Rudman on behalf of Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris (Rudman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Prendergast on behalf of Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris (Prendergast, James) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION Agreed-Upon Stipulation As To Acceptance Of Service And Scheduling by Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris. (Simpson Jones, Sharon) (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Stewart on behalf of Henry C. Blaufox (Stewart, Adam) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT against Wallace A. Cataldo, Renee Southard, James D. White, Lawrence P. Begley, Maria A. Cirino, Philip J. Harkins, John F. Rockart, Kirk E. Arnold, John H. Fain, Winston R. Hindle, Jr, Keane, Inc., John F. Keane, Sr, Brian T. Keane, John F. Keane, Jr, John J. Leahy, Robert B. Atwell, Russell J. Campanello, Raymond W. Paris Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1410277, filed by Henry C. Blaufox. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Civil Category Sheet)(Shapiro, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 179 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?